This case was last updated from PACER on 12/23/2019 at 08:34:21 (UTC).

Derrick v. Isabella County Trial Court et al

Case Summary

On 10/24/2019 Derrick filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Isabella County Trial Court. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Michigan Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Victoria A. Roberts and Elizabeth A. Stafford. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-13123

  • Filing Date:

    10/24/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Michigan Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Victoria A. Roberts

Referral Judge

Elizabeth A. Stafford

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Cory O'dell Derrick

Mt. Pleasant, MI 48858

Defendants

Mark H. Duthie

Isabella County Trial Court

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Cory O'dell Derrick against Mark H. Duthie, Isabella County Trial Court (AFla) (Entered: 10/25/2019)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Mediation Program (AFla) (Entered: 10/25/2019)

#4

(#4) Notice Regarding Parties' Responsibility to Notify Court of Address Changes (KCas) (Entered: 10/29/2019)

#7

(#7) JUDGMENT. Signed by District Judge Victoria A. Roberts. (LVer) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#2

(#2) APPLICATION to Proceed without prepaying fees or costs by Cory O'dell Derrick. (AFla) (Entered: 10/25/2019)

#5

(#5) ORDER granting #2 Application to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees or Costs and Directing Payment of an Initial Partial Filing Fee in the amount of $0 and subsequent payments. Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Steven Whalen. (SOso) (Entered: 11/25/2019)

#6

(#6) ORDER of Summary Dismissal. Signed by District Judge Victoria A. Roberts. (LVer) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #6 Order Dismissing Case, #7 Judgment on Cory O'dell Derrick Pris. No. 103943 at Isabella County Jail, 207 Court St. A, Mt. Pleasant, MI 48858. (LVer) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) JUDGMENT. Signed by District Judge Victoria A. Roberts. (LVer) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER of Summary Dismissal. Signed by District Judge Victoria A. Roberts. (LVer) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER granting #2 Application to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees or Costs and Directing Payment of an Initial Partial Filing Fee in the amount of $0 and subsequent payments. Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Steven Whalen. (SOso) (Entered: 11/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Notice Regarding Parties' Responsibility to Notify Court of Address Changes (KCas) (Entered: 10/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Mediation Program (AFla) (Entered: 10/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) APPLICATION to Proceed without prepaying fees or costs by Cory O'dell Derrick. (AFla) (Entered: 10/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT filed by Cory O'dell Derrick against Mark H. Duthie, Isabella County Trial Court (AFla) (Entered: 10/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.