This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/22/2019 at 07:04:11 (UTC).

Demopoulos et al v. Jofaz Transportation, Inc.

Case Summary

On 02/21/2019 Demopoulos filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against Jofaz Transportation, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Vera M. Scanlon and Dora Lizette Irizarry. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-01049

  • Filing Date:

    02/21/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Vera M. Scanlon

Presiding Judge

Dora Lizette Irizarry

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

John A. Curcio

Demos P. Demopoulos

William Cassese

Kenneth Barrett

Daniel J. Gatto

Defendants

Y & M Transit Corp.

Jofaz Transportation, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Daniel Treiman

Attorney at Friedman & Anspach

1500 Broadway, Suite 2300

New York, NY 10036

Anusha Rasalingam

Attorney at Friedman & Anspach

1500 Broadway, Suite 2300

New York, NY 10036

Defendant Attorney

Netanel Newberger

Attorney at Milman Labuda Law Group PLLC

3000 Marcus Avenue, Suite 3W3

Lake Success, NY 11042

 

Court Documents

#14

#13

#12

#11

#10

9 #1

Proposed Order

#9

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #2

Proposed Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/16/2019
  • RE-SCHEDULING ORDER: Due to a scheduling conflict, the Initial Conference set for 5/2/2019 will begin at 4:30 PM (not 11:00 AM) in Courtroom 13A South before Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon. Counsel are to confirm amongst themselves that all are aware of this change. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 4/16/2019. (Quinlan, Krista) (Entered: 04/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Y & M Transit Corp.. (Newberger, Netanel) (Entered: 04/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Y & M Transit Corp. (Newberger, Netanel) (Entered: 04/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Jofaz Transportation, Inc.. (Newberger, Netanel) (Entered: 04/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Jofaz Transportation, Inc. (Newberger, Netanel) (Entered: 04/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer as to Y & M Transit Corp. Defendants' deadline to answer the Complaint or otherwise move is extended to 4/10/2019. SCHEDULING ORDER: As set forth in the attached Order, an Initial Conference is scheduled for 5/2/2019 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Scanlon in Courtroom 13A South. Plaintiffs' counsel is directed to confirm with Defendants' counsel that all necessary participants are aware of this conference. Counsel must complete the attached joint proposed scheduling order and file on ECF no later than 4/25/2019. Any requests for adjournment must be made in writing on notice to opposing parties, and must disclose whether all parties consent. No request for adjournment will be considered unless made at least forty-eight (48) hours before the scheduled conference unless in an emergency. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 3/28/2019. (Quinlan, Krista) (Entered: 03/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Jofaz Transportation, Inc., Y & M Transit Corp. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Newberger, Netanel) Modified on 3/28/2019 to add motion. (Quinlan, Krista). (Entered: 03/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Netanel Newberger on behalf of All Defendants (aty to be noticed) (Newberger, Netanel) (Entered: 03/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Demos P. Demopoulos, William Cassese, Kenneth Barrett, Daniel J. Gatto, John A. Curcio. Y & M Transit Corp. served on 3/6/2019, answer due 3/27/2019. (Treiman, Daniel) (Entered: 03/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Demos P. Demopoulos, William Cassese, Kenneth Barrett, Daniel J. Gatto, John A. Curcio. Jofaz Transportation, Inc. served on 3/6/2019, answer due 3/27/2019. (Treiman, Daniel) (Entered: 03/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Anusha Rasalingam on behalf of Kenneth Barrett, William Cassese, John A. Curcio, Demos P. Demopoulos, Daniel J. Gatto (aty to be noticed) (Rasalingam, Anusha) (Entered: 02/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 02/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 02/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 02/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • Case assigned to Chief Judge Dora Lizette Irizarry and Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 02/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Jofaz Transportation, Inc., Y & M Transit Corp. filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-11221249 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Demos P. Demopoulos, William Cassese, Kenneth Barrett, Daniel J. Gatto, John A. Curcio. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons) (Treiman, Daniel) (Entered: 02/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Jofaz Transportation, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Anusha Rasalingam