This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/12/2020 at 16:36:29 (UTC).

Dennis Bradshaw v. City of Los Angeles et al

Case Summary

On 07/31/2019 Dennis Bradshaw filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against City of Los Angeles. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Paul L. Abrams, Christina A. Snyder and Virginia A. Phillips. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-06661

  • Filing Date:

    07/31/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Paul L. Abrams

Presiding Judges

Christina A. Snyder

Virginia A. Phillips

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Mr. Dennis Bradshaw

Defendants

Jack Landskroner

James Clark

City of Los Angeles

Thomas Peters

Michael J. Libman

Tarzana, CA 91356

Michael Nelson Feuer

Law Offices of Michael J. Libman APC

18321 Ventura Boulevard Suite 700

Tarzana, CA 91356

The Landskroner Law Firm, Ltd.

The Landskroner Law Firm, Ltd. a limited liability company doing business as Landskroner Grieco Merriman, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Thomas Edward Gray

Attorney at The X-Law Group PC

625 Fair Oaks Avenue Suite 390

South Pasadena, CA 91030

Filippo Marchino

Attorney at The X-Law Group PC

625 Fair Oaks Avenue Suite 390

South Pasadena, CA 91030-5817

Damon Rogers

Attorney at The X Law Group PC

625 Fair Oaks Avenue Suite 390

South Pasadena, CA 91030-5817

Defendant Attorneys

Joseph P McMonigle

Attorney at Long and Levit LLP

465 California Street Suite 500

San Francisco, CA 94104

Adam R Fox

Attorney at Squire Patton Boggs US LLP

555 South Flower Street 31St Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071-2300

Maribeth Annaguey

Attorney at Browne George Ross LLP

2121 Avenue Of The Stars Suite 2800

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Eric M George

Attorney at Browne George Ross LLP

2121 Avenue Of The Stars Suite 2800

Los Angeles, CA 90067

T. John Fitzgibbons, Jr.

Attorney at Robie and Matthai APC

350 South Grand Avenue Suite 3950

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Michael J Libman

Attorney at Law Offices of Michael J Libman

18321 Ventura Boulevard Suite 700

Tarzana, CA 91356

 

Court Documents

#37

#36

#35

#34

#33

31 #1

Proposed Order

29 #2

Proposed Order

29 #1

Appendix

#29

#9

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

#1

74 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to re Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , Summons Request #3 filed by Defendants Law Offices of Michael J. Libman APC, Michael J. Libman.(Libman, Michael) (Entered: 09/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#36) NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Defendant James Clark. correcting NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #29 (Fox, Adam) (Entered: 09/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#35) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant James Clark, identifying No such parties exist.. (Fox, Adam) (Entered: 09/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#34) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by defendant Thomas Peters, (Fitzgibbons, T. John) (Entered: 09/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#33) REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #31 filed by Defendant Thomas Peters. (Fitzgibbons, T. John) (Entered: 09/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#32) REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6) #28 filed by Defendants City of Los Angeles, Michael Nelson Feuer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit 27, #28 Exhibit 28, #29 Exhibit 29, #30 Exhibit 30, #31 Exhibit 31, #32 Exhibit 32, #33 Proposed Order)(George, Eric) (Entered: 09/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#31) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by defendant Thomas Peters. Motion set for hearing on 11/4/2019 at 02:00 PM before Judge Virginia A. Phillips. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Attorney T. John Fitzgibbons, Jr added to party Thomas Peters(pty:dft)) (Fitzgibbons, T. John) (Entered: 09/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#30) REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #29 filed by Defendant James Clark. (Fox, Adam) (Entered: 09/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#29) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant James Clark. Motion set for hearing on 11/4/2019 at 02:00 PM before Judge Virginia A. Phillips. (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Proposed Order) (Attorney Adam R Fox added to party James Clark(pty:dft)) (Fox, Adam) (Entered: 09/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#28) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6) filed by Defendants City of Los Angeles, Michael Nelson Feuer. Motion set for hearing on 11/4/2019 at 02:00 PM before Judge Virginia A. Phillips. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Attorney Eric M George added to party City of Los Angeles(pty:dft)) (George, Eric) (Entered: 09/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 08/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) STANDING ORDER by Judge Virginia A. Phillips. (bh) (Entered: 08/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Christina A. Snyder. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 19-03. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Christina A. Snyder to Judge Virginia A. Phillips for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:19-cv-06661 VAP(PLAx). (rn) (Entered: 08/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to defendants City of Los Angeles, James Clark, Michael Nelson Feuer, Jack Landskroner, Law Offices of Michael J. Libman APC, Michael J. Libman, Thomas Peters, The Landskroner Law Firm, Ltd.. (lc) (Entered: 08/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Notice of Deficiency in Request to Issue Summons,, #6 filed by Plaintiff Dennis Bradshaw. (Gray, Thomas) (Entered: 08/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons. The following error(s) was found: The caption of the summons must match the caption of the complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write see attached.Next, attach a face page of the complaint or a second page addendum to the Summons. Summons is not directed to the defendant(s). The defendants name must appear in the To:section of the summons. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (jtil) (Entered: 08/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil) (Entered: 08/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams. (jtil) (Entered: 08/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff DENNIS BRADSHAW. (Gray, Thomas) (Entered: 07/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff DENNIS BRADSHAW. (Gray, Thomas) (Entered: 07/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24184207 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff DENNIS BRADSHAW. (Attorney Thomas Edward Gray added to party DENNIS BRADSHAW(pty:pla))(Gray, Thomas) (Entered: 07/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Thomas E Gray

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Filippo Marchino