This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/13/2022 at 21:42:53 (UTC).

Dennis A. Rockwell et al v. Air and Liquid Systems Corporation et al

Case Summary

On 05/11/2021 Dennis A Rockwell filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against Air and Liquid Systems Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are George H. Wu and Paul L. Abrams. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-03963

  • Filing Date:

    05/11/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

George H. Wu

Referral Judge

Paul L. Abrams

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Dawn Rockwell

Dennis A Rockwell

Defendants

ViacomCBS Inc.

Foster Wheeler LLC

Warren Pumps, LLC

Westinghouse Electric Corporation

Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation

Viacom Inc.

General Electric Company

IMO Industries, Inc.

Crane Co.

CBS Corporation

Air and Liquid Systems Corporation

Asco Valve LLC

Premier Farnell Corp. sued individually and as successor-in-interest to PREMIER INDUSTRIAL CORPORATION d/b/a AKRON BRASS CO., successor-in-interest to AKRON BRASS COMPANY and AKRON BRASS MFG. COMPANY, INC. formerly known as FAC Delaware Corp

Weir Valve and Controls USA Inc

Trane U.S. Inc. formerly known as American Standard Inc doing business as American Standard Products Inc

Clyde Union Inc

Cleaver-Brooks Inc formerly known as Aqua Chem Inc doing business as Cleaver-Brooks Division

Goulds Pumps, Inc.

64 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant and Plaintiff Attorneys

Andrew Lon Seitz

Attorney at Frost Law Firm PC

273 West 7Th Street

San Pedro, CA 90731

John M Caron

Attorney at The Law Offices of Worthington and Caron PC

273 West 7Th Street

San Pedro, CA 90731

Scott L Frost

Attorney at Frost Law Firm PC

273 West 7Th Street

San Pedro, CA 90731

Erin N Empting

825 East 4Th Street Suite 204

Los Angeles, CA 90013

Kevin D. Jamison

Attorney at Jamison Empting Cronin LLP

825 East Fourth Street Suite 204

Los Angeles, CA 90013

Justin F. Cronin

Attorney at Jamison Empting Cronin LLP

825 East 4Th Street Suite 204

Los Angeles, CA 90013

Daniel R Baltes

Attorney at Hugo Parker LLP

240 Stockton Street 8Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94108

Charles S Park

Attorney at Hugo Parker LLP

240 Stockton Street 8Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94108

Edward R Hugo

Attorney at Hugo Parker LLP

240 Stockton Street 8Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94108

Michael J. Pietrykowski

Attorney at Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani LLP

633 West 5Th Street, 52Nd Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

T Stephen Corcoran

Attorney at Pierce Davis and Perritano LLP

222 West Sixth Street Suite 448

San Pedro, CA 90731

Glen R. Powell

Attorney at Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani LLP

633 West 5Th Street 52Nd Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

James G Scadden

Attorney at Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani LLP

1111 Broadway Suite 1700

Oakland, CA 94607

Bobbie Rae Bailey

Attorney at Leader Berkon Colao & Silverstein LLP

550 South Hope Street, Suite 1850

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Edward Martinovich

Attorney at Leader Berkon Colao and Silverstein LLP

550 South Hope Street Suite 1850

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Olga Guadalupe Pena

Attorney at Leader Berkon Colao and Silverstein LLP

660 South Figueroa Street, Suite 1150

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Geoffrey M Davis

Attorney at K and L Gates LLP

10100 Santa Monica Boulevard 8Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Other Attorneys

Lindsay Weiss

Attorney at Manning Gross and Massenburg LLP

444 South Flower Street Suite 4100

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Christine D Calareso

Attorney at CMBG3 Law LLC

100 Spectrum Center Drive Suite 820

Irvine, CA 92618

Alleli P Carino

Attorney at CMBG3 Law PC

100 Spectrum Center Drive Suite 820

Irvine, CA 92618

94 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

506 #1

Proposed Order

506 #506

Main Document

#505

(#505) NOTICE of Resolution as to Defendant Alfa Laval, Inc. filed by Plaintiffs Dawn Rockwell, Dennis A Rockwell. (Seitz, Andrew) (Entered: 06/09/2022)

