This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/27/2022 at 07:47:47 (UTC).

DERESH v. CITY OF PITTSBURGH

Case Summary

On 04/28/2022 DERESH filed a Civil Right - Employment Disability Discrimination lawsuit against CITY OF PITTSBURGH. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Western District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Robert J. Colville. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-00636

  • Filing Date:

    04/28/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Disability Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Robert J. Colville

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JOSEPH M. DERESH

Defendant

CITY OF PITTSBURGH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Cristina Smith Correnti

Attorney at Rothman Gordon

310 Grant Street, Ste Third Floor

Pittsburgh, PA 15219

Defendant Attorneys

Michael E. Kennedy

Attorney at City of Pittsburgh, Department of Law

313 City-County Building, 414 Grant Street

Pittsburgh, PA 15219

Emily McNally

Attorney at City of Pittsburgh

313 City-County Building, 414 Grant Street

Pittsburgh, PA 15219

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Exhibit A

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Michael E. Kennedy on behalf of CITY OF PITTSBURGH. (Kennedy, Michael) (Entered: 04/29/2022)

#3

(#3) NOTICE that instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (cjo) (Entered: 04/29/2022)

#4

(#4) ORDER RE: Rule 12(b) Motions (details more fully stated in said Order). Signed by Judge Robert J. Colville on 4/29/22. (cjo) (Entered: 04/29/2022)

#5

(#5) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by JOSEPH M. DERESH. (Cordes, Samuel) (Entered: 04/29/2022)

#7

(#7) ANSWER to Complaint by CITY OF PITTSBURGH. (McNally, Emily) (Entered: 05/05/2022)

8 #8

Main Document

8 #1

1: Stipulation Selecting ADR

8 #2

2: Rule 26(f) form

9 #9

Main Document

9 #1

Proposed Order

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER granting #9 Joint MOTION to Continue Initial Case Management Conference and Extension of Related Requirements by JOSEPH M. DERESH. Telephonic Initial Case Management previously set for 6/29/2022 at 11:30 AM before Judge Robert J. Colville is rescheduled to 10/5/22 at 9:00 AM. ADR Stipulation and Rule 26f Meeting Report due by 9/28/2022, Joint Pre Conference Statement due by 9/28/2022. Dial-In Information will be circulated to the parties in advance of the hearing.. Signed by Judge Robert J. Colville on 5/31/22. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (cjo) (Entered: 05/31/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Joint MOTION to Continue Initial Case Management Conference and Extension of Related Requirements by JOSEPH M. DERESH. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Correnti, Cristina) (Entered: 05/31/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MEMORANDUM ORDER SETTING PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE OF COUNSEL: Telephonic Initial Case Management set for 6/29/2022 at 11:30 AM before Judge Robert J. Colville. ADR Stipulation and Rule 26f Meeting Report due by 6/17/2022, Joint Pre Conference Statement due by 6/24/2022. Details more fully stated in the order. Dial-In Information will be circulated to the parties in advance of the hearing. Signed by Judge Robert J. Colville on 5/13/22. (Attachments: #1 1: Stipulation Selecting ADR, #2 2: Rule 26(f) form) (cjo) (Entered: 05/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ANSWER to Complaint by CITY OF PITTSBURGH. (McNally, Emily) (Entered: 05/05/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #5 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. ERROR: Proposed Order was not attached. CORRECTION: Attorney is advised that in the future, a proposed order is to be filed as an attachment to the Motion. Since this Motion has been ruled on, THIS MESSAGE IS FOR INFORMATIONAL PURPOSES ONLY. NO ACTION REQUIRED. (lar) (Entered: 04/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER granting #5 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Samuel J. Cordes terminated as to Joseph Deresh. Signed by Judge Robert J. Colville on 4/29/22. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (cjo) (Entered: 04/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by JOSEPH M. DERESH. (Cordes, Samuel) (Entered: 04/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER RE: Rule 12(b) Motions (details more fully stated in said Order). Signed by Judge Robert J. Colville on 4/29/22. (cjo) (Entered: 04/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE that instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (cjo) (Entered: 04/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Michael E. Kennedy on behalf of CITY OF PITTSBURGH. (Kennedy, Michael) (Entered: 04/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Allegheny County, case number GD 22-3456 with Jury Demand Copies attached: Complaint, Notice to Defend (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $402, receipt number APAWDC-7076249), filed by CITY OF PITTSBURGH. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (lar) (Entered: 04/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Emily McNally

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael E. Kennedy