This case was last updated from PACER on 11/21/2021 at 09:43:29 (UTC).

Department of Transportation v. City of Raleigh et al

Case Summary

On 09/22/2021 Department of Transportation filed an Other lawsuit against City of Raleigh. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, North Carolina Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is James C. Dever, III. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:21-CV-00383

  • Filing Date:

    09/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James C. Dever, III

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Department of Transportation

Defendants

City of Raleigh

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

John F. Oates, Jr.

Attorney at North Carolina Department of Justice - Transportation Sectio

1505 Mail Service Center

Raleigh, NC 27699-1505

Defendant Attorneys

Andrew Joseph Seymour

Attorney at City of Raleigh

Post Office Box 590

Raleigh, NC 27602

Dahr Joseph Tanoury

Attorney at City of Raleigh

Post Office Box 590

Raleigh, NC 27602

Neal Fowler

Attorney at United States Attorney's Office - EDNC

150 Fayetteville Street, Suite 2100

Raleigh, NC 27601

 

Court Documents

16 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#16

(#16) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time for Rule 26(f) Meeting and to File Discovery Plan filed by City of Raleigh. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Seymour, Andrew) (Entered: 10/21/2021)

#15

(#15) ORDER FOR DISCOVERY PLAN - Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 10/12/2021. Sent to Dahr Joseph Tanoury at City of Raleigh City Attorney's OfficePost Office Box 590 Raleigh, NC 27602 and John F. Oates, Jr. Special Deputy Attorney General Transportation Section at 505 Mail Service Center Raleigh, North Carolina 27699-1505 via US Mail. (Sellers, N.) (Entered: 10/12/2021)

14 #1

Exhibit 1 - State Court Answer

#14

(#14) Notice filed by City of Raleigh Notice of Filing of State Court Answer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - State Court Answer) (Seymour, Andrew) (Entered: 10/08/2021)

#13

(#13) Financial Disclosure Statement filed by City of Raleigh. (Sellers, N.) (Entered: 10/06/2021)

#12

(#12) Notice of Appearance filed by Dahr Joseph Tanoury on behalf of City of Raleigh. (Sellers, N.) (Entered: 10/06/2021)

#11

(#11) Financial Disclosure Statement filed by Department of Transportation. (Sellers, N.) (Entered: 10/06/2021)

#10

(#10) Notice of Appearance filed by John F. Oates, Jr on behalf of Department of Transportation. (Sellers, N.) (Entered: 10/06/2021)

#9

(#9) ORDER granting #7 Motion for Leave to File; granting #8 Motion for Leave to File. Mr. Oates and Mr. Tanoury may manually file in this case until November 15, 2021. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 10/6/2021. Sent to John F. Oates, Jr. Special Deputy Attorney General Transportation Section at 505 Mail Service Center Raleigh, North Carolina 27699-1505 and Dahr Joseph TanourySenior Associate City Attorney at P.O. Box 1949 Raleigh, NC 27602 via US Mail. (Sellers, N.) (Entered: 10/06/2021)

8 #3

Text of Proposed Order

8 #2

Financial Disclosure Statement

8 #1

Notice of Appearance

#8

(#8) MOTION for Leave to File Manually filed by City of Raleigh. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Appearance, #2 Financial Disclosure Statement, #3 Text of Proposed Order) (Sellers, N.) (Entered: 10/05/2021)

7 #4

Text of Proposed Order

7 #3

Financial Disclosure

7 #2

Notice of Appearance

7 #1

Email regarding CM/ECF class registration

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTEXT ORDER granting the parties' Joint Motion for Extension of Time #16 . For good cause shown, it is ordered that the parties have up to and including December 13, 2021, within which to hold a Rule 26(f) meeting. The parties shall file a discovery plan within 14 days of the Rule 26(f) meeting. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 10/22/2021. (Hockaday, A.) (Entered: 10/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion Referred to Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court regarding #16 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time for Rule 26(f) Meeting and to File Discovery Plan. (Sellers, N.) (Entered: 10/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time for Rule 26(f) Meeting and to File Discovery Plan filed by City of Raleigh. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Seymour, Andrew) (Entered: 10/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ORDER FOR DISCOVERY PLAN - Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 10/12/2021. Sent to Dahr Joseph Tanoury at City of Raleigh City Attorney's OfficePost Office Box 590 Raleigh, NC 27602 and John F. Oates, Jr. Special Deputy Attorney General Transportation Section at 505 Mail Service Center Raleigh, North Carolina 27699-1505 via US Mail. (Sellers, N.) (Entered: 10/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Notice filed by City of Raleigh Notice of Filing of State Court Answer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - State Court Answer) (Seymour, Andrew) (Entered: 10/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Financial Disclosure Statement filed by City of Raleigh. (Sellers, N.) (Entered: 10/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Notice of Appearance filed by Dahr Joseph Tanoury on behalf of City of Raleigh. (Sellers, N.) (Entered: 10/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Financial Disclosure Statement filed by Department of Transportation. (Sellers, N.) (Entered: 10/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Notice of Appearance filed by John F. Oates, Jr on behalf of Department of Transportation. (Sellers, N.) (Entered: 10/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER granting #7 Motion for Leave to File; granting #8 Motion for Leave to File. Mr. Oates and Mr. Tanoury may manually file in this case until November 15, 2021. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 10/6/2021. Sent to John F. Oates, Jr. Special Deputy Attorney General Transportation Section at 505 Mail Service Center Raleigh, North Carolina 27699-1505 and Dahr Joseph TanourySenior Associate City Attorney at P.O. Box 1949 Raleigh, NC 27602 via US Mail. (Sellers, N.) (Entered: 10/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotions Referred to Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court regarding #7 MOTION for Leave to File, #8 MOTION for Leave to File. (Sellers, N.) (Entered: 10/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION for Leave to File Manually filed by City of Raleigh. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Appearance, #2 Financial Disclosure Statement, #3 Text of Proposed Order) (Sellers, N.) (Entered: 10/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION for Leave to File Manually filed by Department of Transportation. (Attachments: #1 Email regarding CM/ECF class registration, #2 Notice of Appearance, #3 Financial Disclosure, #4 Text of Proposed Order) (Sellers, N.) (Entered: 10/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Financial Disclosure Statement by City of Raleigh (Seymour, Andrew) (Entered: 10/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Notice of Appearance filed by Andrew Joseph Seymour on behalf of City of Raleigh. (Seymour, Andrew) (Entered: 10/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ANSWER to Complaint by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Fowler, Neal) (Entered: 09/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Notice regarding #1 Notice of Removal and requirement to make a Notice of Appearance sent to Plaintiff's Counsel, Lisa B. Finkelstein and John F. Oates, Jr. of NC Department of Justice at 1505 Mail Service Center, Raleigh, NC 27699-1505 and Counsel for Defendant City of Raleigh, Dahr Joseph Tanoury, Senior Associate City Attorney, City of Raleigh Attorneys Office at P. O. Box 590Raleigh, NC 27602 mailed via US Mail on September 23, 2021. (Rudd, D.) (Entered: 09/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice of Appearance filed by Neal Fowler on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Fowler, Neal) (Entered: 09/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA from General Court of Justice, Superior Court Division, Civil Action, case number 20-CVS-8879., filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint (20-CVS-8879), #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Civil Cover Sheet (Supplemental Removal Cover Sheet)) (Fowler, Neal) (Entered: 09/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Neal Fowler