This case was last updated from PACER on 02/01/2020 at 07:45:12 (UTC).

DePond et al v. Heidenreich et al

Case Summary

On 12/03/2019 DePond filed a Property - Personal Property Fraud lawsuit against Heidenreich. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Missouri Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is John A. Ross. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-03191

  • Filing Date:

    12/03/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Fraud

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Missouri Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John A. Ross

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

The John L. DePond and Patricia I. DePond Revocable Trust Dated November 25, 1992, as amended and restated - Survivors Trust

John L. Depond

Patricia I. DePond

Defendants

Paul D. Heidenreich

Chesterfield, MO 63005

Carolyn D. Heidenreich

Chesterfield, MO 63005

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Bryan P. Cavanaugh

Attorney at THE CAVANAUGH LAW FIRM, L.L.C.

512 Sunnyside Ave.

St. Louis, MO 63119

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) ORDER OF DISMISSAL re: #7 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by All Plaintiffs. SO ORDERED. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 12/19/2019. (CLO) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by All Plaintiffs (Cavanaugh, Bryan) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

#6

(#6) SUPPLEMENTAL (Summons) by Plaintiffs Patricia I. DePond, John L. Depond, The John L. DePond and Patricia I. DePond Revocable Trust Dated November 25, 1992, as amended and restated - Survivors Trust. (Cavanaugh, Bryan) Modified on 12/5/2019 (CBL). (Entered: 12/04/2019)

#5

(#5) SUPPLEMENTAL (Summons) by Plaintiffs Patricia I. DePond, John L. Depond, The John L. DePond and Patricia I. DePond Revocable Trust Dated November 25, 1992, as amended and restated - Survivors Trust. (Cavanaugh, Bryan) Modified on 12/5/2019 (CBL). (Entered: 12/04/2019)

#4

(#4) SUPPLEMENTAL (Original Filing Form) by Plaintiffs Patricia I. DePond, John L. Depond, The John L. DePond and Patricia I. DePond Revocable Trust Dated November 25, 1992, as amended and restated - Survivors Trust. (Cavanaugh, Bryan) Modified on 12/5/2019 (CBL). (Entered: 12/04/2019)

#3

(#3) SUPPLEMENTAL (Civil Cover Sheet) by Plaintiffs Patricia I. DePond, John L. Depond, The John L. DePond and Patricia I. DePond Revocable Trust Dated November 25, 1992, as amended and restated - Survivors Trust. (Cavanaugh, Bryan) Modified on 12/5/2019 (CBL). (Entered: 12/04/2019)

#2

(#2) NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiffs Patricia I. DePond, John L. Depond, The John L. DePond and Patricia I. DePond Revocable Trust Dated November 25, 1992, as amended and restated - Survivors Trust (Cavanaugh, Bryan) (Entered: 12/03/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT for Damages and Constructive Trust against defendant All Plaintiffs with receipt number AMOEDC-7618142, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by John L. Depond, Patricia I. DePond, The John L. DePond and Patricia I. DePond Revocable Trust Dated November 25, 1992, as amended and restated - Survivors Trust.(Cavanaugh, Bryan) (Entered: 12/03/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER OF DISMISSAL re: #7 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by All Plaintiffs. SO ORDERED. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 12/19/2019. (CLO) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by All Plaintiffs (Cavanaugh, Bryan) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • DocketCase Opening Notification: 2 Summons(es) issued. The summons was emailed to Bryan P. Cavanaugh. Judge Assigned: Honorable John A. Ross. (MFG) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUPPLEMENTAL (Summons) by Plaintiffs Patricia I. DePond, John L. Depond, The John L. DePond and Patricia I. DePond Revocable Trust Dated November 25, 1992, as amended and restated - Survivors Trust. (Cavanaugh, Bryan) Modified on 12/5/2019 (CBL). (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUPPLEMENTAL (Summons) by Plaintiffs Patricia I. DePond, John L. Depond, The John L. DePond and Patricia I. DePond Revocable Trust Dated November 25, 1992, as amended and restated - Survivors Trust. (Cavanaugh, Bryan) Modified on 12/5/2019 (CBL). (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUPPLEMENTAL (Original Filing Form) by Plaintiffs Patricia I. DePond, John L. Depond, The John L. DePond and Patricia I. DePond Revocable Trust Dated November 25, 1992, as amended and restated - Survivors Trust. (Cavanaugh, Bryan) Modified on 12/5/2019 (CBL). (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUPPLEMENTAL (Civil Cover Sheet) by Plaintiffs Patricia I. DePond, John L. Depond, The John L. DePond and Patricia I. DePond Revocable Trust Dated November 25, 1992, as amended and restated - Survivors Trust. (Cavanaugh, Bryan) Modified on 12/5/2019 (CBL). (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiffs Patricia I. DePond, John L. Depond, The John L. DePond and Patricia I. DePond Revocable Trust Dated November 25, 1992, as amended and restated - Survivors Trust (Cavanaugh, Bryan) (Entered: 12/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT for Damages and Constructive Trust against defendant All Plaintiffs with receipt number AMOEDC-7618142, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by John L. Depond, Patricia I. DePond, The John L. DePond and Patricia I. DePond Revocable Trust Dated November 25, 1992, as amended and restated - Survivors Trust.(Cavanaugh, Bryan) (Entered: 12/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less