This case was last updated from PACER on 07/04/2019 at 07:03:41 (UTC).

Dempsey et al v. Kohl's Department Stores Inc

Case Summary

On 05/05/2019 Dempsey filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Kohl's Department Stores Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Wisconsin Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Nancy Joseph and J P Stadtmueller. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-00655

  • Filing Date:

    05/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Courthouse:

    Wisconsin Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Nancy Joseph

J P Stadtmueller

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Michael Dempsey

Gordon Dickman

Defendant

Kohl's Department Stores Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Nathaniel Cade, Jr

Attorney at Cade Law Group LLC

Po Box 170887

Milwaukee, WI 53217

Defendant Attorneys

Christie B Carrino

Attorney at Godfrey & Kahn SC

833 E Michigan St - Ste 1800

Milwaukee, WI 53202-5615

Erin M Cook

Attorney at Godfrey & Kahn SC

833 E Michigan St - Ste 1800

Milwaukee, WI 53202-5615

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) TRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER signed by Judge J.P. Stadtmueller on 6/21/19. Interim Settlement Report due by 1/6/20; Dispositive Motions due by 1/10/20; Final Settlement Report due by 3/30/20; Motions in Limine and Daubert Motions due by 4/3/20; Final/Joint Pretrial Report due by 2:00 PM on 4/8/20. Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/14/20 at 8:30 AM in Courtroom 425, 517 E. Wisconsin Ave., Milwaukee, WI before Judge J.P. Stadtmueller. Jury Trial set for 4/20/20 at 8:30 AM in Courtroom 425, 517 E. Wisconsin Ave., Milwaukee, WI before Judge J.P. Stadtmueller. See Order. (cc: all counsel)(cl)

#11

(#11) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge J.P. Stadtmueller: Scheduling Conference held on 6/21/2019. (cl)

#10

(#10) Joint REPORT of Rule 26(f) Plan by Kohl's Department Stores Inc. (Carrino, Christie)

#9

(#9) DISCLOSURE Statement by Kohl's Department Stores Inc. (Carrino, Christie)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Erin M Cook on behalf of Kohl's Department Stores Inc. Attorney(s) appearing: Erin M. Cook (Cook, Erin)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Christie B Carrino on behalf of Kohl's Department Stores Inc. Attorney(s) appearing: Christie B. Carrino (Carrino, Christie)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Hearing: Scheduling Conference set for 6/21/2019 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom 425, 517 E. Wisconsin Ave., Milwaukee, WI before Judge J P Stadtmueller. Joint Rule 26 Plan due by 6/18/2019. (cc: all counsel)(jm)

#5

(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Kohl's Department Stores Inc - Waiver sent on 5/24/2019. (Cade, Nathaniel)

#4

(#4) REQUEST for Issuance of Summons by All Plaintiffs (Cade, Nathaniel)

#3

RESTRICTED

#2

(#2) SUPPLEMENT by All Plaintiffs - Civil Cover Sheet. (Cade, Nathaniel)

1 #4

Exhibit D - Dickman Right to Sue Letter

1 #3

Exhibit C - Dickman Charge of Discrimination

1 #2

Exhibit B - Dempsey Right to Sue Letter

1 #1

Exhibit A - Dempsey Charge of Discrimination

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand; against Kohl's Department Stores Inc by Michael Dempsey, Gordon Dickman. ( Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number AWIEDC-3101352) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Dempsey Charge of Discrimination, #2 Exhibit B - Dempsey Right to Sue Letter, #3 Exhibit C - Dickman Charge of Discrimination, #4 Exhibit D - Dickman Right to Sue Letter)(Cade, Nathaniel)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) TRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER signed by Judge J.P. Stadtmueller on 6/21/19. Interim Settlement Report due by 1/6/20; Dispositive Motions due by 1/10/20; Final Settlement Report due by 3/30/20; Motions in Limine and Daubert Motions due by 4/3/20; Final/Joint Pretrial Report due by 2:00 PM on 4/8/20. Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/14/20 at 8:30 AM in Courtroom 425, 517 E. Wisconsin Ave., Milwaukee, WI before Judge J.P. Stadtmueller. Jury Trial set for 4/20/20 at 8:30 AM in Courtroom 425, 517 E. Wisconsin Ave., Milwaukee, WI before Judge J.P. Stadtmueller. See Order. (cc: all counsel)(cl)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge J.P. Stadtmueller: Scheduling Conference held on 6/21/2019. (cl)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Joint REPORT of Rule 26(f) Plan by Kohl's Department Stores Inc. (Carrino, Christie)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) DISCLOSURE Statement by Kohl's Department Stores Inc. (Carrino, Christie)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Erin M Cook on behalf of Kohl's Department Stores Inc. Attorney(s) appearing: Erin M. Cook (Cook, Erin)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Christie B Carrino on behalf of Kohl's Department Stores Inc. Attorney(s) appearing: Christie B. Carrino (Carrino, Christie)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Hearing: Scheduling Conference set for 6/21/2019 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom 425, 517 E. Wisconsin Ave., Milwaukee, WI before Judge J P Stadtmueller. Joint Rule 26 Plan due by 6/18/2019. (cc: all counsel)(jm)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Kohl's Department Stores Inc - Waiver sent on 5/24/2019. (Cade, Nathaniel)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • Case reassigned to Judge J P Stadtmueller. Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph no longer assigned to the case. (asc)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • Summons Issued as to Kohl's Department Stores Inc. (asc)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) REQUEST for Issuance of Summons by All Plaintiffs (Cade, Nathaniel)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by All Plaintiffs. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Cade, Nathaniel)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Joseph to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website ;pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed. (ds)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) SUPPLEMENT by All Plaintiffs - Civil Cover Sheet. (Cade, Nathaniel)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand; against Kohl's Department Stores Inc by Michael Dempsey, Gordon Dickman. ( Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number AWIEDC-3101352) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Dempsey Charge of Discrimination, #2 Exhibit B - Dempsey Right to Sue Letter, #3 Exhibit C - Dickman Charge of Discrimination, #4 Exhibit D - Dickman Right to Sue Letter)(Cade, Nathaniel)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where KOHL'S DEPARTMENT STORES INC. DBA DBA: A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION AKA KOHL'S INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DBA KOHL'S SEAL BEACH STORE 10604 DBA A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DOING BUSINESS AS A PUBLIC ENTITY UNDER LAWS OF AND IN T is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Christie B. Carrino

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Erin M Cook