Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 05/03/2021 at 07:58:06 (UTC).

Dennis Matute v. Alliance Group & Associates, LLC

Case Summary

On 03/04/2021 Dennis Matute filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Alliance Group Associates, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Jesus G. Bernal and Kenly Kiya Kato. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:21-CV-00388

  • Filing Date:

    03/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jesus G. Bernal

Referral Judge

Kenly Kiya Kato

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Dennis Matute

Defendant

Alliance Group & Associates, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Alejandro Emmanuel Figueroa

Attorney at Sulaiman Law Group Ltd

2500 South Highland Avenue Suite 200

Lombard, IL 60148

Defendant Attorneys

David J Kaminski

Attorney at Carlson and Messer LLP

5901 West Century Boulevard Suite 1200

Los Angeles, CA 90045

Garo G Yaghsezian

Attorney at Carlson and Messer LLP

5901 West Century Boulevard, Suite No. 1200

Los Angeles, CA 90045

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Settlement filed by Plaintiff Dennis Matute. (Figueroa, Alejandro) (Entered: 04/09/2021)

#10

(#10) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Alliance Group & Associates, LLC answer now due 4/28/2021, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Alliance Group & Associates, LLC.(Attorney David J Kaminski added to party Alliance Group & Associates, LLC(pty:dft))(Kaminski, David) (Entered: 04/08/2021)

#9

(#9) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Dennis Matute, upon Defendant Alliance Group & Associates, LLC served on 3/17/2021, answer due 4/7/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Lisa Culler - Registered Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Figueroa, Alejandro) (Entered: 03/24/2021)

#8

(#8) STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (ima) (Entered: 03/10/2021)

#7

(#7) 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendant Alliance Group & Associates, LLC. (esa) (Entered: 03/04/2021)

#6

(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa) (Entered: 03/04/2021)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato. (esa) (Entered: 03/04/2021)

#4

(#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Dennis Matute. (Figueroa, Alejandro) (Entered: 03/04/2021)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Dennis Matute, (Figueroa, Alejandro) (Entered: 03/04/2021)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Dennis Matute. (Figueroa, Alejandro) (Entered: 03/04/2021)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-30854401 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Dennis Matute. (Attorney Alejandro Emmanuel Figueroa added to party Dennis Matute(pty:pla))(Figueroa, Alejandro) (Entered: 03/04/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Settlement filed by Plaintiff Dennis Matute. (Figueroa, Alejandro) (Entered: 04/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Alliance Group & Associates, LLC answer now due 4/28/2021, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Alliance Group & Associates, LLC.(Attorney David J Kaminski added to party Alliance Group & Associates, LLC(pty:dft))(Kaminski, David) (Entered: 04/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Dennis Matute, upon Defendant Alliance Group & Associates, LLC served on 3/17/2021, answer due 4/7/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Lisa Culler - Registered Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Figueroa, Alejandro) (Entered: 03/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (ima) (Entered: 03/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendant Alliance Group & Associates, LLC. (esa) (Entered: 03/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa) (Entered: 03/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato. (esa) (Entered: 03/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Dennis Matute. (Figueroa, Alejandro) (Entered: 03/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Dennis Matute, (Figueroa, Alejandro) (Entered: 03/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Dennis Matute. (Figueroa, Alejandro) (Entered: 03/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-30854401 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Dennis Matute. (Attorney Alejandro Emmanuel Figueroa added to party Dennis Matute(pty:pla))(Figueroa, Alejandro) (Entered: 03/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Alejandro Emmanuel Figueroa