This case was last updated from PACER on 07/13/2020 at 05:53:21 (UTC).

Denney v. Hospira Worldwide, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 12/04/2019 Denney filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against Hospira Worldwide, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Jane Triche Milazzo and Michael North. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-14046

  • Filing Date:

    12/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Louisiana Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jane Triche Milazzo

Referral Judge

Michael North

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Kelly Denney

Defendants

Hospira, Inc.

Hospira Worldwide, LLC

Hospira Worldwide, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Matthew Ryan McCarley

Attorney at Fears Nachawati PLLC

5473 Blair Road

Dallas, TX 75231

Tarek C. Abbassi

Attorney at Fears Nachawati PLLC

5473 Blair Road

Dallas, TX 75231

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) PRETRIAL ORDERS. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo.(am) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to Hospira Worldwide, LLC. (caa) (Main Document 3 replaced on 12/6/2019) (caa). (Entered: 12/06/2019)

1 #2

Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT with jury demand against Hospira Worldwide, LLC, Hospira, Inc. (Fee previously paid) filed by Kelly Denney. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)Attorney Matthew Ryan McCarley added to party Kelly Denney(pty:pla).(McCarley, Matthew) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) PRETRIAL ORDERS. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo.(am) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Hospira Worldwide, LLC. (caa) (Main Document 3 replaced on 12/6/2019) (caa). (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • Docket(#2) Initial Case Assignment to Judge Jane Triche Milazzo and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (ess) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • DocketFiling fee received from Matthew McCarley: $ 400 ALAEDC-8007114 (ess) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with jury demand against Hospira Worldwide, LLC, Hospira, Inc. (Fee previously paid) filed by Kelly Denney. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)Attorney Matthew Ryan McCarley added to party Kelly Denney(pty:pla).(McCarley, Matthew) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less