This case was last updated from PACER on 11/15/2019 at 07:26:54 (UTC).

Deocampo v. Equifax Information Services, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 09/16/2019 Deocampo filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Equifax Information Services, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Nevada District. The Judges overseeing this case are Richard F. Boulware, II and Nancy J. Koppe. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-01625

  • Filing Date:

    09/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Nevada District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Richard F. Boulware, II

Referral Judge

Nancy J. Koppe

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Estrellita Deocampo

Defendants

Equifax Information Services, LLC

TransUnion, LLC

Bayview Loan Servicing, LLC

Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Shaina R Plaksin

Attorney at Knepper & Clark LLC

5510 So. Fort Apache Rd, Suite 30

Las Vegas, NV 89148-7700

David H. Krieger

Attorney at Haines & Krieger, LLC

8985 S. Eastern Avenue, Suite 350

Henderson, NV 89123

Miles N Clark

Attorney at Knepper & Clark LLC

5510 So. Fort Apache Rd, Suite 30

Las Vegas, NV 89148

Matthew I Knepper

Attorney at Knepper & Clark LLC

5510 So. Fort Apache Rd, Suite 30

Las Vegas, NV 89148

Defendant Attorneys

Jeremy J. Thompson

Attorney at Clark Hill PLLC

3800 Howard Hughes Parkway, Suite 500

Las Vegas, NV 89169

Jennifer Rebecca Bergh

6900 N. Dallas Parkway, Suite 800

Plano, TX 75204

Andrew A. Bao

Attorney at Wolfe & Wyman LLP

6757 Spencer Street

Las Vegas, NV 89119

Kent F Larsen

Attorney at Smith Larsen & Wixom

1935 Village Center Circle

Las Vegas, NV 89134

 

Court Documents

#1

(#24) Joint MOTION STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME re #1 Complaint, by Defendant TransUnion, LLC. (Bergh, Jennifer) Modified on 10/31/2019 to reflect correct event (MMM). (Entered: 10/30/2019)

1 #5

Summons TransUnion

1 #4

Summons SPS

1 #3

Summons Equifax

1 #2

Summons Bayview

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Estrellita Deocampo. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Krieger, David) (Entered: 09/16/2019)

#3

(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Estrellita Deocampo re #1 Complaint,, #3 Summons Issued. Equifax Information Services, LLC served on 9/18/2019, answer due 10/9/2019. (Plaksin, Shaina) (Entered: 10/08/2019)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Estrellita Deocampo re #1 Complaint,, #3 Summons Issued. Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc served on 9/18/2019, answer due 10/9/2019. (Plaksin, Shaina) (Entered: 10/01/2019)

#33

(#33) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, filed by TransUnion, LLC.(Bergh, Jennifer) (Entered: 11/13/2019)

#32

(#32) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Equifax Information Services, LLC that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Equifax, Inc. for Equifax Information Services, LLC added. (Thompson, Jeremy) (Entered: 11/06/2019)

#31

(#31) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, filed by Equifax Information Services, LLC.(Thompson, Jeremy) (Entered: 11/06/2019)

#30

(#30) ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, filed by Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc.(Larsen, Kent) (Entered: 11/05/2019)

#25

(#25) Joint MOTION STIPULATION For Extension of Time re #1 Complaint, by Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Thompson, Jeremy) Modified event on 10/31/2019 (MMM). (Entered: 10/30/2019)

#29

(#29) ORDER Granting #25 Motion for Extension of Time re #1 Complaint. Equifax Information Services, LLC answer due 11/6/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 10/31/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR) (Entered: 10/31/2019)

#28

(#28) ORDER Granting #24 Motion for Extension of Time re #1 Complaint. TransUnion, LLC answer due 11/13/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 10/31/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR) (Entered: 10/31/2019)

#24

(#24) Joint MOTION STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME re #1 Complaint, by Defendant TransUnion, LLC. (Bergh, Jennifer) Modified on 10/31/2019 to reflect correct event (MMM). (Entered: 10/30/2019)

28 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#33) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, filed by TransUnion, LLC.(Bergh, Jennifer) (Entered: 11/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#32) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Equifax Information Services, LLC that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Equifax, Inc. for Equifax Information Services, LLC added. (Thompson, Jeremy) (Entered: 11/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#31) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, filed by Equifax Information Services, LLC.(Thompson, Jeremy) (Entered: 11/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#30) ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, filed by Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc.(Larsen, Kent) (Entered: 11/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#29) ORDER Granting #25 Motion for Extension of Time re #1 Complaint. Equifax Information Services, LLC answer due 11/6/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 10/31/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR) (Entered: 10/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#28) ORDER Granting #24 Motion for Extension of Time re #1 Complaint. TransUnion, LLC answer due 11/13/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 10/31/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR) (Entered: 10/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#27) NOTICE of Docket Correction to ECF No. #25 : Event changed by Court from Stipulation to Joint Motion; not signed by all parties in case. (no image attached) (MMM) (Entered: 10/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#26) NOTICE of Docket Correction to ECF No. #24 : Event changed by Court from Stipulation to Joint Motion; not signed by all parties in case. (no image attached) (MMM) (Entered: 10/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#25) Joint MOTION STIPULATION For Extension of Time re #1 Complaint, by Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Thompson, Jeremy) Modified event on 10/31/2019 (MMM). (Entered: 10/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) Joint MOTION STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME re #1 Complaint, by Defendant TransUnion, LLC. (Bergh, Jennifer) Modified on 10/31/2019 to reflect correct event (MMM). (Entered: 10/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 10/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Jennifer Rebecca Bergh on behalf of Defendant TransUnion, LLC. (Bergh, Jennifer) (Entered: 10/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Estrellita Deocampo re #1 Complaint,, #3 Summons Issued. Equifax Information Services, LLC served on 9/18/2019, answer due 10/9/2019. (Plaksin, Shaina) (Entered: 10/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Estrellita Deocampo re #1 Complaint,, #3 Summons Issued. Bayview Loan Servicing, LLC served on 9/18/2019, answer due 10/9/2019. (Plaksin, Shaina) (Entered: 10/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) and Proposed Order Extending Deadline to File a Response to Plaintiff's Complaint re #1 Complaint,, by Defendant Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. (Larsen, Kent) (Entered: 10/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • (#5) STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Richard F. Boulware, II. Judge Boulware's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS) (Entered: 10/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Estrellita Deocampo re #1 Complaint,, #3 Summons Issued. Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc served on 9/18/2019, answer due 10/9/2019. (Plaksin, Shaina) (Entered: 10/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Issued as to All Defendants re #1 Complaint. (MR) (Entered: 09/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • Case randomly assigned to Judge Richard F. Boulware, II and Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. (MR) (Entered: 09/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Estrellita Deocampo. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Krieger, David) (Entered: 09/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-5702944) by Estrellita Deocampo. Proof of service due by 12/15/2019. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Bayview, #3 Summons Equifax, #4 Summons SPS, #5 Summons TransUnion)(Krieger, David) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 09/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.