This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/01/2023 at 16:51:27 (UTC).

Dervisevic et al v. Buckingham Trading Partners Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 01/31/2023 Dervisevic filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against Buckingham Trading Partners Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Katherine Polk Failla. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:23-CV-00787

  • Filing Date:

    01/31/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Katherine Polk Failla

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Kemal Dervisevic

Elmaza Dervisevic

Defendants

Buckingham Trading Partners Inc.

1205-1215 First Ave Annex LLC

Kamran Hakim

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Matthew J. Blit

Justin Stedman Clark

Defendant Attorneys

Matthew Alexander Brown

Joseph Martin Labuda

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against 1205-1215 First Ave Annex LLC, Buckingham Trading Partners Inc., Kamran Hakim. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-27272718)Document filed by Kemal Dervisevic, Elmaza Dervisevic..(Clark, Justin) (Entered: 01/31/2023)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Clark, Justin) (Entered: 01/31/2023)

#3

(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Buckingham Trading Partners Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Elmaza Dervisevic, Kemal Dervisevic..(Clark, Justin) (Entered: 01/31/2023)

#4

(#4) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to 1205-1215 First Ave Annex LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Elmaza Dervisevic, Kemal Dervisevic..(Clark, Justin) (Entered: 01/31/2023)

#5

(#5) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Kamran Hakim, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Elmaza Dervisevic, Kemal Dervisevic..(Clark, Justin) (Entered: 01/31/2023)

#6

(#6) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Matthew J. Blit on behalf of Elmaza Dervisevic, Kemal Dervisevic..(Blit, Matthew) (Entered: 01/31/2023)

#7

(#7) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Kamran Hakim..(pc) (Entered: 02/01/2023)

#8

(#8) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to 1205-1215 First Ave Annex LLC..(pc) (Entered: 02/01/2023)

#9

(#9) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Buckingham Trading Partners Inc...(pc) (Entered: 02/01/2023)

#10

(#10) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Matthew Alexander Brown on behalf of 1205-1215 First Ave Annex LLC, Buckingham Trading Partners Inc., Kamran Hakim..(Brown, Matthew) (Entered: 02/03/2023)

#11

(#11) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Joseph Martin Labuda on behalf of 1205-1215 First Ave Annex LLC, Buckingham Trading Partners Inc., Kamran Hakim..(Labuda, Joseph) (Entered: 02/03/2023)

#12

(#12) WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. 1205-1215 First Ave Annex LLC waiver sent on 2/2/2023, answer due 4/3/2023; Buckingham Trading Partners Inc. waiver sent on 2/2/2023, answer due 4/3/2023; Kamran Hakim waiver sent on 2/2/2023, answer due 4/3/2023. Document filed by Kemal Dervisevic; Elmaza Dervisevic..(Clark, Justin) (Entered: 02/03/2023)

#13

(#13) MEDIATION REFERRAL ORDER FOR CASES FILED UNDER THE FAIR LABOR STANDARDS ACT 29 U.S.C. Sec. 201 et seq. This case, involving claims under the Fair Labor Standards Act (FLSA), 29 U.S.C. Sec. 201 et seq., has been assigned to this Court for all purposes. In the Courts experience, cases involving FLSA claims often benefit from early mediation. To that end, prior to a Rule 16(b) case management conference the Court is referring this case to the Mediation Office for settlement purposes under Local Civil Rule 83.9. To facilitate mediation the parties shall, within four weeks of this Order, confer and provide the items set forth in this Order. Mediator to be Assigned by 2/27/2023. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 12/10/2019) (rpr) (Entered: 02/11/2023)

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

03/09/2023

DocketFIRST MEDIATION CONFERENCE. Mediation Conference scheduled for 4/20/2023 at 10:00 AM in telephone or video conference.(mnp) (Entered: 03/09/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/15/2023

DocketNOTICE OF MEDIATOR ASSIGNMENT - Notice of assignment of mediator. Mediator Schedule due by 3/17/2023.(ah) (Entered: 02/15/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/11/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#13) MEDIATION REFERRAL ORDER FOR CASES FILED UNDER THE FAIR LABOR STANDARDS ACT 29 U.S.C. Sec. 201 et seq. This case, involving claims under the Fair Labor Standards Act (FLSA), 29 U.S.C. Sec. 201 et seq., has been assigned to this Court for all purposes. In the Courts experience, cases involving FLSA claims often benefit from early mediation. To that end, prior to a Rule 16(b) case management conference the Court is referring this case to the Mediation Office for settlement purposes under Local Civil Rule 83.9. To facilitate mediation the parties shall, within four weeks of this Order, confer and provide the items set forth in this Order. Mediator to be Assigned by 2/27/2023. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 12/10/2019) (rpr) (Entered: 02/11/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/03/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#12) WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. 1205-1215 First Ave Annex LLC waiver sent on 2/2/2023, answer due 4/3/2023; Buckingham Trading Partners Inc. waiver sent on 2/2/2023, answer due 4/3/2023; Kamran Hakim waiver sent on 2/2/2023, answer due 4/3/2023. Document filed by Kemal Dervisevic; Elmaza Dervisevic..(Clark, Justin) (Entered: 02/03/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/03/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#11) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Joseph Martin Labuda on behalf of 1205-1215 First Ave Annex LLC, Buckingham Trading Partners Inc., Kamran Hakim..(Labuda, Joseph) (Entered: 02/03/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/03/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#10) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Matthew Alexander Brown on behalf of 1205-1215 First Ave Annex LLC, Buckingham Trading Partners Inc., Kamran Hakim..(Brown, Matthew) (Entered: 02/03/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/01/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#9) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Buckingham Trading Partners Inc...(pc) (Entered: 02/01/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/01/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to 1205-1215 First Ave Annex LLC..(pc) (Entered: 02/01/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/01/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Kamran Hakim..(pc) (Entered: 02/01/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/01/2023

DocketCase Designated ECF. (pc) (Entered: 02/01/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/01/2023

DocketMagistrate Judge Valerie Figueredo is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc) (Entered: 02/01/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/01/2023

DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Katherine Polk Failla. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc) (Entered: 02/01/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/31/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Matthew J. Blit on behalf of Elmaza Dervisevic, Kemal Dervisevic..(Blit, Matthew) (Entered: 01/31/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/31/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Kamran Hakim, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Elmaza Dervisevic, Kemal Dervisevic..(Clark, Justin) (Entered: 01/31/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/31/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to 1205-1215 First Ave Annex LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Elmaza Dervisevic, Kemal Dervisevic..(Clark, Justin) (Entered: 01/31/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/31/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Buckingham Trading Partners Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Elmaza Dervisevic, Kemal Dervisevic..(Clark, Justin) (Entered: 01/31/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/31/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Clark, Justin) (Entered: 01/31/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/31/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against 1205-1215 First Ave Annex LLC, Buckingham Trading Partners Inc., Kamran Hakim. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-27272718)Document filed by Kemal Dervisevic, Elmaza Dervisevic..(Clark, Justin) (Entered: 01/31/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less