This case was last updated from PACER on 01/24/2021 at 09:51:46 (UTC).

Denker v. Zero Waste Recycling, LLC

Case Summary

On 11/25/2020 Denker filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against Zero Waste Recycling, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, North Carolina Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Frank D. Whitney and David S. Cayer. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-00660

  • Filing Date:

    11/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Frank D. Whitney

Referral Judge

David S. Cayer

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

Randy Denker

Defendant and Counter Claimant

Zero Waste Recycling, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

Craig Lorne Leis

Attorney at Gibbons Leis, PLLC

14045 Ballantyne Corporate Place, Ste. 325

Charlotte, NC 28277

Philip J. Gibbons, Jr

Attorney at Gibbons Leis, PLLC

14045 Ballantyne Corporate Place, Ste. 325

Charlotte, NC 28277

Corey Michael Stanton

Attorney at Gibbons Leis, PLLC

14045 Ballantyne Corporate Place, Suite 325

Charlotte, NC 28277

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorney

Zipporah Basile Edwards

Attorney at Horack, Talley, Pharr & Lowndes, P.A.

2600 One Wells Fargo Center, 301 South College Street

Charlotte, NC 28202

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) MEMORANDUM in Support re #5 MOTION to Dismiss by Randy Denker. (Stanton, Corey) (Entered: 01/13/2021)

#5

(#5) MOTION to Dismiss by Randy Denker. Responses due by 1/27/2021 (Stanton, Corey) (Entered: 01/13/2021)

#4

(#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Zero Waste Recycling, LLC (Edwards, Zipporah) (Entered: 12/23/2020)

#3

(#3) ANSWER to #1 Complaint Affirmative Defenses, COUNTERCLAIM against Randy Denker by Zero Waste Recycling, LLC.(Edwards, Zipporah) (Entered: 12/23/2020)

#2

(#2) Summons Issued Electronically as to Zero Waste Recycling, LLC. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (js) (Entered: 11/30/2020)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Zero Waste Recycling, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0419-4778619), filed by Randy Denker. (Stanton, Corey) Modified text on 11/25/2020 (tmg). (Entered: 11/25/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MEMORANDUM in Support re #5 MOTION to Dismiss by Randy Denker. (Stanton, Corey) (Entered: 01/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION to Dismiss by Randy Denker. Responses due by 1/27/2021 (Stanton, Corey) (Entered: 01/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Zero Waste Recycling, LLC (Edwards, Zipporah) (Entered: 12/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ANSWER to #1 Complaint Affirmative Defenses, COUNTERCLAIM against Randy Denker by Zero Waste Recycling, LLC.(Edwards, Zipporah) (Entered: 12/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued Electronically as to Zero Waste Recycling, LLC. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (js) (Entered: 11/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketClerk's Entry and Service of #Initial Scheduling Order and #Certificate of Initial Attorney FRCP 26(f) Conference Form pursuant to the Standing Order Governing Civil Case Management before the Honorable Frank D. Whitney (3:07-mc-47 (Doc. No. 2)). The parties are directed to click on the link above to retrieve the Order. (js) (Entered: 11/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to District Judge Frank D. Whitney and Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(js) (Entered: 11/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Zero Waste Recycling, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0419-4778619), filed by Randy Denker. (Stanton, Corey) Modified text on 11/25/2020 (tmg). (Entered: 11/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Zipporah Basile Edwards