This case was last updated from PACER on 04/20/2019 at 07:20:06 (UTC).

DERRY v. THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

Case Summary

On 02/19/2019 DERRY filed a Prisoner - Vacate Sentence lawsuit against THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District. The Judge overseeing this case is Noel L. Hillman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-06141

  • Filing Date:

    02/19/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Vacate Sentence

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New Jersey District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Noel L. Hillman

 

Party Details

Petitioner

MALIK DERRY

Jonesville, VA 24263

Respondent

THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorney

FABIANA PIERRE-LOUIS

Attorney at OFFICE OF THE U.S. ATTORNEY

402 East State Street, Room 430

Trenton, NJ 08608

 

Court Documents

4 #1

Text of Proposed Order Ex A

#4

(#4) Letter from USA to the Court requesting extension of time to file an answer to the 2255 Petition and waiver of the attorney client privilege. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Ex A)(ASKIN, PATRICK) (Entered: 04/16/2019)

#3

(#3) Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to MALIK DERRY (cry,mail re-sent with inmate number) (Entered: 03/07/2019)

#2

(#2) ORDER TO ANSWER within forty-five (45) days of the date of the entry of this Order,. Signed by Judge Noel L. Hillman on 2/26/2019. (tf, n.m.) (Entered: 02/26/2019)

1 #1

Exhibit

#1

(#1) MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255) In Re to Criminal Case file 14-0050 (NLH), filed by MALIK DERRY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(cry, ) (Entered: 02/19/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Letter from USA to the Court requesting extension of time to file an answer to the 2255 Petition and waiver of the attorney client privilege. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Ex A)(ASKIN, PATRICK) (Entered: 04/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to MALIK DERRY (cry,mail re-sent with inmate number) (Entered: 03/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) ORDER TO ANSWER within forty-five (45) days of the date of the entry of this Order,. Signed by Judge Noel L. Hillman on 2/26/2019. (tf, n.m.) (Entered: 02/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255) In Re to Criminal Case file 14-0050 (NLH), filed by MALIK DERRY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(cry, ) (Entered: 02/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less