This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/20/2022 at 08:44:04 (UTC).

Desert Regional Medical Center, Inc. et al v. Sistemas Medicos Nacionales, S.A. de C.V. et al

Case Summary

On 01/19/2022 Desert Regional Medical Center, Inc filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Sistemas Medicos Nacionales, S A de C. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Jesus G. Bernal and Sheri Pym. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:22-CV-00116

  • Filing Date:

    01/19/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jesus G. Bernal

Referral Judge

Sheri Pym

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Desert Regional Medical Center, Inc.

JFK Memorial Hospital, Inc. doing business as John F. Kennedy Memorial Hospital

Petitioner and Plaintiff

JFK Memorial Hospital, Inc. doing business as John F. Kennedy Memorial Hospital

Defendants

SISTEMAS MEDICOS NACIONALES, S.A. de C.V. dba SIMNSA HEALTH PLAN

Sistemas Medicos Nacionales, S.A. de C.V. doing business as Simnsa Health Plan

Does 1 through 25, inclusive

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Carrie S McLain

Attorney at Helton Law Group APC

1590 Corporate Drive

Costa Mesa, CA 92626

Steven D Sperling

Attorney at Helton Law Group APC

1590 Corporate Drive

Costa Mesa, CA 92626

Casey Everett Mitchnick

Attorney at Helton Law Group APC

1590 Corporate Drive

Costa Mesa, CA 92626

Defendant Attorneys

Samuel D Duimovich

Attorney at Sheppard Mullin Richter and Hampton LLP

333 South Hope Street 43Rd Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071-1422

Moe Keshavarzi

Attorney at Sheppard Mullin Richter and Hampton LLP

333 South Hope Street 43Rd Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) Plaintiffs' Demand for Jury Trial (Sperling, Steven) (Entered: 02/07/2022)

#12

(#12) STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (ima) (Entered: 01/31/2022)

#11

(#11) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Carrie S McLain counsel for Plaintiffs Desert Regional Medical Center, Inc., JFK Memorial Hospital, Inc.. Adding Casey Mitchnick as counsel of record for DESERT REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, INC. and JFK MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, INC. dba JOHN F. KENNEDY MEMORIAL HOSPITAL for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiffs DESERT REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, INC. and JFK MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, INC. dba JOHN F. KENNEDY MEMORIAL HOSPITAL. (McLain, Carrie) (Entered: 01/25/2022)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs All Plaintiffs, (McLain, Carrie) (Entered: 01/25/2022)

#9

(#9) ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO Local Rule 83-1.3.1 and General Order 21-01 -Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 5:21-cv-01509 JGB(SPx). Case referred from Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato to Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym for Discovery. The case number will now read as follows: 5:22-cv-00116 JGB(SPx). Signed by Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym. (rn) (Entered: 01/25/2022)

#8

(#8) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (car) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

#7

(#7) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

#6

(#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato. (car) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

#5

(#5) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant SISTEMAS MEDICOS NACIONALES, S.A. de C.V. dba SIMNSA HEALTH PLAN, re Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Corporate Disclosure Statement #3 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 , Notice of Related Case(s) #4 served on Notice of Removal, Civil Cover Sheet, Certification and Notice of Interested Parties, Notice of Related Case. (Duimovich, Samuel) (Entered: 01/19/2022)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Defendant SISTEMAS MEDICOS NACIONALES, S.A. de C.V. dba SIMNSA HEALTH PLAN. Related Case(s): 5:21-cv-01509-JGB SP (Duimovich, Samuel) (Entered: 01/19/2022)

#3

(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant SISTEMAS MEDICOS NACIONALES, S.A. de C.V. dba SIMNSA HEALTH PLAN identifying Francisco Carrillo and Christina Suggett as Corporate Parent. (Duimovich, Samuel) (Entered: 01/19/2022)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant SISTEMAS MEDICOS NACIONALES, S.A. de C.V. dba SIMNSA HEALTH PLAN. (Duimovich, Samuel) (Entered: 01/19/2022)