#504

(#504) TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to defendant Alfa Laval Inc for Court Reporter. Court will contact Rose Jones-shine at rjones-shine@hpylaw.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter. (Reeg, Ana) (Entered: 06/09/2022)

#502

(#502) TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to defendant Alfa Laval Inc for Court Reporter. Court will contact Rose Jones-shine at rjones-shine@hpylaw.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter. (Reeg, Ana) (Entered: 06/09/2022)

#501

(#501) MINUTES OF TELEPHONIC HEARING ON DEFENDANT ALFA LAVAL INC.'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT #398 Motion Hearing held before Judge George H. Wu. The Court's Tentative Ruling was issued on June 8, 2022 #500 . Court hears oral argument. For reasons stated on the record, Defendant Alfa Laval, Inc.'s Motion is taken under submission. Court and counsel discuss upcoming pretrial deadlines. The Court lifts pretrial requirements including responses to motions in limine due today, and sets a scheduling conference for June 16, 2022 at 8:30 a.m.; taking under advisement #398 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 56(a) . Court Reporter: Terri A. Hourigan. (aco) (Entered: 06/09/2022)

398 #4

Proposed Order Granting Motion for Summary Judgment

398 #3

Statement of Uncontroverted Facts and Conclusion of Law

398 #1

Memorandum

#9

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

#1

623 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#506) STIPULATION to Dismiss Defendant Weir Valve and Controls USA Inc filed by Defendant Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc. fka Atwood & Morrill Weir Valve and Controls USA Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Bergstrom, Emily) (Entered: 06/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#505) NOTICE of Resolution as to Defendant Alfa Laval, Inc. filed by Plaintiffs Dawn Rockwell, Dennis A Rockwell. (Seitz, Andrew) (Entered: 06/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#504) TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to defendant Alfa Laval Inc for Court Reporter. Court will contact Rose Jones-shine at rjones-shine@hpylaw.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter. (Reeg, Ana) (Entered: 06/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • Docket(#503) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Transcript Order Form, The following error(s) was found: INCORRECT FORM USED; INSTEAD OF USING A NORTHERN DISTRICT OF CA FORM, PLEASE USE THE TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM USED IN CENTRAL DISTRICT OF CA, WHICH IS THE G-120 FORM. INCORRECT DATE OF 6/09/2023. You must electronically refile the above referenced Request with Transcript Order Form (G-120) in this case to correct this deficiency. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ls) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 06/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#502) TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to defendant Alfa Laval Inc for Court Reporter. Court will contact Rose Jones-shine at rjones-shine@hpylaw.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter. (Reeg, Ana) (Entered: 06/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#501) MINUTES OF TELEPHONIC HEARING ON DEFENDANT ALFA LAVAL INC.'