This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/11/2019 at 10:15:23 (UTC).

DERRICK et al v. GLEN MILLS SCHOOLS et al

Case Summary

On 04/11/2019 DERRICK filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against GLEN MILLS SCHOOLS. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is HARVEY BARTLE, III. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-01541

  • Filing Date:

    04/11/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

HARVEY BARTLE, III

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

DERRICK

WALTER

THOMAS

SEAN

Defendants

RANDY IRESON

CHESTER COUNTY INTERMEDIATE UNIT

JOHN DOES 1-20

THEODORE DALLAS

PEDRO A. RIVERA

PENNSYLVANIA DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION

TERESA D. MILLER

ANDRE WALKER

SEAN DOE

GLEN MILLS SCHOOLS

CATHY UTZ

CHRIS DOE 2

CHRIS DOE 1

ROBERT TAYLOR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

FRED T. MAGAZINER

Attorney at DECHERT LLP

2929 Arch St, Cira Centre

Philadelphia, PA 19104-2808

MAURA I. MCINERNEY

Attorney at EDUCATION LAW CENTER

1315 Walnut Street, Suite 400

Philadelphia, PA 19107

MARSHA L. LEVICK

Attorney at JUVENILE LAW CENTER

1315 Walnut Street, The Philadelphia Bldg -4Th Floor

Philadelphia, PA 19107

MICHAEL H. MCGINLEY

Attorney at DECHERT LLP

2929 Arch St

Philadelphia, PA 19104

NADIA MOZAFFAR

Attorney at JUVENILE LAW CENTER

1315 Walnut St 4Th Fl

Philadelphia, PA 19107

Defendant Attorneys

JOSEPH THOMAS KELLEHER

Attorney at STRADLEY, RONON, STEVENS & YOUNG, LLP

2005 Market Street, Suite 2600

Philadelphia, PA 19103

BRANDON MICHAEL RILEY

Attorney at STRADLEY RONON STEVENS & YOUNG

2005 Market St Suite 2600

Philadelphia, PA 19103

JOSEPH J. MCHALE

Attorney at STRADLEY RONON STEVENS & YOUNG, LLP

2005 Market Street, Suite 2600

Philadelphia, PA 19103

JASON D. FORTENBERRY

Attorney at Sweet Stevens Katz & Williams LLP

331 East Butler Avenue

New Britain, PA 18901

ANDREW E FAUST

Attorney at SWEET STEVENS KATZ & WILLIAMS LLP

331 East Butler Ave, Pobox 5069

New Britain, PA 18901

PAUL LANTIERI, III

Attorney at BALLARD SPAHR et al

1735 Market St., 51St Floor

Philadelphia, PA 19103

KAITLIN M. GURNEY

Attorney at Ballard Spahr LLP

1735 Market Street, 51St Floor

Philadelphia, PA 19103-7599

ELIZABETH A. ANZALONE

Attorney at PA DEPT OF EDUCATION

333 Market St

Harrisburg, PA 17126

HENRY E. HOCKEIMER, JR.

Attorney at BALLARD SPAHR LLP

1735 Market St 51St Fl

Philadelphia, PA 19103

RUFUS A. JENNINGS

Attorney at DEASEY, MAHONEY & VALENTINI, LTD

1601 Market Street, Suite 3400

Philadelphia, PA 19103

FRANCIS J. DEASEY

Attorney at DEASEY, MAHONEY VALENTINI, NORTH, LTD

1601 Market Street, 34Th Floor

Philadelphia, PA 19103-2978

EDVARD LARS WILSON

Attorney at OBERMAYER REBMANN MAXWELL & HIPPEL LLP

1500 Market St, Centre Square West Suite 3400

Philadelphia, PA 19102

GARY M. SAMMS

Attorney at OBERMAYER REBBMANN MAXWELL & HIPPELL LLP

Centre Square West, 34Th Floor, 1500 Market Street

Philadelphia, PA 19102

 

Court Documents

#44

#43

#42

#41

#40

#39

#38

37 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#37

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet , DESIGNATION FORM, CASE MANAGEMENT TRACK FORM

