This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/14/2020 at 08:47:09 (UTC).

Julie Dermansky v. Blavity, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 09/15/2020 Julie Dermansky filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against Blavity, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr and Alicia G. Rosenberg. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-08458

  • Filing Date:

    09/15/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr

Referral Judge

Alicia G. Rosenberg

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Julie Dermansky

Defendants

DOES 1 through 10

Blavity, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Scott A Burroughs

Attorney at Doniger Burroughs

603 Rose Avenue

Venice, CA 90291

Stephen M Doniger

Attorney at Doniger Burroughs

603 Rose Avenue

Venice, CA 90291

David Shein

Attorney at Doniger Burroughs

603 Rose Avenue

Venice, CA 90291

 

Court Documents

#1

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

#10

#11

#12

#13

13 #1

Plaintiff's Notice of Dismissal of Action

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) REPORT ON THE DETERMINATION OF AN ACTION Regarding a Copyright. (Closing) (Attachments: #1 Plaintiff's Notice of Dismissal of Action) (gk) (Entered: 11/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff Julie Dermansky. Dismissal is With Prejudice. (Burroughs, Scott) (Entered: 11/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Julie Dermansky. upon Blavity, Inc. waiver sent by Plaintiff on 10/6/2020, answer due 12/7/2020. Waiver of Service signed by Crystal A. Nwaneri, Esq.. (Burroughs, Scott) (Entered: 10/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER OF THE CHIEF JUDGE (#20-098) approved by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. Pursuant to the recommended procedure adopted by the Court for the creation of thecalendar of Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr.,IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the following cases are hereby transferred from thecalendar of Judge Dale S. Fischer to the calendar of Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr.: The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:20-cv-08458 SB (AGRx). (esa) (Entered: 09/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE DALE S. FISCHER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dale S. Fischer. If a party would be entitled to attorneys fees, counsel are referred to the Order Re Fees found on Court&s website under Judge Fischer&s Procedures and Schedules contained in the Judge&s Requirements tab. Read all Orders carefully. They govern this case and differ in some respects from the Local Rules. COUNSEL ARE ORDERED TO PROVIDE A MANDATORY CHAMBERS COPY OF THE COMPLAINT, NOTICE OF REMOVAL, AND ANY OTHER INITIATING DOCUMENTS. (rfi) (Entered: 09/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendant Blavity, Inc. (esa) (Entered: 09/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa) (Entered: 09/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dale S. Fischer and Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. (esa) (Entered: 09/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Julie Dermansky. (Burroughs, Scott) (Entered: 09/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Julie Dermansky. (Burroughs, Scott) (Entered: 09/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Julie Dermansky, identifying BLAVITY, INC.. (Burroughs, Scott) (Entered: 09/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Julie Dermansky. (Burroughs, Scott) (Entered: 09/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-28094036 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Julie Dermansky. (Attorney Scott A Burroughs added to party Julie Dermansky(pty:pla))(Burroughs, Scott) (Entered: 09/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BLAVITY INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer David Shein

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Scott A Burroughs

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Stephen M Doniger