This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/16/2023 at 07:48:49 (UTC).

Dembiczak v. Fashion Nova LLC

Case Summary

On 03/17/2023 Dembiczak filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Fashion Nova LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Washington Western District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Lauren King. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:23-CV-00408

  • Filing Date:

    03/17/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Lauren King

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Emily Dembiczak

Defendant

Fashion Nova LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Wright A Noel

Grace Bennett

Simon Franzini

Defendant Attorneys

Amy P Lally

Anna Tutundjian

Chad S Hummel

Tatiana K Fields

Robin Wechkin

 

Court Documents

#30

(#30) ORDER granting Parties' #23 Stipulated MOTION TO EXTEND DEADLINES AND STAY DISCOVERY. The deadline for Plaintiff's response to Fashion Novas motion is 5/22/2023, and the deadline for a Reply is 6/2/2023. Fashion Nova's deadline to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's complaint and the Court's 4/7/2023 Order regarding initial disclosures and a joint status report (Dkt. No. #10 ), are STAYED pending resolution of Fashion Nova's motion to compel arbitration (Dkt. No #24 ). The Court will issue a new scheduling order after resolving Fashion Nova's motion. Signed by Judge Lauren King. (SS) (Entered: 04/21/2023)

24 #10

Proposed Order

24 #8

Declaration of Anna Tutundjian

24 #7

Exhibit F to Satur Declaration

24 #4

Exhibit C to Satur Declaration

24 #3

Exhibit B to Satur Declaration

24 #1

Declaration of Roger Satur

#24

(#24) MOTION to Compel ARBITRATION AND STAY PROCEEDINGS, filed by Defendant Fashion Nova LLC. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Roger Satur, #2 Exhibit A to Satur Declaration, #3 Exhibit B to Satur Declaration, #4 Exhibit C to Satur Declaration, #5 Exhibit D to Satur Declaration, #6 Exhibit E to Satur Declaration, #7 Exhibit F to Satur Declaration, #8 Declaration of Anna Tutundjian, #9 Exhibit A to Tutundjian Declaration, #10 Proposed Order) Noting Date 6/2/2023 5/12/2023, (Wechkin, Robin) Modified on 4/21/2023 per Dkt. No. #30 . (NAW) (Entered: 04/20/2023)

#10

(#22) MINUTE ORDER (text only) authorized by Judge Lauren King. The Court DENIES without prejudice the parties' #21 Stipulated Motion and Proposed Order to Extend Time. In their "motion," the parties seek a stay of Fashion Nova's deadline to file an answer and/or motion to dismiss, but by separate email to the Court's Courtroom Deputy, they request a stay of other deadlines set by the Court in its April 7, 2023 Order (Dkt. No. #10 ). Although the parties are permitted to seek "extensions" of the initial scheduling deadlines via email to the Courtroom Deputy, Dkt. No. #10 at 1, they are not permitted to seek wholesale stays. Should the parties choose to file another motion seeking similar relief, the motion must identify the full scope of relief they seek and provide legal and factual support for such relief. (NAW) (Entered: 04/18/2023)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Robin Wechkin on behalf of Defendant Fashion Nova LLC. (Wechkin, Robin) (Entered: 04/07/2023)

#7

(#7) SERVICE OF SUMMONS and Complaint returned executed upon defendant Fashion Nova LLC on 3/30/2023 (Franzini, Simon) (Entered: 04/03/2023)

#5

(#6) ORDER re #5 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Simon Franzini for Plaintiff Emily Dembiczak by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d). (JWC) (Entered: 03/22/2023)

#4

(#4) STANDING ORDER FOR ALL CIVIL CASES. The procedures in this Order supplement, and in some cases, supersede the local rules. The parties are responsible for being familiar with the procedures in this Order. Failure to comply with the procedures may result in sanctions. Signed by Judge Lauren King. (NAW) (Entered: 03/21/2023)

#3

(#3) STANDING ORDER REGARDING 28 U.S.C. 455(b)(2) AND CANON 3(C)(1)(B) OF THE CODE OF CONDUCT FOR UNITED STATES JUDGES by Judge Lauren King. (NAW) (Entered: 03/21/2023)

#2

(#2) Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Fashion Nova LLC (JWC) (Entered: 03/20/2023)

