This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/09/2021 at 09:23:31 (UTC).

Denison University et al v. Certain Underwriters at Lloyds London Subscribing to Policy Number W2205F200301 et al

Case Summary

On 03/10/2021 Denison University filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Certain Underwriters at Lloyds London Subscribing to Policy Number W2205F200301. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Michael H. Watson and Elizabeth Preston Deavers. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-01010

  • Filing Date:

    03/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Michael H. Watson

Referral Judge

Elizabeth Preston Deavers

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Ohio Wesleyan University

Kenyon College

Denison University

The College of Wooster

Defendants

Evanston Insurance Company

Homeland Insurance Company of New York

Ace American Insurance Company

Certain Underwriters at Lloyds London Subscribing to Policy Number W2205F200301

Certain Underwriters at Lloyds London Subscribing to Policy Number B080110908U20

Endurance American Specialty Insurance Company

Tokio Marine America Insurance Company

Arch Specialty Insurance Company

HDI Global Insurance Company

The Princeton Excess and Surplus Lines Insurance Company

GuideOne National Insurance Company

Mitsui Sumitomo Insurance Company of America

Starr Surplus Lines Insurance Company

Westport Insurance Corporation

Colony Insurance Company

Ategrity Specialty Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Erik J. Clark

Attorney at Organ Cole LLP

1330 Dublin Road

Columbus, OH 43215

Shawn J Organ

Attorney at Organ Cole LLP

1330 Dublin Road

Columbus, OH 43215

Defendant Attorneys

Richard M Garner

Attorney at Collins Roche Utley & Garner, LLC

655 Metro Place South, Suite 200

Dublin, OH 43017

Sunny Lane Horacek

Attorney at Collins, Roche, Utley & Garner

655 Metro Place South, Suite 200

Dublin, OH 43017

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Exhibit Complaint Exhibits 1-4

1 #2

Exhibit Complaint Exhibits 5-19

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #4

Summonses

#2

#3

#4

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Richard M. Garner and Sunny Lane Horacek for Defendant Ace American Insurance Company (Horacek, Sunny) Modified text on 4/7/2021 (ew). (Entered: 04/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Richard M. Garner and Sunny Lane Horacek for Defendant Ace American Insurance Company (Garner, Richard) Modified text on 4/7/2021 (ew). (Entered: 04/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued to All Defendants. (ew) (Entered: 03/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 paid - receipt number: AOHSDC-8210331), filed by Kenyon College, Denison University, Ohio Wesleyan University, The College of Wooster. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint Exhibits 1-4, #2 Exhibit Complaint Exhibits 5-19, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summonses) (Clark, Erik) (Entered: 03/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Kenyon College is a litigant

Latest cases where Ohio Wesleyan University is a litigant

Latest cases where ATEGRITY SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant