This case was last updated from PACER on 03/06/2020 at 07:41:24 (UTC).

Denson v. Enterprise Leasing Company of Detroit, LLC

Case Summary

On 01/06/2020 Denson filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Enterprise Leasing Company of Detroit, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Michigan Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Michael J. Hluchaniuk and Robert H. Cleland. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-10024

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Michigan Eastern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Michael J. Hluchaniuk

Presiding Judge

Robert H. Cleland

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Brandon Denson

Defendant

Enterprise Leasing Company of Detroit, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Barry S. Fagan

Attorney at Fagan McManus, P.C.

25892 Woodward Avenue

Royal Oak, MI 48067-0910

Defendant Attorney

Jaclyn R. Giffen

Attorney at Littler Mendelson, P.C.

200 Renaissance Center, Suite 3110

Detroit, MI 48243

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Enterprise Leasing Company of Detroit, LLC (Giffen, Jaclyn) (Entered: 02/18/2020)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT AND JURY DEMAND filed by Brandon Denson against Enterprise Leasing Company of Detroit, LLC with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-7547075 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Wayne - County Where Action Arose: Macomb - County of 1st Defendant: Macomb. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Fagan, Barry) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Jaclyn R. Giffen on behalf of Enterprise Leasing Company of Detroit, LLC. (Giffen, Jaclyn) (Entered: 02/04/2020)

#2

(#2) SUMMONS Issued for *Enterprise Leasing Company of Detroit, LLC* (LGra) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

#8

(#8) NOTICE TO APPEAR: Scheduling Conference set for 3/5/2020 10:00 AM before District Judge Robert H. Cleland (LWag) (Entered: 02/20/2020)

#3

(#3) CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Enterprise Leasing Company of Detroit, LLC served on 1/14/2020, answer due 2/4/2020. (Fagan, Barry) (Entered: 01/16/2020)

#6

(#6) ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand by Enterprise Leasing Company of Detroit, LLC. (Giffen, Jaclyn) (Entered: 02/18/2020)

#9

(#9) DISCOVERY plan jointly filed pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 26(f) (Fagan, Barry) (Entered: 02/27/2020)

#5

(#5) STIPULATED ORDER Extending Deadline to File a Responsive Pleading, ( Response due by 2/18/2020) Signed by District Judge Robert H. Cleland. (LWag) (Entered: 02/05/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/05/2020
  • DocketMinute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Robert H. Cleland: Scheduling Conference held on 3/5/2020 (LWag) (Entered: 03/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) DISCOVERY plan jointly filed pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 26(f) (Fagan, Barry) (Entered: 02/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE TO APPEAR: Scheduling Conference set for 3/5/2020 10:00 AM before District Judge Robert H. Cleland (LWag) (Entered: 02/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Enterprise Leasing Company of Detroit, LLC (Giffen, Jaclyn) (Entered: 02/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand by Enterprise Leasing Company of Detroit, LLC. (Giffen, Jaclyn) (Entered: 02/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) STIPULATED ORDER Extending Deadline to File a Responsive Pleading, ( Response due by 2/18/2020) Signed by District Judge Robert H. Cleland. (LWag) (Entered: 02/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Jaclyn R. Giffen on behalf of Enterprise Leasing Company of Detroit, LLC. (Giffen, Jaclyn) (Entered: 02/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Enterprise Leasing Company of Detroit, LLC served on 1/14/2020, answer due 2/4/2020. (Fagan, Barry) (Entered: 01/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS Issued for *Enterprise Leasing Company of Detroit, LLC* (LGra) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • DocketA United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (LGra) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT AND JURY DEMAND filed by Brandon Denson against Enterprise Leasing Company of Detroit, LLC with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-7547075 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Wayne - County Where Action Arose: Macomb - County of 1st Defendant: Macomb. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Fagan, Barry) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less