This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/09/2021 at 09:38:17 (UTC).

Design Collection, Inc. v. G-III Apparel Group, Ltd. et al

Case Summary

On 02/08/2021 Design Collection, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against G-III Apparel Group, Ltd. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Alexander F. MacKinnon and Percy Anderson. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-01147

  • Filing Date:

    02/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Alexander F. MacKinnon

Presiding Judge

Percy Anderson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Design Collection, Inc.

Defendants

DOES 1 through 10

BHFO, Inc.

G-III Apparel Group, Ltd.

Does 1-10

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Stephen M. Doniger

Attorney at Doniger Burroughs

603 Rose Avenue

Venice, CA 90291

Scott A. Burroughs

Attorney at Doniger Burroughs

603 Rose Avenue

Venice, CA 90291

David Shein

Attorney at Doniger Burroughs

603 Rose Avenue

Venice, CA 90291

 

Court Documents

#1

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

#10

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) REPORT ON THE DETERMINATION OF AN ACTION Regarding a Copyright. (Closing) (Attachments: #1 Dismissal) (mrgo) (Entered: 03/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff Design Collection, Inc.. Dismissal is With Prejudice. (Doniger, Stephen) (Entered: 03/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) STANDING ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. (See document for details) (mrgo) (Entered: 02/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendants BHFO, Inc., G-III Apparel Group, Ltd. (esa) (Entered: 02/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa) (Entered: 02/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Percy Anderson and Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. (esa) (Entered: 02/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Design Collection, Inc.. (Doniger, Stephen) (Entered: 02/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Design Collection, Inc.. (Doniger, Stephen) (Entered: 02/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Design Collection, Inc., (Doniger, Stephen) (Entered: 02/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Design Collection, Inc.. (Doniger, Stephen) (Entered: 02/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-30455604 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Design Collection, Inc.. (Attorney Stephen M. Doniger added to party Design Collection, Inc.(pty:pla))(Doniger, Stephen) (Entered: 02/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Design Collection, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where G-III APPAREL GROUP LTD is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer David Shein

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Stephen M Doniger