This case was last updated from PACER on 11/08/2019 at 07:43:15 (UTC).

Denton v. Social Security Administration

Case Summary

On 09/09/2019 a Government Benefit - Social Security Disability case was filed by Denton against Social Security Administration in the jurisdiction of U.S. District Courts, Arkansas Eastern District.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-00248

  • Filing Date:

    09/09/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security Disability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Arkansas Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Jerome T. Kearney

James M. Moody Jr.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jerry Denton

Defendant

Social Security Administration

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Stephanie Bartels Wallace

Attorney at Bartels Sherman & Wallace PLLC

Post Office Box 1640

Jonesboro, AR 72403

Defendant Attorney

Stacey Elise McCord

Attorney at U. S. Attorney's Office

Post Office Box 1229

Little Rock, AR 72203-1229

 

Court Documents

#1

RESTRICTED

#4

(#4) CONSENT to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 10/1/2019. (jak) (Entered: 10/01/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jerry Denton. Social Security Administration served on 9/23/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Wallace, Stephanie) (Entered: 10/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) CONSENT to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 10/1/2019. (jak) (Entered: 10/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. Forwarded to Plaintiff's counsel for service. (jak) (Entered: 09/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff may proceed without prepayment of fees and costs or security therefore. The Clerk is directed to issue summons to counsel for service. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 09/10/2019. (glr) (Entered: 09/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration, filed by Jerry Denton. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(jak) (Entered: 09/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jerry Denton.(jak) (Entered: 09/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less