This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/23/2022 at 08:16:07 (UTC).

Deras v Remco Demolition LLC et al

Case Summary

On 02/22/2022 Deras filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Remco Demolition LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Kansas District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Eric F. Melgren and Teresa J. James. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-02078

  • Filing Date:

    02/22/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Eric F. Melgren

Referral Judge

Teresa J. James

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Marco T. Deras

Defendants

Remco Demolition LLC

Everest National Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Dustin L. DeVaughn

Attorney at DeVaughn James Injury Lawyers

3241 North Toben Street

Wichita, KS 67226

Jeffrey Alan Wilson

Attorney at DeVaughn James Injury Lawyers

3241 North Toben Street

Wichita, KS 67226

Defendant Attorneys

Kathryn M. O'Shea

Attorney at Wallace Saunders Austin Brown & Enochs Chartered - OP

10111 W. 87Th Street

Overland Park, KS 66212

Kevin D. Weakley

Attorney at Wallace Saunders Austin Brown & Enochs Chartered - OP

10111 W. 87Th Street

Overland Park, KS 66212

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $402, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5720168.), filed by Marco Deras.(Wilson, Jeffrey) (Entered: 02/22/2022)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Marco Deras. (Wilson, Jeffrey) (Entered: 02/22/2022)

#3

(#3) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Certified Mail by Marco T. Deras upon Remco Demolition LLC served on 3/4/2022, answer due 3/25/2022 (Wilson, Jeffrey) (Entered: 03/14/2022)

#4

(#4) ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Kathryn M. O'Shea on behalf of Remco Demolition LLC (O'Shea, Kathryn) (Entered: 03/25/2022)

#5

(#5) MOTION to Dismiss and/or to Strike Allegations in Plaintiff's Complaint by Defendant Remco Demolition LLC (O'Shea, Kathryn) (Entered: 03/25/2022)

#6

(#6) MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #5 MOTION to Dismiss and/or to Strike Allegations in Plaintiff's Complaint by Defendant Remco Demolition LLC(O'Shea, Kathryn) (Entered: 03/25/2022)

#7

(#7) ANSWER to Complaint by Remco Demolition LLC.(O'Shea, Kathryn) (Entered: 03/25/2022)

#8

(#8) DEMAND FOR TRIAL BY JURY by Remco Demolition LLC. (O'Shea, Kathryn) (Entered: 03/25/2022)

#9

(#9) DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Defendant Remco Demolition LLC - trial to be held in Kansas City. (O'Shea, Kathryn) (Entered: 03/25/2022)

#10

(#10) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Remco Demolition LLC identifying None as corporate parent . (O'Shea, Kathryn) (Entered: 03/25/2022)

#11

(#11) ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Kevin D. Weakley on behalf of Remco Demolition LLC. (Weakley, Kevin) (Entered: 03/25/2022)

12 #12

Main Document

12 #1

Exhibit 1

#13

(#13) RESPONSE by Plaintiff Marco T. Deras re #5 Motion to Dismiss. (Wilson, Jeffrey) (Entered: 04/14/2022)

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ORDER: due to the filing of the amended complaint, the Court is denying as moot #5 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Chief District Judge Eric F. Melgren on 4/15/2022. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (cm) (Entered: 04/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED as to Everest National Insurance Company. (issued to Attorney for service) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (kas) (Entered: 04/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) RESPONSE by Plaintiff Marco T. Deras re #5 Motion to Dismiss. (Wilson, Jeffrey) (Entered: 04/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Everest National Insurance Company, Remco Demolition LLC, filed by Marco T. Deras. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Wilson, Jeffrey) (Entered: 04/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Kevin D. Weakley on behalf of Remco Demolition LLC. (Weakley, Kevin) (Entered: 03/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Remco Demolition LLC identifying None as corporate parent . (O'Shea, Kathryn) (Entered: 03/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Defendant Remco Demolition LLC - trial to be held in Kansas City. (O'Shea, Kathryn) (Entered: 03/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) DEMAND FOR TRIAL BY JURY by Remco Demolition LLC. (O'Shea, Kathryn) (Entered: 03/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ANSWER to Complaint by Remco Demolition LLC.(O'Shea, Kathryn) (Entered: 03/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #5 MOTION to Dismiss and/or to Strike Allegations in Plaintiff's Complaint by Defendant Remco Demolition LLC(O'Shea, Kathryn) (Entered: 03/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION to Dismiss and/or to Strike Allegations in Plaintiff's Complaint by Defendant Remco Demolition LLC (O'Shea, Kathryn) (Entered: 03/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Kathryn M. O'Shea on behalf of Remco Demolition LLC (O'Shea, Kathryn) (Entered: 03/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Certified Mail by Marco T. Deras upon Remco Demolition LLC served on 3/4/2022, answer due 3/25/2022 (Wilson, Jeffrey) (Entered: 03/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED as to Remco Demolition LLC. (issued to Attorney for service) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (lb) (Entered: 02/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to Chief District Judge Eric F. Melgren and Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ada) (Entered: 02/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Marco Deras. (Wilson, Jeffrey) (Entered: 02/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $402, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5720168.), filed by Marco Deras.(Wilson, Jeffrey) (Entered: 02/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RAMCO DEMOLITION INC is a litigant

Latest cases where EVEREST NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kevin D. Weakley