This case was last updated from PACER on 03/29/2019 at 07:47:28 (UTC).

Denali Shipping LP v. Van Oil Petroleum LTD

Case Summary

On 01/28/2019 Denali Shipping LP filed a Property - Other Personal Property lawsuit against Van Oil Petroleum LTD. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Alabama Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Karon O Bowdre. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-00145

  • Filing Date:

    01/28/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Personal Property

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alabama Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Karon O Bowdre

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Denali Shipping LP

Defendant

Van Oil Petroleum LTD

Garnishee

BBVA Compass

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Thomas Sidney Rue

Attorney at MAYNARD COOPER GALE

Rsa Tower Suite 27000, 11 North Water Street

Mobile, AL 36602

Jonathan Joseph Beren Segarra

Attorney at MAYNARD COOPER & GALE PC

11 North Water Street, Ste. 24290

Mobile, AL 36602

Thomas J Butler

Attorney at MAYNARD COOPER & GALE

1901 Sixth Avenue North, 2400 Regions Harbert Plaza

Birmingham, AL 35203

 

Court Documents

#30

(#30) ORDER. Upon consideration of the Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (Doc. 29), the court ORDERS that this case be, and the same hereby is, DISMISSED, WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre on 3/5/2019. (FNC) (Entered: 03/05/2019)

#29

(#29) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Denali Shipping LP (Segarra, Jonathan) (Entered: 02/28/2019)

#28

(#28) ORDER DENYING #26 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney until new counsel appears on behalf of Plaintiff because Plaintiff cannot proceed pro se. Signed by Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre on 2/25/2019. (JLC) (Entered: 02/25/2019)

#27

(#27) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE; Plaintiff is hereby ORDERED to SHOW CAUSE in writing, on or before March 11, 2019, why the Court should not quash the Writ of Attachment it issued against Compass Bank. Signed by Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre on 2/25/2019. (JLC) (Entered: 02/25/2019)

26 #1

Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Motion for Withdrawal

#26

(#26) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Denali Shipping LP. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Motion for Withdrawal)(Segarra, Jonathan) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

#25

(#25) RESPONSE to re #9 Writ of Attachment and Request to Quash Writ of Attachment filed by BBVA Compass. (Retherford, Jeremy) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

#24

(#24) NOTICE by Denali Shipping LP Notice of Filing United States Marshals Service Form USM-285, along with Court Order (Doc. 14) and Writ of Attachment and Garnishment (Doc. 9) (Segarra, Jonathan) (Entered: 02/19/2019)

#9

(#25) RESPONSE to re #9 Writ of Attachment and Request to Quash Writ of Attachment filed by BBVA Compass. (Retherford, Jeremy) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

#3

(#3) AFFIDAVIT in Support of Prayer for Maritime Attachment by Denali Shipping LP. filed by Denali Shipping LP (Butler, Thomas) (Entered: 01/28/2019)

#2

(#2) NOTICE REGARDING CONSENT to magistrate judge jurisdiction (MRR, ) (Entered: 01/28/2019)

1 #6

Denali Verification

1 #5

Exhibit E

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Van Oil Petroleum LTD, filed by Denali Shipping LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Denali Verification)(MRR, ) (Entered: 01/28/2019)

31 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#30) ORDER. Upon consideration of the Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (Doc. 29), the court ORDERS that this case be, and the same hereby is, DISMISSED, WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre on 3/5/2019. (FNC) (Entered: 03/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#29) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Denali Shipping LP (Segarra, Jonathan) (Entered: 02/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#28) ORDER DENYING #26 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney until new counsel appears on behalf of Plaintiff because Plaintiff cannot proceed pro se. Signed by Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre on 2/25/2019. (JLC) (Entered: 02/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#27) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE; Plaintiff is hereby ORDERED to SHOW CAUSE in writing, on or before March 11, 2019, why the Court should not quash the Writ of Attachment it issued against Compass Bank. Signed by Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre on 2/25/2019. (JLC) (Entered: 02/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#26) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Denali Shipping LP. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Motion for Withdrawal)(Segarra, Jonathan) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#25) RESPONSE to re #9 Writ of Attachment and Request to Quash Writ of Attachment filed by BBVA Compass. (Retherford, Jeremy) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) NOTICE by Denali Shipping LP Notice of Filing United States Marshals Service Form USM-285, along with Court Order (Doc. 14) and Writ of Attachment and Garnishment (Doc. 9) (Segarra, Jonathan) (Entered: 02/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) NOTICE by Denali Shipping LP Notice of Filing United States Marshals Service Form USM-285, along with Court Order (Doc. 14) and Writ of Attachment and Garnishment (Doc. 9) (Segarra, Jonathan) (Entered: 02/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) NOTICE by Denali Shipping LP Notice of Filing United States Marshals Service Form USM-285, along with court Order (Doc. 14) and Writ of Attachment and Garnishment (Doc. 9) (Segarra, Jonathan) (Entered: 02/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) NOTICE by Denali Shipping LP Notice of Filing United States Marshals Service Form USM-285, along with Court Order (Doc. 14) and Writ of Attachment and Garnishment (Doc. 9) (Segarra, Jonathan) (Entered: 02/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 01/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) WRIT of Attachment issued, attached as an Exhibit to the Court's #7 Order. (JLC) (Entered: 01/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Denali Shipping LP. filed by Denali Shipping LP (Butler, Thomas) (Entered: 01/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER FOR ISSUANCE OF PROCESS OF ATTACHMENT AND GARNISHMENT. For the reasons stated in the Memorandum Opinion and Order filed simultaneously, the court GRANTS #4 Emergency MOTION for Writ of Attachment and Appointment of Special Process Server filed by Denali Shipping LP and DIRECTS the U.S. Marshal for the Northern District of Alabama to serve this Order and Process of Maritime Attachment and Garnishment on BBVA Compass Bank. Signed by Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre on 01/28/2019. (Attachments: #1 Writ of Attachment)(LMG) (Entered: 01/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre on 01/28/2019. (LMG) (Entered: 01/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • (#5) Case Reassigned to Judge Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre. Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam no longer assigned to the case. Please use case number 2:19-cv-145-KOB (MRR, ) (Entered: 01/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • Filing Fee received in the amount of $400.00, Credit Card receipt_number 1126-3264764, NDAL receipt #B4601094984. (Butler, Thomas) Modified on 1/28/2019 (JLC). (Entered: 01/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Emergency MOTION for Writ of Attachment and Appointment of Special Process Server by Denali Shipping LP. (Butler, Thomas) (Entered: 01/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) AFFIDAVIT in Support of Prayer for Maritime Attachment by Denali Shipping LP. filed by Denali Shipping LP (Butler, Thomas) (Entered: 01/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE REGARDING CONSENT to magistrate judge jurisdiction (MRR, ) (Entered: 01/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Van Oil Petroleum LTD, filed by Denali Shipping LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Denali Verification)(MRR, ) (Entered: 01/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.