1 #5

Declaration Exhibit E - Declaration of Samuel D. Duimovich ISO Notice of Removal

1 #4

Exhibit Exhibit D - State Court Filings

1 #3

Exhibit Exhibit C - State Court Answer

1 #2

Exhibit Exhibit B - Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt of Summons and Complain

1 #1

Exhibit Exhibit A - State Court Complaint

1 #1

Main Document

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Plaintiffs' Demand for Jury Trial (Sperling, Steven) (Entered: 02/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (ima) (Entered: 01/31/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Carrie S McLain counsel for Plaintiffs Desert Regional Medical Center, Inc., JFK Memorial Hospital, Inc.. Adding Casey Mitchnick as counsel of record for DESERT REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, INC. and JFK MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, INC. dba JOHN F. KENNEDY MEMORIAL HOSPITAL for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiffs DESERT REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, INC. and JFK MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, INC. dba JOHN F. KENNEDY MEMORIAL HOSPITAL. (McLain, Carrie) (Entered: 01/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs All Plaintiffs, (McLain, Carrie) (Entered: 01/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO Local Rule 83-1.3.1 and General Order 21-01 -Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 5:21-cv-01509 JGB(SPx). Case referred from Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato to Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym for Discovery. The case number will now read as follows: 5:22-cv-00116 JGB(SPx). Signed by Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym. (rn) (Entered: 01/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (car) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato. (car) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Defendant Sistemas Medicos Nacionales, S.A. de C.V. Filed in State Court on 1/19/2022 Submitted with Attachment 3 Exhibit C to Notice of Removal #1 .(car) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNON-CONFORMED COPY OF NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint returned Executed filed by Plaintiff JFK Memorial Hospital, Inc., Desert Regional Medical Center, Inc., upon Defendant Sistemas Medicos Nacionales, S.A. de C.V. acknowledgment sent by Plaintiff on 12/20/2021, answer due 1/10/2022. Acknowledgment of Service signed by Samuel Duimovich, Counsel for Defendant. Submitted with Attachment 2 Exhibit B to Notice of Removal #1 (car) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does 1 through 25, inclusive, Sistemas Medicos Nacionales, S.A. de C.V., filed by Plaintiffs JFK Memorial Hospital, Inc., Desert Regional Medical Center, Inc. Filed in State Court on 11/5/2021 Submitted with Attachment 1 Exhibit A to Notice of Removal #1 . (car) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant SISTEMAS MEDICOS NACIONALES, S.A. de C.V. dba SIMNSA HEALTH PLAN, re Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Corporate Disclosure Statement #3 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 , Notice of Related Case(s) #4 served on Notice of Removal, Civil Cover Sheet, Certification and Notice of Interested Parties, Notice of Related Case. (Duimovich, Samuel) (Entered: 01/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Defendant SISTEMAS MEDICOS NACIONALES, S.A. de C.V. dba SIMNSA HEALTH PLAN. Related Case(s): 5:21-cv-01509-JGB SP (Duimovich, Samuel) (Entered: 01/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant SISTEMAS MEDICOS NACIONALES, S.A. de C.V. dba SIMNSA HEALTH PLAN identifying Francisco Carrillo and Christina Suggett as Corporate Parent. (Duimovich, Samuel) (Entered: 01/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant SISTEMAS MEDICOS NACIONALES, S.A. de C.V. dba SIMNSA HEALTH PLAN. (Duimovich, Samuel) (Entered: 01/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Riverside Superior Court, case number CVPS2106117 Receipt No: ACACDC-32647500 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant SISTEMAS MEDICOS NACIONALES, S.A. de C.V. dba SIMNSA HEALTH PLAN. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt of Summons and Complaint, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C - State Court Answer, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D - State Court Filings, #5 Declaration Exhibit E - Declaration of Samuel D. Duimovich ISO Notice of Removal) (Attorney Samuel D Duimovich added to party SISTEMAS MEDICOS NACIONALES, S.A. de C.V. dba SIMNSA HEALTH PLAN(pty:dft))(Duimovich, Samuel) (Entered: 01/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where JFK MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where DESERT REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTERA CALIFORNIA is a litigant