This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/19/2022 at 08:38:35 (UTC).

Demirgian v. Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 05/20/2022 Demirgian filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Connecticut District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Robert N. Chatigny. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:22-CV-00687

  • Filing Date:

    05/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Robert N. Chatigny

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Charles O. Demirgian

Defendants

Specialized Loan Servicing LLC

Wells Fargo Home Mortgage, Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Eric Lindh Foster

Attorney at Eric Lindh Foster Law, LLC

48 Main Street

Old Saybrook, CT 06475

Defendant Attorneys

Kevin P. Polansky

Attorney at Nelson Mullins Riley & Scarborough LLP

One Financial Center, 35Th Floor

Boston, MA 02111

Sean R. Higgins

Attorney at K&L Gates, LLP- MA

State Street Financial Center, One Lincoln Street

Boston, MA 02111-2950

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Charles O. Demirgian re #13 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (Foster, Eric) (Entered: 06/09/2022)

#13

(#13) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Dismissing Case by Charles O. Demirgian (Foster, Eric) (Entered: 06/09/2022)

#11

(#11) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until June 24, 2022 Answer Complaint #1 Notice of Removal, by Specialized Loan Servicing LLC. (Polansky, Kevin) (Entered: 05/24/2022)

#9

(#9) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until Friday, June 24, 2022 To Respond to Complaint by Wells Fargo Home Mortgage, Inc. (Higgins, Sean) (Entered: 05/24/2022)

#8

(#8) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Wells Fargo Home Mortgage, Inc identifying Corporate Parent Wells Fargo & Company, Other Affiliate Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. for Wells Fargo Home Mortgage, Inc. (Higgins, Sean) (Entered: 05/24/2022)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Sean R. Higgins on behalf of Wells Fargo Home Mortgage, Inc (Higgins, Sean) (Entered: 05/24/2022)

6 #1

Standing Order on Removed Cases

6 #6

Main Document

#5

(#5) STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 5/20/2022.(LaLone, L.) (Entered: 05/20/2022)

#4

(#4) ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 5/20/2022.(LaLone, L.) (Entered: 05/20/2022)

#3

(#3) Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 7/19/2022 Discovery due by 11/19/2022 Dispositive Motions due by 12/24/2022 Signed by Clerk on 5/20/2022.(LaLone, L.) (Entered: 05/20/2022)

#2

(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Specialized Loan Servicing LLC. (Polansky, Kevin) (Entered: 05/20/2022)

1 #5

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #4

Exhibit D/Complaint & Summons served on SLS

1 #3

Exhibit C/Complaint & Summons served on Wells Fargo

1 #2

Exhibit B/Notice of Filing Notice of Removal

1 #1

Exhibit A/Complaint

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/10/2022
  • DocketJUDICIAL PROCEEDINGS SURVEY - FOR COUNSEL ONLY: The following link to the confidential survey requires you to log into CM/ECF for SECURITY purposes. Once in CM/ECF you will be prompted for the case number. Although you are receiving this survey through CM/ECF, it is hosted on an independent website called SurveyMonkey. Once in SurveyMonkey, the survey is located in a secure account. The survey is not docketed and it is not sent directly to the judge. To ensure anonymity, completed surveys are held up to 90 days before they are sent to the judge for review. We hope you will take this opportunity to participate, please click on this link: https://ecf.ctd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/Dispatch.pl?survey (LaLone, L.) (Entered: 06/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Approved. So ORDERED re #13 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Charles O. Demirgian. Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 6/9/2022. (Rickevicius, L.) (Entered: 06/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Charles O. Demirgian re #13 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (Foster, Eric) (Entered: 06/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Dismissing Case by Charles O. Demirgian (Foster, Eric) (Entered: 06/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • DocketAnswer deadline updated for Specialized Loan Servicing LLC to 6/24/2022. (Rickevicius, L.) (Entered: 05/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER granting #11 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to 6/24/2022 to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 5/24/2022. (Rickevicius, L.) (Entered: 05/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until June 24, 2022 Answer Complaint #1 Notice of Removal, by Specialized Loan Servicing LLC. (Polansky, Kevin) (Entered: 05/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • DocketAnswer deadline updated for Wells Fargo Home Mortgage, Inc to 6/24/2022. (Rickevicius, L.) (Entered: 05/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER granting #9 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to 6/24/2022 to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 5/24/2022. (Rickevicius, L.) (Entered: 05/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until Friday, June 24, 2022 To Respond to Complaint by Wells Fargo Home Mortgage, Inc. (Higgins, Sean) (Entered: 05/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Wells Fargo Home Mortgage, Inc identifying Corporate Parent Wells Fargo & Company, Other Affiliate Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. for Wells Fargo Home Mortgage, Inc. (Higgins, Sean) (Entered: 05/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Sean R. Higgins on behalf of Wells Fargo Home Mortgage, Inc (Higgins, Sean) (Entered: 05/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #4 Electronic Filing Order, #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Specialized Loan Servicing LLC, #3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #2 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Specialized Loan Servicing LLC, #5 Standing Protective Order Signed by Clerk on 5/20/2022. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order on Removed Cases)(LaLone, L.) (Entered: 05/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 5/20/2022.(LaLone, L.) (Entered: 05/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 5/20/2022.(LaLone, L.) (Entered: 05/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 7/19/2022 Discovery due by 11/19/2022 Dispositive Motions due by 12/24/2022 Signed by Clerk on 5/20/2022.(LaLone, L.) (Entered: 05/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketJudge Robert N. Chatigny added. (Freberg, B) (Entered: 05/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Specialized Loan Servicing LLC. (Polansky, Kevin) (Entered: 05/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC from Hartford Superior Court Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ACTDC-6940165, filed by Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A/Complaint, #2 Exhibit B/Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #3 Exhibit C/Complaint & Summons served on Wells Fargo, #4 Exhibit D/Complaint & Summons served on SLS, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Polansky, Kevin) (Entered: 05/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WELLS FARGO HOME MORTGAGE is a litigant

Latest cases where Specialized Loan Servicing LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Sean R. Higgins

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kevin Patrick Polansky Esq.