This case was last updated from PACER on 01/20/2020 at 08:29:45 (UTC).

Denning et al v. Loud Buddha, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 11/21/2019 Denning filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against Loud Buddha, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Richard Seeborg. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-07665

  • Filing Date:

    11/21/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Richard Seeborg

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Casey Denning

Natalia Cole

Defendants

Loud Buddha, LLC

Pura Cali Management Corp.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Trenton Ross Kashima

Attorney at Sommers Schwartz, P.C.

402 West Broadway, Suite 1760

San Diego, CA 92101

Kevin J. Stoops

Attorney at Sommers Schwartz, P.C.

One Towne Square, Suite 1700

Southfield, MI 48076

Jesse L Young

One Towne Square, Suite 1700

Southfield, MI 48076

Defendant Attorneys

Elizabeth R. Leitzinger

Attorney at Fenton and Keller

2801 Monterey-Salinas Highway, Post Office Box 791

Monterey, CA 93942

Jessica L. Linehan

Attorney at Dorsey & Whitney LLP

600 Anton Boulevard, Suite 2000

Costa Mesa, CA 92626

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Summons Defendant Loud Buddha, LLC

1 #3

Summons Defendant Pura Cali Management Corp.

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT FLSA COLLECTIVE ACTION/CLASS ACTION with jury demand against Loud Buddha, LLC, Pura Cali Management Corp. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13913666.). Filed by Casey Denning, Natalia Cole. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Defendant Loud Buddha, LLC, #3 Summons Defendant Pura Cali Management Corp.)(Kashima, Trenton) (Filed on 11/21/2019) Modified on 11/25/2019 (jmlS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 11/21/2019)

2 #1

Exhibit Consents to Join Collective Action

#2

(#2) NOTICE by Natalia Cole, Casey Denning OF 1ST FILING OF CONSENTS TO JOIN COLLECTIVE ACTION (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consents to Join Collective Action)(Kashima, Trenton) (Filed on 11/21/2019) (Entered: 11/21/2019)

#4

#Electronic filing error. Judge initials are missing. Counsel need not re-file the document, but should reference the initials on future filings. The judges initials are DMR. Re:[5 ] Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge filed by Natalia Cole, Casey Denning, #4 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Application for Admission - Kevin J. Stoops ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13918127.) filed by Natalia Cole, Casey Denning (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2019) (Entered: 11/25/2019)

4 #1

Certificate of Good Standing

#5

(#5) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Natalia Cole, Casey Denning.. (Kashima, Trenton) (Filed on 11/22/2019) (Entered: 11/22/2019)

#7

(#7) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting #4 Kevin J. Stoops's Motion for admission Pro Hac Vice. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2019). (Entered: 11/25/2019)

#23

(#23) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Richard Seeborg for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu no longer assigned to case. Signed by the Clerk on 01/16/2020. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/16/2020) (Entered: 01/16/2020)

#21

(#21) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Pura Cali Management Corp... (Linehan, Jessica) (Filed on 1/15/2020) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

#20

(#20) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO FLSA COLLECTIVE ACTION / CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 6-1(a) filed by Pura Cali Management Corp., Casey Denning and Natalia Cole. (Linehan, Jessica) (Filed on 1/10/2020) Modified on 1/10/2020 (jmlS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 01/10/2020)

#19

(#19) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Loud Buddha, LLC.. (Leitzinger, Elizabeth) (Filed on 1/9/2020) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

#18

(#18) CLERK'S NOTICE TO DEFENDANT LOUD BUDDHA, LLC Re: Consent or Declination: Defendant Loud Buddha, LLC, et al shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 1/22/2020. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2020) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

#17

(#17) STIPULATION and Request to Extend Time to Respond to Initial Complaint filed by Loud Buddha, LLC, Casey Denning and Natalia Cole. (Leitzinger, Elizabeth) (Filed on 1/7/2020) Modified on 1/7/2020 (jmlS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 01/07/2020)

#16

(#16) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Casey Denning, Natalia Cole. Pura Cali Management Corp. served on 12/6/2019, answer due 12/27/2019. (Stoops, Kevin) (Filed on 1/2/2020) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