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT #398 Motion Hearing held before Judge George H. Wu. The Court's Tentative Ruling was issued on June 8, 2022 #500 . Court hears oral argument. For reasons stated on the record, Defendant Alfa Laval, Inc.'s Motion is taken under submission. Court and counsel discuss upcoming pretrial deadlines. The Court lifts pretrial requirements including responses to motions in limine due today, and sets a scheduling conference for June 16, 2022 at 8:30 a.m.; taking under advisement #398 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 56(a) . Court Reporter: Terri A. Hourigan. (aco) (Entered: 06/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#500) MINUTE ORDER - IN CHAMBERS by Judge George H. Wu: Attached hereto is the Courts Tentative Ruling on Defendant Alfa Laval, Inc.s Motion for Summary Judgment #398 set for hearing on June 9, 2022 at 8:30 a.m. (jag) (Entered: 06/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#499) NOTICE of Resolution as to Defendant Honeywell International, Inc. filed by Plaintiffs Dawn Rockwell, Dennis A Rockwell. (Seitz, Andrew) (Entered: 06/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#498) STATEMENT of Genuine Disputes Amended NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Admissible Evidence #448 filed by Defendant Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation. (Hugo, Edward) (Entered: 06/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#497) TEXT-ONLY ENTRY - IN CHAMBERS: by Judge George H. Wu: Counsel are to appear telephonically for Thursday's 06/09/2022 Motion Hearing #398 at 8:30 a.m. by contacting the court clerk at javier_gonzalez@cacd.uscourts.gov for dial-in information. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jag) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 06/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
486 More Docket Entries
  • 05/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint/Petition,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #8 filed by Plaintiffs Dawn Rockwell, Dennis A Rockwell. (Seitz, Andrew) (Entered: 05/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) First Amended NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs Dawn Rockwell, Dennis A Rockwell, identifying Defendants. (Seitz, Andrew) (Entered: 05/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) First Amended AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants Air and Liquid Systems Corporation, Crane Co., Does, Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation, Foster Wheeler LLC, General Electric Company, IMO Industries, Inc., ViacomCBS Inc., Warren Pumps, LLC, Metallo Gasket Co., Armstrong International, Inc., PCC Flow Technologies Holdings, Inc. (as sii to Johnston Pump Company and Paco Pumps), Carver Pump Company, Viking Pump, Inc., Keeler-Dorr Oliver Boiler Company, Asco Valve, LLC f/k/a Asco Valve, Inc. (sued indiv. and as sii to Foster Engineering), Johnson Controls, Inc., The Wm. Powell Company, Premier Farnell Corp. f/k/a FAC Delaware Corp. (sued indivi. and as sii to Premier Industrial Corporation d/b/a Akron Brass Co., sii to Akron Brass Company and Akron Brass Mfg. Company, Inc.), Honeywell International, Inc., Afton Pumps, Inc., Weir Valve & Controls USA, Inc. f/k/a Atwood & Morrill, Trane U.S. Inc. f/k/a American Standard, Inc. (d/b/a American Standard Porducts, Inc.), Henry Company LLC, Alfa Laval, Inc. (sued indiv. and as sii to DeLaval Separator Company and Sharples Inc.), The Nash Engineering Company, Thrush Co., Inc., Zurn Industries, Inc., Velan Valve Corp., York International Corporation (sued indiv. and as sii to Frick Company), FMC Corporation (sued indiv. and as sii to Peerless Pump Co.), Clyde Union Inc. f/k/a Union Pump Company and David Brown Union Pumps Company, Cleaver-Brooks, Inc. f/k/a Aqua Chem, Inc. d/b/a Cleaver-Brooks Division, Ruggles Klingemann Mfg. Co., Clark-Reliance Corporation (sued indiv. and as sii to Jerguson Gage & Valve Company), Chicago Bridge & Iron Company, Goulds Pumps, Inc., The W.W. Henry Company, L.P. f/k/a The W.W. Henry Company and Henry Asphalt Company, Burnham LLC (sued indiv. and as sii to Burnham Corporation), Flowserve Corporation f/k/a The Duriron Company, Inc. (as sii to BW/IP International, Inc., sii to Durco International), Tyco International (US) Inc. (sued indiv. and as sii to Lonergan Valves), Electrolux Home Products, Inc. (sued indivi. and as sii to Copes-Vulcan), R.P. Richards Construction Co., ITT Industries, Inc. (sued indiv. and