This case was last updated from PACER on 04/16/2019 at 07:18:37 (UTC).

Demos v. United States Attorney General et al

Case Summary

On 02/15/2019 Demos filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against United States Attorney General. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Washington Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Richard A. Jones. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-00225

  • Filing Date:

    02/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Courthouse:

    Washington Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Richard A. Jones

 

Party Details

Petitioners

John Robert Demos, Jr

Monroe, WA 98272

John Robert Demos

Walla Walla, WA 99362-8817

Respondents

President of the USA

State of Washington

US Congress

United States

Washington DC

US Solicitor General

US Attorney General

United States Attorney General

Washington, D.C.

President of the United States of America

United States Solicitor General

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorney

US Attorney Habeas

 

Court Documents

#17

(#17) NOTICE OF APPEAL to Ninth Circuit (FEE NOT PAID) by Petitioner John Robert Demos. **76 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(John Demos, Prisoner ID: 287455)(CDA) (Entered: 04/08/2019)

#16

(#16) USCA Case Number 19-35229 for #15 Notice of Appeal filed by John Robert Demos. **DO NOT PRINT**(John Demos, Prisoner ID: 287455)(GT) (Entered: 03/25/2019)

#15

(#15) NOTICE OF APPEAL (19-35229) to Ninth Circuit re #12 Order on Report and Recommendation, #13 Judgment by Court, by Petitioner John Robert Demos. **12 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(John Demos, Prisoner ID: 287455)(SG) Modified on 3/25/2019 to add CCA#(GT). (Entered: 03/21/2019)

#13

(#13) JUDGMENT BY COURT in favor of President of the United States of America, State of Washington, United States, United States Attorney General, United States Solicitor General, Washington, D.C. against John Robert Demos. The Report and Recommendation is adopted and approved. Plaintiff's in forma pauperis application is STRICKEN and this matter is DISMISSED with prejudice. **1 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(John Demos, Prisoner ID: 287455)(SG) (Entered: 03/19/2019)

#12

(#12) ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #10 Report and Recommendations, by Judge Richard A. Jones. The Report and Recommendation is ADOPTED; Plaintiff's application to proceed in forma pauperis is STRICKEN; This matter is DISMISSED with prejudice. **1 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(John Demos, Prisoner ID: 287455)(SG) (Entered: 03/19/2019)

#11

(#11) OBJECTIONS by Petitioner John Robert Demos to #10 Report and Recommendations,. Noting Date 3/15/2019, **11 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(John Demos, Prisoner ID: 287455)(ST) (Entered: 03/01/2019)

10 #2

PROPOSED Judgment

10 #1

PROPOSED Order of Dismissal

#10

(#10) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS by Hon. Brian A Tsuchida re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Objections to R&R due by 3/5/2019, Noting Date 3/8/2019, (Attachments: #1 PROPOSED Order of Dismissal, #2 PROPOSED Judgment)**5 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(John Demos, Prisoner ID: 287455)(ST) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

9 #2

PROPOSED Motion to Appoint Counsel

9 #1

PROPOSED 2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus

#7

(#7) Order Transferring to Another District: Case transferred to Division of Western District of Washington. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Hal R. Ray, Jr on 2/14/2019) (skg) [Transferred from txnd on 2/15/2019.] (Entered: 02/14/2019)

#6

(#6) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis with certificate of trust account filed by John Robert Demos, Jr. (skg) [Transferred from txnd on 2/15/2019.] (Entered: 02/13/2019)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY AND ORDER: It is ORDERED that, by February 13, 2019, Petitioner shall either pay the $5.00 filing fee or file a motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. Failure to comply with this order may lead to dismissal for failure to prosecute pursuant to FRCvP 41(b). (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Hal R. Ray, Jr on 1/23/2019) (skg) [Transferred from txnd on 2/15/2019.] (Entered: 01/23/2019)

#4

(#4) Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party. (skg) [Transferred from txnd on 2/15/2019.] (Entered: 01/22/2019)

#3

(#3) New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. File to: No court file needed. CASREF case referral set and case referred to Magistrate Judge Ray (see Special Order 3). Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Ray). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. Motion(s) referred to Magistrate Judge Hal R. Ray, Jr. (skg) [Transferred from txnd on 2/15/2019.] (Entered: 01/22/2019)

#2

(#2) MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by John Robert Demos, Jr. (skg) [Transferred from txnd on 2/15/2019.] (Entered: 01/22/2019)

