This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/04/2021 at 06:57:46 (UTC).

Derouen et al v. Brake Parts Inc., LLC et al

Case Summary

On 04/15/2021 Derouen filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against Brake Parts Inc , LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Middle District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Shelly D. Dick and Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-00215

  • Filing Date:

    04/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Shelly D. Dick

Referral Judge

Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Tony Derouen

Mark Derouen

Delores L. Derouen

Scott Derouen

Jeremy Derouen

Defendants

Genuine Parts Company

Ford Motor Company

Morse TEC, LLC

BWDAC, Inc.

Honiron Corporation

Brake Parts Inc., LLC

Carlisle Industrial Brake and Friction, Inc.

Taylor-Seidenbach, Inc.

Navistar, Inc.

Honiron Disc, Inc.

Pneumo-Abex Corporation

J.P. Lapeyrouse, Inc.

8 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Lindsey A Cheek

Attorney at The Cheek Law Firm

650 Poydras Street, Suite 2310

New Orleans, LA 70130

Jeanne Arceneaux

Attorney at The Cheek Law Firm

650 Poydras Suite 2310, 70130

New Orleans, LA 70115

Defendant Attorneys

John J. Hainkel, III

Attorney at Frilot L.L.C.

1100 Poydras Street, Suite 3700

New Orleans, LA 70163

Angela M. Bowlin

Attorney at Frilot L.L.C.

1100 Poydras Street, Suite 3700

New Orleans, LA 70163

Roth Martin Hainkel

Attorney at Frilot L.L.C.

1100 Poydras, Suite 3800

New Orleans, LA 70163

Kelsey Anne Eagan

Attorney at Frilot L.L.C.

1100 Poydras St., Suite 3700

New Orleans, LA 70163

Kelly Lorraine Long

Attorney at Frilot LLC

1100 Poydras Street, Suite 3700

New Orleans, LA 70163

Lacey T McCoy

Attorney at Frilot L.L.C.

1100 Poydras St., Suite 3700

New Orleans, LA 70163

Magali Ann Puente-Martin

Attorney at Frilot LLC

1100 Poydras Street, Suite 3700

New Orleans, LA 70163

Deborah Kuchler

Attorney at Kuchler Polk Weiner, LLC

1615 Poydras Street, Suite 1300

New Orleans, LA 70112

Alease Scott

Attorney at Kuchler Polk Weiner, LLC

1615 Poydras Street, Suite 1300

New Orleans, LA 70112

Janika D. Polk

Attorney at Kuchler Polk Weiner, LLC

1615 Poydras Street, Suite 1300

New Orleans, LA 70112

Lee Blanton Ziffer

Attorney at Kuchler Polk Weiner, LLC

1615 Poydras Street, Suite 1300

New Orleans, LA 70112

Monique M. Weiner

Attorney at Kuchler Polk Weiner, LLC

1615 Poydras Street, Suite 1300

New Orleans, LA 70112

Skylar Barbosa Rudin

Attorney at Kuchler Polk Weiner, LLC

1615 Poydras Street, Suite 1300

New Orleans, LA 70112

Phillip E. Foco

Attorney at Bienvenu, Bonnecaze, Foco & Viator, LLC

4210 Bluebonnet Boulevard

Baton Rouge, LA 70809

Thomas Naquin

4210 Bluebonnet Blvd

Baton Rouge, LA 70809

F. Charles Marionneaux

Attorney at Bienvenu, Bonnecaze, Foco & Viator, LLC

4210 Bluebonnet Blvd

Baton Rouge, LA 70809

David Mark Bienvenu, Jr.

