This case was last updated from PACER on 03/23/2019 at 07:54:26 (UTC).

DEMOS v. U.S. ATTORNEY GENERAL et al

Case Summary

On 01/22/2019 DEMOS filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against U S ATTORNEY GENERAL. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Indiana Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Debra McVicker Lynch and Sarah Evans Barker. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-00016

  • Filing Date:

    01/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

  • Courthouse:

    Indiana Southern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Debra McVicker Lynch

Presiding Judge

Sarah Evans Barker

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JOHN ROBERT DEMOS, JR.

Monroe, WA 98272

Defendants

U.S.

U.S. ATTORNEY GENERAL

PRESIDENT OF THE U.S.A.

WASH D.C.

U.S.A.

U.S. SOLICITOR GENERAL

U.S. CONGRESS

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) Mail Returned as undeliverable. #4 Closed Judgment, #3 Entry sent to JOHN ROBERT DEMOS, JR. Copy sent to Monroe Correctional Complex Po Box 7002-16700 - 177th Drive S.E. Monroe, WA 98272. Envelope says return to sender. (MAT) (Entered: 03/22/2019)

#5

(#5) Mail Returned as undeliverable. #4 Closed Judgment, #3 Entry sent to JOHN ROBERT DEMOS, JR. Mail sent to MONROE CORRECTIONAL COMPLEX Intensive Management Unit P.O. Box 7002-16700-177th Drive S.E. Monroe, WA 98272. Envelope says return to sender no DOC #. (MAT) (Entered: 02/26/2019)

#4

(#4) CLOSED JUDGMENT - The court, having this day made its Entry, IT IS NOW ADJUDGED that this cause of action is dismissed. The Clerk of this Court is ORDERED to return, unfiled, any papers filed in any case by or on behalf of John Robert Demos, Jr. (except for a notice of appeal or unless filed in a criminal or habeas proceeding) until he has paid the $400.00 filing fee. Signed by Judge Sarah Evans Barker on 2/4/2019. Copy sent to plaintiff via US Mail. (MAT) (Entered: 02/04/2019)

#3

(#3) ENTRY DISMISSING ACTION AND IMPOSING SANCTIONS - For the foregoing reasons, the Court (1) DISMISSES this case as frivolous and for the Plaintiff's failure to pay the filing fee; (2) ORDERS Plaintiff John Robert Demos, Jr. to pay to the Clerk of this Court the $400.00 filing fee associated with this action; (3) DIRECTS the Clerk of the Court to return, unfiled, any papers filed in any case by or on behalf of John Robert Demos, Jr. (except for a notice of appeal or unless filed in a criminal or habeas proceeding) until he has paid the $400.00 filing fee. Judgment consistent with this Entry shall now issue. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Sarah Evans Barker on 2/4/2019. Copy sent to plaintiff via US Mail. (MAT) (Entered: 02/04/2019)

#2

(#2) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (MAT) (Entered: 01/22/2019)

1 #1

Envelope

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT/MOTION FOR EXPEDITED REVIEW OF A CONSTITUTIONAL CRISIS against PRESIDENT OF THE U.S.A., THE U.S., U.S. ATTORNEY GENERAL, U.S. CONGRESS, U.S. SOLICITOR GENERAL, U.S.A., WASH D.C., filed by JOHN ROBERT DEMOS, JR. (No fee paid with this filing) (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(MAT) Modified on 1/22/2019 (MAT). (Entered: 01/22/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Mail Returned as undeliverable. #4 Closed Judgment, #3 Entry sent to JOHN ROBERT DEMOS, JR. Copy sent to Monroe Correctional Complex Po Box 7002-16700 - 177th Drive S.E. Monroe, WA 98272. Envelope says return to sender. (MAT) (Entered: 03/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Address updated for John Robert Demos, Jr. by adding his prison ID number. Dkts. #3 and #4 resent to John Robert Demos at address on docket, Monroe Correctional Complex. (JRT) (Entered: 03/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Mail Returned as undeliverable. #4 Closed Judgment, #3 Entry sent to JOHN ROBERT DEMOS, JR. Mail sent to MONROE CORRECTIONAL COMPLEX Intensive Management Unit P.O. Box 7002-16700-177th Drive S.E. Monroe, WA 98272. Envelope says return to sender no DOC #. (MAT) (Entered: 02/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) CLOSED JUDGMENT - The court, having this day made its Entry, IT IS NOW ADJUDGED that this cause of action is dismissed. The Clerk of this Court is ORDERED to return, unfiled, any papers filed in any case by or on behalf of John Robert Demos, Jr. (except for a notice of appeal or unless filed in a criminal or habeas proceeding) until he has paid the $400.00 filing fee. Signed by Judge Sarah Evans Barker on 2/4/2019. Copy sent to plaintiff via US Mail. (MAT) (Entered: 02/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ENTRY DISMISSING ACTION AND IMPOSING SANCTIONS - For the foregoing reasons, the Court (1) DISMISSES this case as frivolous and for the Plaintiff's failure to pay the filing fee; (2) ORDERS Plaintiff John Robert Demos, Jr. to pay to the Clerk of this Court the $400.00 filing fee associated with this action; (3) DIRECTS the Clerk of the Court to return, unfiled, any papers filed in any case by or on behalf of John Robert Demos, Jr. (except for a notice of appeal or unless filed in a criminal or habeas proceeding) until he has paid the $400.00 filing fee. Judgment consistent with this Entry shall now issue. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Sarah Evans Barker on 2/4/2019. Copy sent to plaintiff via US Mail. (MAT) (Entered: 02/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (MAT) (Entered: 01/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT/MOTION FOR EXPEDITED REVIEW OF A CONSTITUTIONAL CRISIS against PRESIDENT OF THE U.S.A., THE U.S., U.S. ATTORNEY GENERAL, U.S. CONGRESS, U.S. SOLICITOR GENERAL, U.S.A., WASH D.C., filed by JOHN ROBERT DEMOS, JR. (No fee paid with this filing) (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(MAT) Modified on 1/22/2019 (MAT). (Entered: 01/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where The U.S Solicitor General is a litigant

Latest cases where Wash, D.C. is a litigant

Latest cases where PRESIDENT is a litigant

Latest cases where US Congress is a litigant