#1

(#10) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS by Hon. Brian A Tsuchida re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Objections to R&R due by 3/5/2019, Noting Date 3/8/2019, (Attachments: #1 PROPOSED Order of Dismissal, #2 PROPOSED Judgment)**5 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(John Demos, Prisoner ID: 287455)(ST) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) NOTICE OF APPEAL to Ninth Circuit (FEE NOT PAID) by Petitioner John Robert Demos. **76 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(John Demos, Prisoner ID: 287455)(CDA) (Entered: 04/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) USCA Case Number 19-35229 for #15 Notice of Appeal filed by John Robert Demos. **DO NOT PRINT**(John Demos, Prisoner ID: 287455)(GT) (Entered: 03/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) NOTICE OF APPEAL (19-35229) to Ninth Circuit re #12 Order on Report and Recommendation, #13 Judgment by Court, by Petitioner John Robert Demos. **12 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(John Demos, Prisoner ID: 287455)(SG) Modified on 3/25/2019 to add CCA#(GT). (Entered: 03/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) Mail addressed to John Demos returned as Undeliverable re #12 Order on Report and Recommendation, #13 Judgment by Court. Per staff at MCC-Monroe, inmate transferred to WSP-Walla Walla. Updated docket, regenerated notice for 12,13. **0 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(John Demos, Prisoner ID: 287455)(PS) (Entered: 03/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) JUDGMENT BY COURT in favor of President of the United States of America, State of Washington, United States, United States Attorney General, United States Solicitor General, Washington, D.C. against John Robert Demos. The Report and Recommendation is adopted and approved. Plaintiff's in forma pauperis application is STRICKEN and this matter is DISMISSED with prejudice. **1 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(John Demos, Prisoner ID: 287455)(SG) (Entered: 03/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #10 Report and Recommendations, by Judge Richard A. Jones. The Report and Recommendation is ADOPTED; Plaintiff's application to proceed in forma pauperis is STRICKEN; This matter is DISMISSED with prejudice. **1 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(John Demos, Prisoner ID: 287455)(SG) (Entered: 03/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) OBJECTIONS by Petitioner John Robert Demos to #10 Report and Recommendations,. Noting Date 3/15/2019, **11 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(John Demos, Prisoner ID: 287455)(ST) (Entered: 03/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS by Hon. Brian A Tsuchida re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Objections to R&R due by 3/5/2019, Noting Date 3/8/2019, (Attachments: #1 PROPOSED Order of Dismissal, #2 PROPOSED Judgment)**5 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(John Demos, Prisoner ID: 287455)(ST) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) PROPOSED Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis filed by Petitioner John Robert Demos, Jr (Attachments: #1 PROPOSED 2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, #2 PROPOSED Motion to Appoint Counsel)**13 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(John Demos, Prisoner ID: 287455)(ST) (Entered: 02/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • Judge Richard A. Jones and Hon. Brian A Tsuchida added. **0 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(John Demos, Prisoner ID: 287455)(ST) (Entered: 02/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 02/14/2019
  • ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:7. Thu Feb 14 14:56:42 CST 2019 (crt) [Transferred from txnd on 2/15/2019.] (Entered: 02/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Order Transferring to Another District: Case transferred to Division of Western District of Washington. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Hal R. Ray, Jr on 2/14/2019) (skg) [Transferred from txnd on 2/15/2019.] (Entered: 02/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis with certificate of trust account filed by John Robert Demos, Jr. (skg) [Transferred from txnd on 2/15/2019.] (Entered: 02/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:5. Wed Jan 23 11:27:53 CST 2019 (crt) [Transferred from txnd on 2/15/2019.] (Entered: 01/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY AND ORDER: It is ORDERED that, by February 13, 2019, Petitioner shall either pay the $5.00 filing fee or file a motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. Failure to comply with this order may lead to dismissal for failure to prosecute pursuant to FRCvP 41(b). (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Hal R. Ray, Jr on 1/23/2019) (skg) [Transferred from txnd on 2/15/2019.] (Entered: 01/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:3, 4. Tue Jan 22 15:19:26 CST 2019 (crt) [Transferred from txnd on 2/15/2019.] (Entered: 01/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party. (skg) [Transferred from txnd on 2/15/2019.] (Entered: 01/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. File to: No court file needed. CASREF case referral set and case referred to Magistrate Judge Ray (see Special Order 3). Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Ray). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. Motion(s) referred to Magistrate Judge Hal R. Ray, Jr. (skg) [Transferred from txnd on 2/15/2019.] (Entered: 01/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by John Robert Demos, Jr. (skg) [Transferred from txnd on 2/15/2019.] (Entered: 01/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by John Robert Demos, Jr. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (skg) [Transferred from txnd on 2/15/2019.] (Entered: 01/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where The U.S Solicitor General is a litigant

Latest cases where Washington D.C. is a litigant

Latest cases where PRESIDENT is a litigant

Latest cases where US Congress is a litigant