This case was last updated from PACER on 10/06/2019 at 07:46:34 (UTC).

Demps v. JVB Consulting, Inc et al

Case Summary

On 08/07/2019 Demps filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against JVB Consulting, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Nebraska District. The Judges overseeing this case are Cheryl R. Zwart and John M. Gerrard. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:19-CV-00344

  • Filing Date:

    08/07/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Nebraska District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Cheryl R. Zwart

Presiding Judge

John M. Gerrard

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Michael Demps

Defendants

Express Distribution LLC

JVB Consulting, Inc

JVB Consulting, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Abby K. Osborn

Attorney at SHIFFERMILLER LAW FIRM

1002 G Street

Lincoln, NE 68508

Defendant Attorney

Jeanette L. Stull

Attorney at ATWOOD, HOLSTEN LAW FIRM

575 Fallbrook Boulevard, Suite 206

Lincoln, NE 68521

 

Court Documents

#11

RESTRICTED

#9

(#9) ANSWER to Notice of Removal Complaint regarding: Notice of Removal Attorney - Complaint, #1 by Express Distribution LLC, JVB Consulting, Inc. (Stull, Jeanette) (Entered: 09/23/2019)

#6

(#6) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 by Attorney Jeanette L. Stull on behalf of Defendant JVB Consulting, Inc.(Stull, Jeanette) (Entered: 08/07/2019)

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL with jury demand against All Plaintiffs from District Court of Douglas County, Case number 19 - 5621 ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANEDC-3992972) with attached state court pleadings, by Attorney Jeanette L. Stull on behalf of JVB Consulting, Inc, Express Distribution LLC(Stull, Jeanette) (Entered: 08/07/2019)

#5

(#5) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 by Attorney Jeanette L. Stull on behalf of Defendant Express Distribution LLC.(Stull, Jeanette) (Entered: 08/07/2019)

#10

(#10) SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26 Meeting Report Deadline set for 10/24/2019.Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (ADB) (Entered: 09/24/2019)

#7

(#7) MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading () by Attorney Jeanette L. Stull on behalf of Defendants Express Distribution LLC, JVB Consulting, Inc..(Stull, Jeanette) Modified on 8/22/2019 to remove incorrectly added event (DCD) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) CASE CONFERENCE INSTRUCTIONS. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT AND FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(a). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (ADB) (Entered: 09/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26 Meeting Report Deadline set for 10/24/2019.Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (ADB) (Entered: 09/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ANSWER to Notice of Removal Complaint regarding: Notice of Removal Attorney - Complaint, #1 by Express Distribution LLC, JVB Consulting, Inc. (Stull, Jeanette) (Entered: 09/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) TEXT ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading. Defendants are granted until September 23, 2019 to answer or otherwise respond to the allegations in Plaintiff's Complaint. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (Zwart, Cheryl) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading () by Attorney Jeanette L. Stull on behalf of Defendants Express Distribution LLC, JVB Consulting, Inc..(Stull, Jeanette) Modified on 8/22/2019 to remove incorrectly added event (DCD) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 by Attorney Jeanette L. Stull on behalf of Defendant JVB Consulting, Inc.(Stull, Jeanette) (Entered: 08/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 by Attorney Jeanette L. Stull on behalf of Defendant Express Distribution LLC.(Stull, Jeanette) (Entered: 08/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • (#4) TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Defendant Express Distribution LLC. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (LKO) (Entered: 08/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • (#3) TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Defendant JVB Consulting, Inc. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (LKO) (Entered: 08/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • (#2) TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Chief Judge John M. Gerrard and Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (LKO) (Entered: 08/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL with jury demand against All Plaintiffs from District Court of Douglas County, Case number 19 - 5621 ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANEDC-3992972) with attached state court pleadings, by Attorney Jeanette L. Stull on behalf of JVB Consulting, Inc, Express Distribution LLC(Stull, Jeanette) (Entered: 08/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.