This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/08/2021 at 07:13:51 (UTC).

Demopoulos et al v. Curcio et al

Case Summary

On 11/09/2020 Demopoulos filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against Curcio. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Peggy Kuo and Roslynn R. Mauskopf. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-05441

  • Filing Date:

    11/09/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Peggy Kuo

Presiding Judge

Roslynn R. Mauskopf

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Counter Defendants

Demos P. Demopoulos

Stephen Malone

Michael Spinelli

Defendants and Counter Claimants

William Cassese

John Curcio

Kenneth Barrett

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorney

Erin Veronica McGee

Attorney at Friedman and Anspach

1500 Broadway, Suite 2300

New York, NY 10036

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

Jeffrey D. Pollack

Attorney at Mintz & Gold, LLP

600 Third Avenue 25Th Floor

New York, NY 10016

Gabriel Altman

Attorney at Mintz and Gold LLP

600 Third Avenue, Ste 25Th Floor

New York, NY 10016

 

Court Documents

#15

#14

#13

#12

#11

#10

#9

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #2

Proposed Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketOrder. A telephonic status conference is scheduled for January 11, 2021 at 2:00pm. The parties are directed to call toll free (877) 336-1274 and input the access code 1453850 at the time of the conference. No additional security code is needed. Once all parties are on the line, the call will be connected. (The parties are reminded that, pursuant to Local Civil Rule 1.8, they may not independently record any court proceedings. A transcript of the proceedings may be ordered from the Clerk's Office.)The parties are directed to be prepared to discuss whether they jointly request the appointment of a special master and, if so, the proposed scope of that person's duties. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo on 1/4/2021. (Rand, Matthew) (Entered: 01/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Plaintiffs' ANSWER to #6 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Demos P. Demopoulos, Stephen Malone, Michael Spinelli. (McGee, Erin) (Entered: 12/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • DocketORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Chief Judge Roslynn R. Mauskopf and Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo for all further proceedings. Judge Margo K. Brodie, Chief Magistrate Cheryl L. Pollak no longer assigned to case Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Ordered by Chief Judge Roslynn R. Mauskopf on 12/18/2020. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 12/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Local 854 Pension and Welfare Funds on 12/4/2020, filed by Demos P. Demopoulos, Stephen Malone, Michael Spinelli. (McGee, Erin) (Entered: 12/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Albert J. Alimena, Managing Director of Local 854 Pension and Welfare Funds on 11/18/2020, filed by Demos P. Demopoulos, Stephen Malone, Michael Spinelli. (McGee, Erin) (Entered: 12/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michael Spinelli, Stephen Malone, Demos P. Demopoulos. Kenneth Barrett served on 11/16/2020, answer due 12/7/2020. (McGee, Erin) (Entered: 12/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michael Spinelli, Stephen Malone, Demos P. Demopoulos. William Cassese served on 11/12/2020, answer due 12/3/2020. (McGee, Erin) (Entered: 12/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michael Spinelli, Stephen Malone, Demos P. Demopoulos. John Curcio served on 11/12/2020, answer due 12/3/2020. (McGee, Erin) (Entered: 12/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) STATUS REPORT by Demos P. Demopoulos, Stephen Malone, Michael Spinelli (McGee, Erin) (Entered: 12/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Letter Informing Court of Recent Developments in Mar-Can Litigation by Kenneth Barrett, William Cassese, John Curcio (Pollack, Jeffrey) (Entered: 12/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Gabriel Altman on behalf of Kenneth Barrett, William Cassese, John Curcio (aty to be noticed) (Altman, Gabriel) (Entered: 11/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Defendant Employer Trustees' ANSWER to #1 Complaint, filed by Plaintiffs, First COUNTERCLAIM asserted against All Plaintiffs by All Defendants. (Pollack, Jeffrey) (Entered: 11/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Notice of Related Case: The Civil Cover Sheet filed in this civil action indicates a related case. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Margo K. Brodie and Chief Magistrate Cheryl L. Pollak. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Kenneth Barrett, William Cassese, John Curcio filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-13656945 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Demos P. Demopoulos, Michael Spinelli, Stephen Malone. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons) (McGee, Erin) (Entered: 11/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Gabriel Altman

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jeffrey Dean Pollack