as sii to Foster Engineering Company and Bell & Gossett), Superior Boiler Works, Inc., TKD, Inc. (as sii to Johnston Pump Company), Flowserve US, Inc. (as sii to Rockwell Manufacturing Company; Edward Valve, Inc.; Nordstrom Valves, Inc.; Edward Vogt Valve Company; and Vogt Valve Company), Tuthill Corporation, Spirax Sarco, Inc., Milwaukee Valve Company, Inc., Taco, Inc., Weil-McLain, a division of the Marley-Wylain Company, Fisher Controls International LLC, Riley Power Inc, Gardner Denver, Inc. (sued indiv. and sii to Emco Wheaton f/k/a Wheaton Brass Works), Fairchild Corp. (sued indiv. and as sii to Patterson Pump Co.), Akron Brass Company (sued indiv. and as sii to Akron Brass Holding Corp.), Aurora Pump Company, Reliance Worldwide Corp. Ltd. (sued indiv. and as sii to A.W. Cash Valve Manufacturing Corporation), Wilo USA LLC (sued indiv. and as sii to Weil Pump Company Inc.), BW/IP, Inc. and Its Wholly-Owned Subsidiaries, Raypak, Inc., Regal Beloit America, Inc. f/k/a RBC Manufacturing Corporation f/k/a Marathon Electric Manufacturing Corporation amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , filed by Plaintiffs Metallo Gasket Co., Armstrong International, Inc., PCC Flow Technologies Holdings, Inc. (as sii to Johnston Pump Company and Paco Pumps), Carver Pump Company, Viking Pump, Inc., Keeler-Dorr Oliver Boiler Company, Asco Valve, LLC f/k/a Asco Valve, Inc. (sued indiv. and as sii to Foster Engineering), Johnson Controls, Inc., The Wm. Powell Company, Premier Farnell Corp. f/k/a FAC Delaware Corp. (sued indivi. and as sii to Premier Industrial Corporation d/b/a Akron Brass Co., sii to Akron Brass Company and Akron Brass Mfg. Company, Inc.), Honeywell International, Inc., Afton Pumps, Inc., Weir Valve & Controls USA, Inc. f/k/a Atwood & Morrill, Trane U.S. Inc. f/k/a American Standard, Inc. (d/b/a American Standard Porducts, Inc.), Henry Company LLC, Alfa Laval, Inc. (sued indiv. and as sii to DeLaval Separator Company and Sharples Inc.), The Nash Engineering Company, Thrush Co., Inc., Zurn Industries, Inc., Velan Valve Corp., York International Corporation (sued indiv. and as sii to Frick Company), FMC Corporation (sued indiv. and as sii to Peerless Pump Co.), Clyde Union Inc. f/k/a Union Pump Company and David Brown Union Pumps Company, Cleaver-Brooks, Inc. f/k/a Aqua Chem, Inc. d/b/a Cleaver-Brooks Division, Ruggles Klingemann Mfg. Co., Clark-Reliance Corporation (sued indiv. and as sii to Jerguson Gage & Valve Company), Chicago Bridge & Iron Company, Goulds Pumps, Inc., The W.W. Henry Company, L.P. f/k/a The W.W. Henry Company and Henry Asphalt Company, Burnham LLC (sued indiv. and as sii to Burnham Corporation), Flowserve Corporation f/k/a The Duriron Company, Inc. (as sii to BW/IP International, Inc., sii to Durco International), Tyco International (US) Inc. (sued indiv. and as sii to Lonergan Valves), Electrolux Home Products, Inc. (sued indivi. and as sii to Copes-Vulcan), R.P. Richards Construction Co., ITT Industries, Inc. (sued indiv. and as sii to Foster Engineering Company and Bell & Gossett), Superior Boiler Works, Inc., TKD, Inc. (as sii to Johnston Pump Company), Flowserve US, Inc. (as sii to Rockwell Manufacturing Company; Edward Valve, Inc.; Nordstrom Valves, Inc.; Edward Vogt Valve Company; and Vogt Valve Company), Tuthill Corporation, Spirax Sarco, Inc., Milwaukee Valve Company, Inc., Taco, Inc., Weil-McLain, a division of the Marley-Wylain Company, Fisher Controls International LLC, Riley Power Inc, Gardner Denver, Inc. (sued indiv. and sii to Emco Wheaton f/k/a Wheaton Brass Works), Fairchild Corp. (sued indiv. and as sii to Patterson Pump Co.), Akron Brass Company (sued indiv. and as sii to Akron Brass Holding Corp.), Aurora Pump Company, Reliance Worldwide Corp. Ltd. (sued indiv. and as sii to A.W. Cash Valve Manufacturing Corporation), Wilo USA LLC (sued indiv. and as sii to Weil Pump Company Inc.), BW/IP, Inc. and Its Wholly-Owned Subsidiaries, Raypak, Inc., Regal Beloit America, Inc. f/k/a RBC Manufacturing Corporation f/k/a Marathon Electric Manufacturing Corporation(Attorney Andrew Lon Seitz added to party Afton Pumps, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Andrew Lon Seitz added to party Alfa Laval, Inc. (sued indiv. and as sii to DeLaval Separator Company and Sharples Inc.)