This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/29/2021 at 09:30:03 (UTC).

Dent v. Walmart, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 06/30/2021 Dent filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Walmart, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Maryland District. The Judge overseeing this case is Deborah K. Chasanow. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:21-CV-01622

  • Filing Date:

    06/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Maryland District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Deborah K. Chasanow

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Kuchan Dent

Defendants

Wal-Mart Real Estate Business Trust

Wal-Mart Stores East, LP

Walmart, Inc.

Hotel Ambassador Co.

Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Blaine Maxwell Kolker

Attorney at Silver Kolker LLP

1120 Saint Paul St Ste 2 North

Baltimore, MD 21202

Defendant Attorneys

Jennifer M Alexander

Attorney at McNamee Hosea

888 Bestgate Rd, Suite 402

Annapolis, MD 21401

Kelly Sullivan Kylis

Attorney at McNamee Hosea

888 Bestgate Road, Suite 402

Annapolis, MD 21401

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) Correspondence re: Statement Regarding Standing Order Concerning Removal (Alexander, Jennifer) (Entered: 07/06/2021)

#7

(#7) Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP identifying Corporate Parent Walmart, Inc., Other Affiliate Wal-Mart Stores East, LP, Other Affiliate National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsubrgh, PA, Other Affiliate Wal-Mart Real Estate Business Trust, Other Affiliate WSE Management, LLC, Other Affiliate WSE Investment, LLC, Other Affiliate Wal-Mart Stores East, LLC, Other Affiliate Wal-Mart Property Co. for Wal-Mart Stores East, LP.(Alexander, Jennifer) (Entered: 07/06/2021)

#6

(#6) Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Wal-Mart Real Estate Business Trust identifying Corporate Parent Walmart, Inc., Other Affiliate Wal-Mart Stores East, LP, Other Affiliate National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsubrgh, PA, Other Affiliate Wal-Mart Real Estate Business Trust, Other Affiliate WSE Management, LLC, Other Affiliate WSE Investment, LLC, Other Affiliate Wal-Mart Stores East, LLC, Other Affiliate Wal-Mart Property Co. for Wal-Mart Real Estate Business Trust.(Alexander, Jennifer) (Entered: 07/06/2021)

#5

(#5) Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Walmart, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA, Other Affiliate Wal-Mart Real Estate Business Trust, Other Affiliate WSE Management, LLC, Other Affiliate WSE Investment, LLC, Other Affiliate Wal-Mart Stores East, LLC, Other Affiliate Wal-Mart Property Co., Other Affiliate Wal-Mart Stores East, LP for Walmart, Inc..(Alexander, Jennifer) (Entered: 07/06/2021)

#4

(#4) ANSWER to #2 Complaint by Wal-Mart Real Estate Business Trust, Wal-Mart Stores East, LP, Walmart, Inc..(Alexander, Jennifer) (Entered: 07/06/2021)

#3

(#3) Standing Order Concerning Removal. Signed by Judge Deborah K. Chasanow on 7/1/2021. (dg3s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/01/2021)

#2

(#2) STATE COURT COMPLAINT against Hotel Ambassador Co., Wal-Mart Real Estate Business Trust, Wal-Mart Stores East, LP, Walmart, Inc., filed by Kuchan Dent.(dg3s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/01/2021)

1 #7

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #6

Exhibit 6 (State Court Order Granting Motion to Defer Dismissal)

1 #5

Exhibit 5 (State Court Motion to Defer Entry of an Order of Dismissal)

1 #4

Exhibit 4 (State Court Notice of Contemplated Dismissal)

1 #3

Exhibit 3 (State Court Civil Information Report)

1 #2

Exhibit 2 (State Court Writ of Summons)

1 #1

Exhibit 1 (State Court Complaint)

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court for Calvert County, case number C-04-CV-20-000397. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0416-9354766), filed by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP, Walmart, Inc., Wal-Mart Real Estate Business Trust. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (State Court Complaint), #2 Exhibit 2 (State Court Writ of Summons), #3 Exhibit 3 (State Court Civil Information Report), #4 Exhibit 4 (State Court Notice of Contemplated Dismissal), #5 Exhibit 5 (State Court Motion to Defer Entry of an Order of Dismissal), #6 Exhibit 6 (State Court Order Granting Motion to Defer Dismissal), #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(Alexander, Jennifer) (Entered: 06/30/2021)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Correspondence re: Statement Regarding Standing Order Concerning Removal (Alexander, Jennifer) (Entered: 07/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP identifying Corporate Parent Walmart, Inc., Other Affiliate Wal-Mart Stores East, LP, Other Affiliate National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsubrgh, PA, Other Affiliate Wal-Mart Real Estate Business Trust, Other Affiliate WSE Management, LLC, Other Affiliate WSE Investment, LLC, Other Affiliate Wal-Mart Stores East, LLC, Other Affiliate Wal-Mart Property Co. for Wal-Mart Stores East, LP.(Alexander, Jennifer) (Entered: 07/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Wal-Mart Real Estate Business Trust identifying Corporate Parent Walmart, Inc., Other Affiliate Wal-Mart Stores East, LP, Other Affiliate National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsubrgh, PA, Other Affiliate Wal-Mart Real Estate Business Trust, Other Affiliate WSE Management, LLC, Other Affiliate WSE Investment, LLC, Other Affiliate Wal-Mart Stores East, LLC, Other Affiliate Wal-Mart Property Co. for Wal-Mart Real Estate Business Trust.(Alexander, Jennifer) (Entered: 07/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Walmart, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA, Other Affiliate Wal-Mart Real Estate Business Trust, Other Affiliate WSE Management, LLC, Other Affiliate WSE Investment, LLC, Other Affiliate Wal-Mart Stores East, LLC, Other Affiliate Wal-Mart Property Co., Other Affiliate Wal-Mart Stores East, LP for Walmart, Inc..(Alexander, Jennifer) (Entered: 07/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ANSWER to #2 Complaint by Wal-Mart Real Estate Business Trust, Wal-Mart Stores East, LP, Walmart, Inc..(Alexander, Jennifer) (Entered: 07/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Standing Order Concerning Removal. Signed by Judge Deborah K. Chasanow on 7/1/2021. (dg3s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • DocketTHE ABOVE DOCUMENTS (2) ARE COPIES OF ORIGINAL PAPERS FILED IN THE CIRCUIT COURT FOR CALVERT COUNTY, MARYLAND. (dg3s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) STATE COURT COMPLAINT against Hotel Ambassador Co., Wal-Mart Real Estate Business Trust, Wal-Mart Stores East, LP, Walmart, Inc., filed by Kuchan Dent.(dg3s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Deborah K. Chasanow. (ko, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court for Calvert County, case number C-04-CV-20-000397. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0416-9354766), filed by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP, Walmart, Inc., Wal-Mart Real Estate Business Trust. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (State Court Complaint), #2 Exhibit 2 (State Court Writ of Summons), #3 Exhibit 3 (State Court Civil Information Report), #4 Exhibit 4 (State Court Notice of Contemplated Dismissal), #5 Exhibit 5 (State Court Motion to Defer Entry of an Order of Dismissal), #6 Exhibit 6 (State Court Order Granting Motion to Defer Dismissal), #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(Alexander, Jennifer) (Entered: 06/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WALMART is a litigant

Latest cases where Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Wal-Mart is a litigant