Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 06/06/2021 at 07:44:25 (UTC).

Desert Regional Medical Center, Inc. v. Global Excel Management, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 04/07/2021 Desert Regional Medical Center, Inc filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Global Excel Management, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Sheri Pym and Dolly M. Gee. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:21-CV-00618

  • Filing Date:

    04/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Sheri Pym

Presiding Judge

Dolly M. Gee

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Desert Regional Medical Center, Inc.

Defendants

Deutsche Assistance Service, GmbH

Bayerische Beamtenkrankenkasse AG

Global Excel Management, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Yvette Michelle Kohan

Attorney at Helton Law Group APC

1590 Corporate Drive

Costa Mesa, CA 92626

Defendant Attorneys

Dan D Terzian

Attorney at Warren Terzian LLP

700 South Flower Street Suite 1000

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Dan Terzian

Attorney at Warren Terzian LLP

700 South Flower Street Suite 1000

Los Angeles, CA 90017

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER AND NOTICE TO ALL PARTIES by Judge Dolly M. Gee: In light of Plaintiff's notice of settlement, indicating that the case has settled in its entirety and that the parties are finalizing their written settlement agreement #7 , this action is placed in inactive status. By 5/10/2021, the parties shall file either (1) a stipulation and proposed order for dismissal of the action or judgment, or (2) a motion to reopen if settlement has not been consummated. Upon the failure to timely comply with this Order, this action shall be deemed dismissed as of 5/11/2021. This Court retains full jurisdiction over this action and this Order shall not prejudice any party to this action. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) Court Reporter: Not Reported. (gk) (Entered: 04/12/2021)

#8

(#8) INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dolly M. Gee. (kti) (Entered: 04/09/2021)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Settlement filed by Plaintiff Desert Regional Medical Center, Inc.. (Epstein, Nathaniel) (Entered: 04/09/2021)

#6

(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil) (Entered: 04/09/2021)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT of Eastern Division Removal Case and Notice re Consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. This case was initially assigned to District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and referred to Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym for discovery. Pursuant to General Order 21-01, this case has been randomly reassigned to District Judge Dolly M. Gee. The case number on all documents filed with the Court in this case should read as follows: 5:21-cv-00618 DMG (SPx). (jtil) (Entered: 04/09/2021)

#4

(#4) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to All Parties, filed by Defendants Global Excel Management, Inc., Deutsche Assistance Service, GmbH, Bayerische Beamtenkrankenkasse AG.(Terzian, Dan) (Entered: 04/09/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER AND NOTICE TO ALL PARTIES by Judge Dolly M. Gee: In light of Plaintiff's notice of settlement, indicating that the case has settled in its entirety and that the parties are finalizing their written settlement agreement #7 , this action is placed in inactive status. By 5/10/2021, the parties shall file either (1) a stipulation and proposed order for dismissal of the action or judgment, or (2) a motion to reopen if settlement has not been consummated. Upon the failure to timely comply with this Order, this action shall be deemed dismissed as of 5/11/2021. This Court retains full jurisdiction over this action and this Order shall not prejudice any party to this action. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) Court Reporter: Not Reported. (gk) (Entered: 04/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dolly M. Gee. (kti) (Entered: 04/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Settlement filed by Plaintiff Desert Regional Medical Center, Inc.. (Epstein, Nathaniel) (Entered: 04/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil) (Entered: 04/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT of Eastern Division Removal Case and Notice re Consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. This case was initially assigned to District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and referred to Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym for discovery. Pursuant to General Order 21-01, this case has been randomly reassigned to District Judge Dolly M. Gee. The case number on all documents filed with the Court in this case should read as follows: 5:21-cv-00618 DMG (SPx). (jtil) (Entered: 04/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to All Parties, filed by Defendants Global Excel Management, Inc., Deutsche Assistance Service, GmbH, Bayerische Beamtenkrankenkasse AG.(Terzian, Dan) (Entered: 04/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketCONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff Desert Regional Medical Center, Inc. in Riverside Superior Court on 12/23/2020, attached as Exhibit A. (jtil) (Entered: 04/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants All Defendants, identifying Desert Regional Medical Center, Inc.; Global Excel Management, Inc.; ALT2 Investments Inc.; Deutsche Assistance Service, GmbH; RAG Rechtsschutzversicherungs-AG; Deutsche Assistance Versicherung AG; and Bayerische Beamtenkrankenkasse AG. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Service)(Terzian, Dan) (Entered: 04/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants Bayerische Beamtenkrankenkasse AG, Deutsche Assistance Service, GmbH, Global Excel Management, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Service)(Terzian, Dan) (Entered: 04/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court for the County of Riverside, case number CVPS2000641 Receipt No: ACACDC-31060796 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendants Global Excel Management, Inc., Deutsche Assistance Service, GmbH, Bayerische Beamtenkrankenkasse AG. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Complaint, all pleadings, and all process), #2 Declaration of service) (Attorney Dan D Terzian added to party Bayerische Beamtenkrankenkasse AG(pty:dft), Attorney Dan D Terzian added to party Deutsche Assistance Service, GmbH(pty:dft), Attorney Dan D Terzian added to party Global Excel Management, Inc.(pty:dft))(Terzian, Dan) (Entered: 04/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Global Excel Mangement (USA), Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where DESERT REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTERA CALIFORNIA is a litigant