#15

(#15) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Casey Denning, Natalia Cole. Loud Buddha, LLC served on 12/18/2019, answer due 1/8/2020. (Stoops, Kevin) (Filed on 1/2/2020) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/16/2020
  • (#24) CLERK'S NOTICE RE REASSIGNED CASE: You are notified that the Court has scheduled an in-person Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/19/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom #3, 17th Floor, in San Francisco before Judge Richard Seeborg upon reassignment. Case Management Statement due by 3/12/2020. For a copy of Judge Seeborg's Standing Order and other information, please refer to the Court's website at www.cand.uscourts.gov. If either party so desires, however, counsel may file a request to appear by telephone at 11:00 am, in which case the Conference will be moved to 11:00 am to be held telephonically for all parties, and all parties must contact Court Conference at 866/582-6878 at least one week prior to the Conference. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/16/2020) Modified on 1/16/2020 (cl, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 01/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Richard Seeborg for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu no longer assigned to case. Signed by the Clerk on 01/16/2020. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/16/2020) (Entered: 01/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • (#22) CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/15/2020) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Pura Cali Management Corp... (Linehan, Jessica) (Filed on 1/15/2020) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO FLSA COLLECTIVE ACTION / CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 6-1(a) filed by Pura Cali Management Corp., Casey Denning and Natalia Cole. (Linehan, Jessica) (Filed on 1/10/2020) Modified on 1/10/2020 (jmlS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 01/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Loud Buddha, LLC.. (Leitzinger, Elizabeth) (Filed on 1/9/2020) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) CLERK'S NOTICE TO DEFENDANT LOUD BUDDHA, LLC Re: Consent or Declination: Defendant Loud Buddha, LLC, et al shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 1/22/2020. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2020) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) STIPULATION and Request to Extend Time to Respond to Initial Complaint filed by Loud Buddha, LLC, Casey Denning and Natalia Cole. (Leitzinger, Elizabeth) (Filed on 1/7/2020) Modified on 1/7/2020 (jmlS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Casey Denning, Natalia Cole. Pura Cali Management Corp. served on 12/6/2019, answer due 12/27/2019. (Stoops, Kevin) (Filed on 1/2/2020) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Casey Denning, Natalia Cole. Loud Buddha, LLC served on 12/18/2019, answer due 1/8/2020. (Stoops, Kevin) (Filed on 1/2/2020) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Proposed Summons. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Kashima, Trenton) (Filed on 12/2/2019) (Entered: 12/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: This case may fall within the Pilot Program for Initial Discovery Protocols for Employment Cases Alleging Adverse Action. See #General Order 71. Parties and Counsel are directed to review General Order 71 to determine whether it applies to this case, and to comply with that General Order if applicable. Case Management Statement due by 2/ 26/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/4/2020 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2019) (Entered: 11/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • #Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. [err101] The correct event is Proposed Summons. The summons should NOT be filed as an attachment to the Complaint. The correct event can be found at Civil Events > Other Filings > Other Documents > Proposed Summons. Please re-file the SUMMONS ONLY in its entirety. Re:[1-2] Summons Defendant Loud Buddha, LLC, [1-3] Summons Defendant Pura Cali Management Corp. filed by Natalia Cole, Casey Denning (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2019) (Entered: 11/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • #Electronic filing error. Judge initials are missing. Counsel need not re-file the document, but should reference the initials on future filings. The judges initials are DMR. Re:[5 ] Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge filed by Natalia Cole, Casey Denning, #4 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Application for Admission - Kevin J. Stoops ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13918127.) filed by Natalia Cole, Casey Denning (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2019) (Entered: 11/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting #4 Kevin J. Stoops's Motion for admission Pro Hac Vice. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2019). (Entered: 11/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Natalia Cole, Casey Denning.. (Kashima, Trenton) (Filed on 11/22/2019) (Entered: 11/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Application for Admission - Kevin J. Stoops ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13918127.) filed by Natalia Cole, Casey Denning. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Stoops, Kevin) (Filed on 11/22/2019) (Entered: 11/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • (#3) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 12/6/2019. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2019) (Entered: 11/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE by Natalia Cole, Casey Denning OF 1ST FILING OF CONSENTS TO JOIN COLLECTIVE ACTION (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consents to Join Collective Action)(Kashima, Trenton) (Filed on 11/21/2019) (Entered: 11/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT FLSA COLLECTIVE ACTION/CLASS ACTION with jury demand against Loud Buddha, LLC, Pura Cali Management Corp. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13913666.). Filed by Casey Denning, Natalia Cole. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Defendant Loud Buddha, LLC, #3 Summons Defendant Pura Cali Management Corp.)(Kashima, Trenton) (Filed on 11/21/2019) Modified on 11/25/2019 (jmlS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 11/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.