This case was last updated from PACER on 10/22/2019 at 08:20:08 (UTC).

Derrick L. Johnson v. Superior Court of the State of California for County of Los Angeles et al

Case Summary

On 08/23/2019 a Prisoner - Other Prisoner case was filed by Derrick L Johnson against Superior Court of the State of California for County of Los Angeles in the jurisdiction of U.S. District Courts, California Central District.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-07352

  • Filing Date:

    08/23/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

John E. McDermott

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Derrick L Johnson

Respondents

Scott Kernan

Calfiornia Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation

Superior Court of the State of California for County of Los Angeles

 

Court Documents

3 #1

*Restricted*

#5

(#5) MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER CONSOLIDATING CV 19-7352-GW (JEM) AND CV 19-5713-GW (JEM), ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSING CV 19-7352-GW (JEM), AND DENYING MOTION TO AMEND PETITION by Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott. IT IS ORDERED that CV 19-7352-GW (JEM) be consolidated with CV 19-5713-GW (JEM). Any future filings shall be filed only under the low number case, CV 19-5713-GW (JEM). (See document for details.) Cases associated with Lead Case CV 19-5713-GW (JEM). (sbou) (Entered: 09/09/2019)

#3

(#3) ORIGINAL file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received from California Eastern (Entered: 08/26/2019)

#4

(#4) NOTICE OF REFERENCE to a U.S. Magistrate Judge. This case has been assigned to the calendar of the Honorable District Judge George H. Wu and referred to Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott, who is authorized to consider preliminary matters and conduct all further hearings as may be appropriate or necessary. Pursuant to Local Rule 83-2.4, the Court must be notified within five (5) days of any address change. See notice for additional details. (Attachments: #1 CV111, #2 CV38) (jtil) (Entered: 08/27/2019)

4 #2

CV38

#1

(#1) (2254) PETITION for WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS against Calfiornia Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation, Scott Kernan, Superior Court of the State of California for County of Los Angeles by Derrick L. Johnson.(Sant Agata, S) [Transferred from California Eastern on 8/26/2019.] (Entered: 07/17/2019)

#2

(#2) ORDER TRANSFERRED to Central District of California, signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson on 8/23/19. (Marrujo, C) [Transferred from California Eastern on 8/26/2019.] (Entered: 08/23/2019)

4 #1

CV111

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER CONSOLIDATING CV 19-7352-GW (JEM) AND CV 19-5713-GW (JEM), ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSING CV 19-7352-GW (JEM), AND DENYING MOTION TO AMEND PETITION by Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott. IT IS ORDERED that CV 19-7352-GW (JEM) be consolidated with CV 19-5713-GW (JEM). Any future filings shall be filed only under the low number case, CV 19-5713-GW (JEM). (See document for details.) Cases associated with Lead Case CV 19-5713-GW (JEM). (sbou) (Entered: 09/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE OF REFERENCE to a U.S. Magistrate Judge. This case has been assigned to the calendar of the Honorable District Judge George H. Wu and referred to Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott, who is authorized to consider preliminary matters and conduct all further hearings as may be appropriate or necessary. Pursuant to Local Rule 83-2.4, the Court must be notified within five (5) days of any address change. See notice for additional details. (Attachments: #1 CV111, #2 CV38) (jtil) (Entered: 08/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ORIGINAL file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received from California Eastern (Entered: 08/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SERVICE BY MAIL: #2 Order, served on Derrick L. Johnson. (Marrujo, C) [Transferred from California Eastern on 8/26/2019.] (Entered: 08/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) ORDER TRANSFERRED to Central District of California, signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson on 8/23/19. (Marrujo, C) [Transferred from California Eastern on 8/26/2019.] (Entered: 08/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) (2254) PETITION for WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS against Calfiornia Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation, Scott Kernan, Superior Court of the State of California for County of Los Angeles by Derrick L. Johnson.(Sant Agata, S) [Transferred from California Eastern on 8/26/2019.] (Entered: 07/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.