#1

52 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#44) ORDER THAT THE STATUS CONFERENCE SCHEDULED IN THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED ACTIONS FOR WEDNESDAY, JUNE 26, 2019 IS CANCELLED AND WILL BE RESCHEDULED AT A LATER DATE; AND DEFENDANTS RESPONSE TO THE COMPLAINT IN EL-KHASHAB V. GLEN MILLS SCHOOL, NO. 19-2224, SHALL BE STAYED PENDING FURTHER ORDER OF THIS COURT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE HARVEY BARTLE, III ON 6/25/19. 6/25/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED. (va, ) Modified on 6/25/2019 (va, ). (Entered: 06/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#43) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by ANDRE WALKER.Memorandum, Certificate of Service.(JENNINGS, RUFUS) (Entered: 06/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#42) NOTICE of Hearing: STATUS CONFERENCE SET FOR 6/26/2019 02:00 PM IN JUDGE BARTLE'S CHAMBERS BEFORE HONORABLE HARVEY BARTLE III.(km, ) (Entered: 06/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#41) NOTICE of Appearance by EDVARD LARS WILSON on behalf of ROBERT TAYLOR (WILSON, EDVARD) Modified on 6/5/2019 (md). (Entered: 06/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#40) NOTICE of Appearance by GARY M. SAMMS on behalf of ROBERT TAYLOR (SAMMS, GARY) Modified on 6/5/2019 (md). (Entered: 06/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#39) ORDER THAT APPLICATION FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF NADIA MOZAFFAR IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE HARVEY BARTLE, III ON 5/28/19. 5/29/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREPS AND COUNSEL; E-MAILED. *ECF NOTIFICATION/REGISTRATION SENT ON 5/28/19*(rf, ) (Entered: 05/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#38) ORDER THAT ORDER DATED 5/23/19 (DOC. 36) IS VACATED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE HARVEY BARTLE, III ON 5/28/19. 5/28/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREPS AND E-MAILED.(rf, ) (Entered: 05/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#37) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Nadia Mozaffar ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-13567379.), filed by DERRICK, SEAN, THOMAS, WALTER, Statement, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(LEVICK, MARSHA) Modified on 5/29/2019 (md). (Entered: 05/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#36) ORDER THAT PLAINTIFFS SHALL FILE AND SERVE ON OR BEFORE 6/24/19 ANY RESPONSIVE BRIEF IN OPPOSITION TO THE MOTION OF DEFENDANT CHESTER COUNTY INTERMEDIATE UNIT TO STRIKE PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT. DEFENDANT CHESTER COUNTY INTERMEDIATE UNIT SHALL FILE AND SERVE ON OR BEFORE 7/10/19 ANY REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION TO STRIKE PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT, ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE HARVEY BARTLE, III ON 5/23/19. 5/24/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREPS AND E-MAILED.(rf, ) Modified on 5/28/2019 (rf, ). *ORDER IS VACATED PER COURT ORDER OF 5/28/19, DOC. 38* (Entered: 05/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#35) ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS SHALL FILE AND SERVE ON OR BEFORE 7/15/2019 ANY MOTIONS TO DISMISS THE COMPLAINT, ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE HARVEY BARTLE, III ON 5/22/19. 5/22/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREPS AND E-MAILED.(rf, ) (Entered: 05/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
25 More Docket Entries
  • 05/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by GLEN MILLS SCHOOLS.(RILEY, BRANDON) (FILED IN ERROR BY ATTY; COPY FORWARDED TO JUDGE FOR APPROVAL) Modified on 5/2/2019 (md). (Entered: 05/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) AFFIDAVIT of Service by John F. Shinkowsky re: served Summons upon Teresa Miller by Personally served on April 17, 2019, answer due 5/8/19. (MAGAZINER, FRED) Modified on 4/26/2019 (afm, ). (Entered: 04/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) AFFIDAVIT of Service by John F. Shinkowsky re: served Summons upon Pedro Rivera by Personally served on April 17, 2019, answer due 5/8/19. (MAGAZINER, FRED) Modified on 4/26/2019 (afm, ). (Entered: 04/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) AFFIDAVIT of Service by John F. Shinkowsky re: served Summons upon Pa. Dept. of Education by Personally served on April 17, 2019, answer due 5/8/19. (MAGAZINER, FRED) Modified on 4/26/2019 (afm, ). (Entered: 04/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) AFFIDAVIT of Service by John F. Shinkowsky re: served Summons upon Cathy Utz by personally served on April 17, 2019, answer due 5/8/19. (MAGAZINER, FRED) Modified on 4/26/2019 (afm, ). (Entered: 04/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Appearance by BRANDON MICHAEL RILEY on behalf of GLEN MILLS SCHOOLS with Certificate of Service(RILEY, BRANDON) (Entered: 04/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Appearance by JOSEPH THOMAS KELLEHER on behalf of GLEN MILLS SCHOOLS with Certificate of Service(KELLEHER, JOSEPH) (Entered: 04/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Appearance by JOSEPH J. MCHALE on behalf of GLEN MILLS SCHOOLS with Certificate of Service(MCHALE, JOSEPH) (Entered: 04/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • 10 Summons Issued as to CHESTER COUNTY INTERMEDIATE UNIT, THEODORE DALLAS, GLEN MILLS SCHOOLS, RANDY IRESON, TERESA D. MILLER, PENNSYLVANIA DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION, PEDRO A. RIVERA, ROBERT TAYLOR, CATHY UTZ, ANDRE WALKER. HANDED OVER COUNTER TO COUNSEL on 4/11/2019 (amas) (Entered: 04/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against CHESTER COUNTY INTERMEDIATE UNIT, CHRIS DOE 1, CHRIS DOE 2, THEODORE DALLAS, SEAN DOE, GLEN MILLS SCHOOLS, RANDY IRESON, JOHN DOES 1-20, TERESA D. MILLER, PENNSYLVANIA DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION, PEDRO A. RIVERA, ROBERT TAYLOR, CATHY UTZ, ANDRE WALKER ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 195565.), filed by DERRICK, SEAN, THOMAS, WALTER. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, DESIGNATION FORM, CASE MANAGEMENT TRACK FORM)(amas) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/15/2019: #2 Civil Cover Sheet , DESIGNATION FORM, CASE MANAGEMENT TRACK FORM) (amas, ). (Entered: 04/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GLEN MILLS SCHOOLS is a litigant

Latest cases where DERRICK is a litigant

Latest cases where THE PENNSYLVANIA DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION is a litigant

Latest cases where . Walters is a litigant