(pty:dft), Attorney Andrew Lon Seitz added to party Akron Brass Company (sued indiv. and as sii to Akron Brass Holding Corp.)(pty:dft), Attorney Andrew Lon Seitz added to party Armstrong International, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Andrew Lon Seitz added to party Asco Valve, LLC f/k/a Asco Valve, Inc. (sued indiv. and as sii to Foster Engineering)(pty:dft), Attorney Andrew Lon Seitz added to party Aurora Pump Company(pty:dft), Attorney Andrew Lon Seitz added to party Burnham LLC (sued indiv. and as sii to Burnham Corporation)(pty:dft), Attorney Andrew Lon Seitz added to party BW/IP, Inc. and Its Wholly-Owned Subsidiaries(pty:dft), Attorney Andrew Lon Seitz added to party Carver Pump Company(pty:dft), Attorney Andrew Lon Seitz added to party Clark-Reliance Corporation (sued indiv. and as sii to Jerguson Gage & Valve Company)(pty:dft), Attorney Andrew Lon Seitz added to party Cleaver-Brooks, Inc. f/k/a Aqua Chem, Inc. d/b/a Cleaver-Brooks Division(pty:dft), Attorney Andrew Lon Seitz added to party Clyde Union Inc. f/k/a Union Pump Company and David Brown Union Pumps Company(pty:dft), Attorney Andrew Lon Seitz added to party Chicago Bridge & Iron Company(pty:dft), Attorney Andrew Lon Seitz added to party Electrolux Home Products, Inc. (sued indivi. and as sii to Copes-Vulcan)(pty:dft), Attorney Andrew Lon Seitz added to party Fairchild Corp. (sued indiv. and as sii to Patterson Pump Co.)(pty:dft), Attorney Andrew Lon Seitz added to party Fisher Controls International LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Andrew Lon Seitz added to party Flowserve Corporation f/k/a The Duriron Company, Inc. (as sii to BW/IP International, Inc., sii to Durco International)(pty:dft), Attorney Andrew Lon Seitz added to party Flowserve US, Inc. (as sii to Rockwell Manufacturing Company; Edward Valve, Inc.; Nordstrom Valves, Inc.; Edward Vogt Valve Company; and Vogt Valve Company)(pty:dft), Attorney Andrew Lon Seitz added to party FMC Corporation (sued indiv. and as sii to Peerless Pump Co.)(pty:dft), Attorney Andrew Lon Seitz added to party Gardner Denver, Inc. (sued indiv. and sii to Emco Wheaton f/k/a Wheaton Brass Works)(pty:dft), Attorney Andrew Lon Seitz added to party Goulds Pumps, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Andrew Lon Seitz added to party Henry Company LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Andrew Lon Seitz added to party Honeywell International, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Andrew Lon Seitz added to party ITT Industries, Inc. (sued indiv. and as sii to Foster Engineering Company and Bell & Gossett)(pty:dft), Attorney Andrew Lon Seitz added to party Johnson Controls, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Andrew Lon Seitz added to party Keeler-Dorr Oliver Boiler Company(pty:dft), Attorney Andrew Lon Seitz added to party Metallo Gasket Co.(pty:dft), Attorney Andrew Lon Seitz added to party Milwaukee Valve Company, Inc. (pty:dft), Attorney Andrew Lon Seitz added to party The Nash Engineering Company(pty:dft), Attorney Andrew Lon Seitz added to party PCC Flow Technologies Holdings, Inc. (as sii to Johnston Pump Company and Paco Pumps)(pty:dft), Attorney Andrew Lon Seitz added to party Premier Farnell Corp. f/k/a FAC Delaware Corp. (sued indivi. and as sii to Premier Industrial Corporation d/b/a Akron Brass Co., sii to Akron Brass Company and Akron Brass Mfg. Company, Inc.)(pty:dft), Attorney Andrew Lon Seitz added to party R.P. Richards Construction Co.