Attorney at Bienvenu, Bonnecaze, Foco, Viator and Holinga, APLLC

4210 Bluebonnet Blvd.

Baton Rouge, LA 70809

John Allain Viator

Attorney at Bienvenu, Bonnecaze, Foco & Viator, LLC

4210 Bluebonnet Blvd

Baton Rouge, LA 70809

25 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#36

#35

#34

#31

3 #5

Attachment

3 #4

Exhibit

3 #3

Exhibit

3 #2

Exhibit

#3

1 #23

Exhibit

1 #19

Exhibit

1 #15

Exhibit

1 #13

Exhibit

1 #12

Exhibit

1 #11

Exhibit

1 #10

Exhibit

1 #6

Exhibit

#1

121 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) GENERAL ORDER: All pleadings and other papers filed under seal in civil and criminal actions shall be maintained under seal for thirty days following final disposition of the action. After that time, all sealed pleadings and other papers shall be placed in the case record unless a District Judge or Magistrate Judge, upon motion and for good cause shown, orders that the pleading or other paper be maintained under seal. The deadline for filing any motions regarding the unsealing of any document shall be within thirty days of the final disposition of any action and shall contain a concise statement of reasons for maintaining the pleading or other paper under seal. ATTENTION: If a motion to retain documents under seal is NOT filed, all documents shall be placed in the public case record, unless specifically identified in the attached General Order Signed by Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick on 7/8/2019. (NLT) (Entered: 09/28/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) ORDER Remanding Case to 19th Judicial District Court. Certified copy of this order sent to 19th Judicial District Court. Signed by Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick on 09/28/2021. (NLT) (Entered: 09/28/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) RULING Adopting #31 Report and Recommendation of the U.S. Magistrate Judge. The #3 Motion to Remand is GRANTED and this matter shall be remanded. Judgment shall be entered accordingly. Signed by Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick on 09/28/2021. (NLT) (Entered: 09/28/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) OBJECTION to #31 Report and Recommendations and Alternative Request for Jurisdictional Discovery filed by Brake Parts Inc., LLC, Ford Motor Company. (Viator, John) (Entered: 09/24/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) NOTICE of Objection to the Magistrate Judge's Report and Recommendation and Intent to File Brief on September 26, 2021 by Brake Parts Inc., LLC, Ford Motor Company re #31 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS regarding #3 Emergency MOTION to Remand filed by Tony Derouen, Scott Derouen, Jeremy Derouen, Mark Derouen, Delores L. Derouen. It is the recommendation of the Magistrate Judge that Plaintiffs' #3 Motion (Marionneaux, F.) (Entered: 09/10/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS regarding #3 Emergency MOTION to Remand filed by Tony Derouen, Scott Derouen, Jeremy Derouen, Mark Derouen, Delores L. Derouen. It is the recommendation of the Magistrate Judge that Plaintiffs' #3 Motion to Remand be GRANTED, and this action be REMANDED to the 19th Judicial District Court, East Baton Rouge Parish, Louisiana. Objections to R&R due by 9/10/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 8/27/2021. (SWE) (Entered: 08/27/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) ORDER granting #29 Motion to Dismiss, With Prejudice. All claims of the plaintiffs, Dolores L. Derouen, Scott J. Derouen, Jeremy A. Derouen, Tony J. Derouen, and Mark Derouen,against defendant, Caterpillar Inc. only, be, and hereby are, dismissed, with prejudice, with each party to bear its own costs. Signed by Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick on 8/23/2021. (LLH) (Entered: 08/23/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) MOTION to Dismiss Caterpillar Inc. by Delores L. Derouen, Jeremy Derouen, Mark Derouen, Scott Derouen, Tony Derouen. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Arceneaux, Jeanne) (Entered: 08/20/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) ORDER granting #23 Motion for Vincent J. Palmiotto to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of defendant BWDAC, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 6/7/2021. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (SGO) ATTENTION: Local counsel shall provide the following link to those attorneys granted leave to proceed pro hac vice in the Middle District of Louisiana who choose to register for e-file access #www.lamd.uscourts.gov/pro-hac-vice-e-filing-registration. (Entered: 06/07/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) NOTICE of Amended Affidavit to Motion for Admission of Vincent J. Palmiotto Pro Hac Vice by BWDAC, Inc. re #23 MOTION for Vincent J. Palmiotto to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-2292854) (Harrison, William) (Entered: 06/04/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
24 More Docket Entries
  • 04/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION to Substitute RESPONSE in Opposition by Brake Parts Inc., LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading;, #2 Attachment)(Marionneaux, F.) (Entered: 04/20/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) RESPONSE in Opposition to #3 Emergency MOTION to Remand filed by Brake Parts Inc., LLC. (Marionneaux, F.) (Main Document 7 replaced on 4/23/2021 in accordance with RD 10) (SWE). (Entered: 04/20/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Ford Motor Company. (Rudin, Skylar) (Entered: 04/20/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Brake Parts Inc., LLC. (Marionneaux, F.) (Entered: 04/19/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION(S) REFERRED: #3 Emergency MOTION to Remand . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (ELW) (Entered: 04/19/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER granting #2 MOTION to Substitute. The Clerk's Office shall substitute R. Doc. 2-2 in place of R. Doc. 1. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 4/19/2021. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (SGO) (Entered: 04/19/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Emergency MOTION to Remand with Request for Expedited Consideration by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Attachment)(Cheek, Lindsey) Modified on 4/19/2021 to edit text (ELW). (Entered: 04/17/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION(S) REFERRED: #2 MOTION to Substitute Notice of Removal . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (LLH) (Entered: 04/16/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION to Substitute Notice of Removal by Brake Parts Inc., LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading;, #2 Attachment)(Marionneaux, F.) (Entered: 04/16/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 19th Judicial District Court, State of Louisiana, Case Number C-695843. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number BLAMDC-2274594), filed by Brake Parts Inc., LLC. (Attachments: #1 Attachment, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit, #16 Exhibit, #17 Exhibit, #18 Exhibit, #19 Exhibit, #20 Exhibit, #21 Exhibit, #22 Exhibit, #23 Exhibit, #24 Exhibit, #25 Exhibit, #26 Exhibit, #27 Exhibit, #28 Exhibit, #29 Exhibit, #30 Exhibit, #31 Exhibit, #32 Exhibit, #33 Exhibit, #34 Exhibit, #35 Exhibit, #36 Exhibit, #37 Exhibit, #38 Exhibit, #39 Exhibit, #40 Exhibit, #41 Exhibit, #42 Exhibit, #43 Exhibit, #44 Attachment, #45 Attachment, #46 Attachment)(Marionneaux, F.) Modified on 4/15/2021 to edit the text (NLT). (Main Document 1 replaced on 4/20/2021 in accordance with RD 4) (KMW). (Entered: 04/15/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BRAKE PARTS INC. LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where CARLISLE INDUSTRIAL BRAKE & FRICTION INC is a litigant

Latest cases where Taylor-Seidenbach, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where MORSE TEC LLC FKA BORGWARNER MORSE TEC LLC AS SUCCESSOR-BY-MERGER TO BORGWARNER CORPORATION is a litigant