This case was last updated from PACER on 02/04/2020 at 07:46:22 (UTC).

Deriso v. Target Corporation

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 Deriso filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Target Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Daniel C. Irick and Anne C. Conway. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:19-CV-02301

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Middle District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Daniel C. Irick

Presiding Judge

Anne C. Conway

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Edith Deriso

Defendant

Target Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Grant R. Gillenwater

Attorney at Morgan & Morgan, P.A

940 S Harbor City Blvd

Melbourne, FL 32901

Edward Carnel Combs, Jr.

Attorney at Morgan & Morgan, PA

940 S. Harbor City Dr.

Melbourne, FL 32901

Defendant Attorney

James A. Coleman

Attorney at James A. Coleman, PA

Suite 250, 612 E Colonial Dr

Orlando, FL 32803

 

Court Documents

18 #1

Exhibit Court Docket

#18

(#18) RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re #14 Order on Motion for Attorney Fees filed by Target Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Court Docket)(Coleman, James) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

#17

(#17) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #8 Related case/interested persons/ECF-2 by Edith Deriso. (Combs, Edward) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

#16

(#16) NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #8 Related case/interested persons/ECF-2 per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Edith Deriso. Related case(s): no. (Combs, Edward) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

#15

(#15) ORDER directing compliance to Plaintiff to the Related Case and Interested Persons Order #8. Responses due by 1/28/2020 Signed by Judge Anne C. Conway on 1/14/2020. (copies mailed/emailed)(AKC) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

#14

(#14) ORDER denying without prejudice #13 Motion for Attorney Fees. On or before January 14, 2020, Target shall SHOW CAUSE in writing why this case should not be remanded to state court.See Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick on 12/30/2019. (RN) Modified on 1/2/2020 (MEJ). (Entered: 12/30/2019)

#13

(#13) Amended MOTION for Attorney Fees by Target Corporation. (Coleman, James) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick. (Entered: 12/26/2019)

#11

(#11) MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Edith Deriso. (Combs, Edward) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick. (Entered: 12/12/2019)

#10

(#10) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #8 Related case/interested persons/ECF-2 by Target Corporation. (Coleman, James) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #8 Related case/interested persons/ECF-2 per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Target Corporation. Related case(s): no (Coleman, James) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

#8

(#8) RELATED CASE ORDER, NOTICE OF DESIGNATION under Local Rule 3.05-Track 2, INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER and ORDER Requiring Electronic Filing. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 12/26/2019, Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 12/26/2019. Signed by Judge Anne C. Conway on 12/12/2019. (copies mailed/emailed)(AKC) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

#6

(#6) MOTION for Costs, Expenses, and Attorney Fees by Target Corporation. (MEJ) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick. (Entered: 12/09/2019)

#4

(#4) NOTICE by Target Corporation re #1 Notice of Removal (Coleman, James) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

1 #4

Exhibit 4

1 #3

Exhibit 3

1 #2

Exhibit 2

1 #1

Exhibit 1

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Brevard County Circuit Court, case number 05-2019-CA-028555-XXXX-XX filed in State Court on May 13, 2019. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 113A-16224155 filed by Target Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Coleman, James) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re #14 Order on Motion for Attorney Fees filed by Target Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Court Docket)(Coleman, James) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #8 Related case/interested persons/ECF-2 by Edith Deriso. (Combs, Edward) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #8 Related case/interested persons/ECF-2 per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Edith Deriso. Related case(s): no. (Combs, Edward) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ORDER directing compliance to Plaintiff to the Related Case and Interested Persons Order #8. Responses due by 1/28/2020 Signed by Judge Anne C. Conway on 1/14/2020. (copies mailed/emailed)(AKC) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • DocketSet/reset deadlines/hearings: Show Cause Response due by 1/14/2020 (MEJ) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ORDER denying without prejudice #13 Motion for Attorney Fees. On or before January 14, 2020, Target shall SHOW CAUSE in writing why this case should not be remanded to state court.See Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick on 12/30/2019. (RN) Modified on 1/2/2020 (MEJ). (Entered: 12/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Amended MOTION for Attorney Fees by Target Corporation. (Coleman, James) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick. (Entered: 12/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ENDORSED ORDER granting #11 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Grant R. Gillenwater is terminated as counsel in this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick on 12/13/2019. (Irick, Daniel) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Edith Deriso. (Combs, Edward) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick. (Entered: 12/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #8 Related case/interested persons/ECF-2 by Target Corporation. (Coleman, James) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #8 Related case/interested persons/ECF-2 per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Target Corporation. Related case(s): no (Coleman, James) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) RELATED CASE ORDER, NOTICE OF DESIGNATION under Local Rule 3.05-Track 2, INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER and ORDER Requiring Electronic Filing. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 12/26/2019, Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 12/26/2019. Signed by Judge Anne C. Conway on 12/12/2019. (copies mailed/emailed)(AKC) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ENDORSED ORDER denying without prejudice #6 Motion for Costs, Expenses, and Attorney/Paralegal Fees Pursuant to Florida Statute Section 768.79 and Florida Rule of Civil Procedure 1.442. The motion, filed in state court, is not compliant with the rules of this Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick on 12/9/2019. (Irick, Daniel) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION for Costs, Expenses, and Attorney Fees by Target Corporation. (MEJ) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick. (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • Docket(#5) NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Anne C. Conway and Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick. New case number: 6:19-cv-2301-Orl-22DCI. (SJB) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE by Target Corporation re #1 Notice of Removal (Coleman, James) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Defendant, Target Corporation's, ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #2 Complaint with Jury Demand filed in Brevard County Circuit Court on 6/26/19 by Target Corporation.(Coleman, James) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) COMPLAINT filed in Brevard County Circuit Court on 5/13/19 against Target Corporation with Jury Demand filed by Target Corporation.(Coleman, James) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Brevard County Circuit Court, case number 05-2019-CA-028555-XXXX-XX filed in State Court on May 13, 2019. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 113A-16224155 filed by Target Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Coleman, James) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less