(pty:dft), Attorney Andrew Lon Seitz added to party Raypak, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Andrew Lon Seitz added to party Regal Beloit America, Inc. f/k/a RBC Manufacturing Corporation f/k/a Marathon Electric Manufacturing Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Andrew Lon Seitz added to party Riley Power Inc(pty:dft), Attorney Andrew Lon Seitz added to party Ruggles Klingemann Mfg. Co.(pty:dft), Attorney Andrew Lon Seitz added to party Spirax Sarco, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Andrew Lon Seitz added to party Superior Boiler Works, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Andrew Lon Seitz added to party Taco, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Andrew Lon Seitz added to party Thrush Co., Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Andrew Lon Seitz added to party TKD, Inc. (as sii to Johnston Pump Company)(pty:dft), Attorney Andrew Lon Seitz added to party Trane U.S. Inc. f/k/a American Standard, Inc. (d/b/a American Standard Porducts, Inc.)(pty:dft), Attorney Andrew Lon Seitz added to party Tuthill Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Andrew Lon Seitz added to party Tyco International (US) Inc. (sued indiv. and as sii to Lonergan Valves)(pty:dft), Attorney Andrew Lon Seitz added to party Velan Valve Corp.(pty:dft), Attorney Andrew Lon Seitz added to party Viking Pump, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Andrew Lon Seitz added to party The W.W. Henry Company, L.P. f/k/a The W.W. Henry Company and Henry Asphalt Company(pty:dft), Attorney Andrew Lon Seitz added to party Weil-McLain, a division of the Marley-Wylain Company(pty:dft), Attorney Andrew Lon Seitz added to party Wilo USA LLC (sued indiv. and as sii to Weil Pump Company Inc.)(pty:dft), Attorney Andrew Lon Seitz added to party The Wm. Powell Company(pty:dft), Attorney Andrew Lon Seitz added to party Weir Valve & Controls USA, Inc. f/k/a Atwood & Morrill(pty:dft), Attorney Andrew Lon Seitz added to party York International Corporation (sued indiv. and as sii to Frick Company)(pty:dft), Attorney Andrew Lon Seitz added to party Zurn Industries, Inc. (pty:dft), Attorney Andrew Lon Seitz added to party Reliance Worldwide Corp. Ltd. (sued indiv. and as sii to A.W. Cash Valve Manufacturing Corporation)(pty:dft))(Seitz, Andrew) (Entered: 05/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) STANDING ORDER RE FINAL PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCES FOR CIVIL JURY TRIALS BEFORE JUDGE GEORGE H. WU by Judge George H. Wu. (See document for details) (mrgo) (Entered: 05/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Dawn Rockwell, Dennis A Rockwell. (Seitz, Andrew) (Entered: 05/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 . The following error(s) was found: The Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)is missing or incomplete. All civil actions presented for filing must be accompanied by a completed Civil Cover Sheet. See Local Rule 3-1. Counsel must file a completed Civil Cover Sheet immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (ghap) (Entered: 05/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap) (Entered: 05/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge George H. Wu and Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams. (ghap) (Entered: 05/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Plaintiffs NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs Dawn Rockwell, Dennis A Rockwell, (Seitz, Andrew) (Entered: 05/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-31274923 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiffs Dennis A Rockwell, Dawn Rockwell. (Attorney Andrew Lon Seitz added to party Dennis A Rockwell(pty:pla), Attorney Andrew Lon Seitz added to party Dawn Rockwell(pty:pla))(Seitz, Andrew) (Entered: 05/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CLYDE UNION INC is a litigant

Latest cases where ASCO VALVE INC is a litigant

Latest cases where WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where VIACOM INC. is a litigant