This case was last updated from PACER on 03/06/2020 at 07:28:30 (UTC).

DEMBRY v. LANKENAU MEDICAL CENTER et al

Case Summary

On 01/06/2020 DEMBRY filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against LANKENAU MEDICAL CENTER. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is NITZA I QUINONES ALEJANDRO. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-00084

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pennsylvania Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

NITZA I QUINONES ALEJANDRO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

EARL DEMBRY

Defendants

LANKENAU MEDICAL CENTER

THOMAS BOWMAN

MAIN LINE HEALTH

LANKENAU MEDICAL PUBLIC SAFETY

JAMES BURESS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RANIA M. MAJOR

2915 North 5Th Street

Philadelphia, PA 19133

Defendant Attorneys

AIMEE L. KUMER

Attorney at ELLIOTT GREENLEAF, P.C.

P O Box 3010, 925 Harvest Dr Suite 300

Blue Bell, PA 19422

ANDREW ESTEPANI

Attorney at ELLIOTT GREENLEAF, P.C.

925 Harvest Drive, Suite 300

Blue Bell, PA 19422

HENRY F. SIEDZIKOWSKI

Attorney at ELLIOTT GREENLEAF, PC

P O Box 3010, 925 Harvest Drive, Suite 300

Blue Bell, PA 19422

 

Court Documents

8 #16

ATTACHMENT

8 #15

ATTACHMENT

8 #13

ATTACHMENT

8 #11

ATTACHMENT

8 #2

ATTACHMENT

8 #1

ATTACHMENT

8 #18

ATTACHMENT

8 #12

ATTACHMENT

8 #3

ATTACHMENT

8 #8

ATTACHMENT

8 #14

ATTACHMENT

8 #5

ATTACHMENT

8 #6

ATTACHMENT

8 #7

ATTACHMENT

8 #19

ATTACHMENT

8 #17

ATTACHMENT

8 #4

ATTACHMENT

#8

(#8) Original Record together with certified copy of docket entries received from Court of Common Pleas of MONTGOMERY County. (Attachments: #1 ATTACHMENT, #2 ATTACHMENT, #3 ATTACHMENT, #4 ATTACHMENT, #5 ATTACHMENT, #6 ATTACHMENT, #7 ATTACHMENT, #8 ATTACHMENT, #9 ATTACHMENT, #10 ATTACHMENT, #11 ATTACHMENT, #12 ATTACHMENT, #13 ATTACHMENT, #14 ATTACHMENT, #15 ATTACHMENT, #16 ATTACHMENT, #17 ATTACHMENT, #18 ATTACHMENT, #19 ATTACHMENT)(amas) (Entered: 02/25/2020)

27 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Original Record together with certified copy of docket entries received from Court of Common Pleas of MONTGOMERY County. (Attachments: #1 ATTACHMENT, #2 ATTACHMENT, #3 ATTACHMENT, #4 ATTACHMENT, #5 ATTACHMENT, #6 ATTACHMENT, #7 ATTACHMENT, #8 ATTACHMENT, #9 ATTACHMENT, #10 ATTACHMENT, #11 ATTACHMENT, #12 ATTACHMENT, #13 ATTACHMENT, #14 ATTACHMENT, #15 ATTACHMENT, #16 ATTACHMENT, #17 ATTACHMENT, #18 ATTACHMENT, #19 ATTACHMENT)(amas) (Entered: 02/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER THAT DEFTS' MOTION TO DISMISS [ECF 21] IS GRANTED AS FOLLOWS: THE CLAIMS SET FORTH IN COUNTS I, IV, V, & VII ARE DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, & THIS COURT DECLINES TO EXERCISE SUPPLEMENTAL JURISDICTION OVER THE STATE-LAW CLAIMS ALLEGED AT COUNTS II, III, VI, & VIII, WHICH ARE, ACCORDINGLY, DISMISSED, WITHOUT PREJUDICE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE NITZA I QUINONES ALEJANDRO ON 2/19/20.2/20/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kw, ) (Entered: 02/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER THAT THE PROTHONOTARY MAY SUBMIT SUCH RECORDS IN ELECTRONIC FORMAT TO THE CLERK OF COURT FOR FILING IN THIS MATTER. SIGNED BY HONORABLE NITZA I QUINONES ALEJANDRO ON 2/12/20. 2/13/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, ) (Entered: 02/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by HENRY F. SIEDZIKOWSKI on behalf of THOMAS BOWMAN, JAMES BURESS, LANKENAU MEDICAL CENTER, LANKENAU MEDICAL PUBLIC SAFETY, MAIN LINE HEALTH with Certificate of Service(SIEDZIKOWSKI, HENRY) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Main Line Health, Inc. with Certificate of Service by LANKENAU MEDICAL CENTER, LANKENAU MEDICAL PUBLIC SAFETY, MAIN LINE HEALTH.(KUMER, AIMEE) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by ANDREW ESTEPANI on behalf of THOMAS BOWMAN, JAMES BURESS, LANKENAU MEDICAL CENTER, LANKENAU MEDICAL PUBLIC SAFETY, MAIN LINE HEALTH with Certificate of Service(ESTEPANI, ANDREW) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by THOMAS BOWMAN, JAMES BURESS, LANKENAU MEDICAL CENTER, LANKENAU MEDICAL PUBLIC SAFETY, MAIN LINE HEALTH.Memorandum, Certificate of Service, Proposed Order. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(KUMER, AIMEE) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by THOMAS BOWMAN, JAMES BURESS, LANKENAU MEDICAL CENTER, LANKENAU MEDICAL PUBLIC SAFETY, MAIN LINE HEALTH from Court of Common Pleas of Montgomery County, case number 2019-24018. Certificate of Service. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 209237) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheets, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3)(ahf) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.