1 #2

Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Fashion Nova, LLC with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # AWAWDC-7933068) filed by Emily Dembiczak. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Noel, Wright) (Attachment 1 replaced on 3/20/2023) (JWC). Modified on 3/20/2023 to flatten Civil Cover Sheet (JWC). (Entered: 03/17/2023)

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) ORDER granting Parties' #23 Stipulated MOTION TO EXTEND DEADLINES AND STAY DISCOVERY. The deadline for Plaintiff's response to Fashion Novas motion is 5/22/2023, and the deadline for a Reply is 6/2/2023. Fashion Nova's deadline to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's complaint and the Court's 4/7/2023 Order regarding initial disclosures and a joint status report (Dkt. No. #10 ), are STAYED pending resolution of Fashion Nova's motion to compel arbitration (Dkt. No #24 ). The Court will issue a new scheduling order after resolving Fashion Nova's motion. Signed by Judge Lauren King. (SS) (Entered: 04/21/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) MINUTE ORDER (text only) authorized by Judge Lauren King. Per #28 Certificate of Word Count, the Court DISCHARGES its 25 Order to Show Cause. (NAW) (Entered: 04/21/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) CERTIFICATE of Word Count re #24 MOTION to Compel ARBITRATION AND STAY PROCEEDINGS by Defendant Fashion Nova LLC (Wechkin, Robin) (Entered: 04/21/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) ORDER re #26 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Grace Bennett FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. The Court ADMITS Attorney Grace Bennett for Plaintiff Emily Dembiczak by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d). (JWC) (Entered: 04/21/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFILING FEE RECEIVED: PRO HAC VICE in re #26 $ 238.00, receipt number SEA 200001857. (RE) (Entered: 04/21/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Grace Bennett FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE by Plaintiff Emily Dembiczak. Receipt No. AWAWDC-7937915 (Noel, Wright) Modified on 4/21/2023 incorrect receipt number, payment will be made over phone (STP). (Entered: 04/21/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) MINUTE ORDER (text only) authorized by Judge Lauren King. Fashion Nova is ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE why the Court should not strike its #24 Motion to Compel Arbitration and the #24 -1-- #24 -10 supporting declarations because the motion violates Local Civil Rule 7(e)(6) (requiring a certification of word count). Fashion Nova must file a certification of word count by April 24, 2023, identifying any overlength portions of the motion; otherwise, the Court will strike the motion and declarations in their entirety. The Court will not consider any overlength portions of the motion. The Court further cautions all parties that it expects strict compliance with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the Local Civil Rules, and its Standing Order for All Civil Cases. The Court will summarily strike any future filings that do not comply with the requirements set forth in those sources, and may impose sanctions as appropriate. (NAW) (Entered: 04/21/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) MOTION to Compel ARBITRATION AND STAY PROCEEDINGS, filed by Defendant Fashion Nova LLC. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Roger Satur, #2 Exhibit A to Satur Declaration, #3 Exhibit B to Satur Declaration, #4 Exhibit C to Satur Declaration, #5 Exhibit D to Satur Declaration, #6 Exhibit E to Satur Declaration, #7 Exhibit F to Satur Declaration, #8 Declaration of Anna Tutundjian, #9 Exhibit A to Tutundjian Declaration, #10 Proposed Order) Noting Date 6/2/2023 5/12/2023, (Wechkin, Robin) Modified on 4/21/2023 per Dkt. No. #30 . (NAW) (Entered: 04/20/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) Stipulated MOTION TO EXTEND DEADLINES AND STAY DISCOVERY, filed by Defendant Fashion Nova LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 4/19/2023, (Wechkin, Robin) (Entered: 04/19/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) MINUTE ORDER (text only) authorized by Judge Lauren King. The Court DENIES without prejudice the parties' #21 Stipulated Motion and Proposed Order to Extend Time. In their "motion," the parties seek a stay of Fashion Nova's deadline to file an answer and/or motion to dismiss, but by separate email to the Court's Courtroom Deputy, they request a stay of other deadlines set by the Court in its April 7, 2023 Order (Dkt. No. #10 ). Although the parties are permitted to seek "extensions" of the initial scheduling deadlines via email to the Courtroom Deputy, Dkt. No. #10 at 1, they are not permitted to seek wholesale stays. Should the parties choose to file another motion seeking similar relief, the motion must identify the full scope of relief they seek and provide legal and factual support for such relief. (NAW) (Entered: 04/18/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 04/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Fashion Nova Holding, LLC for Fashion Nova LLC. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1). Filed by Fashion Nova LLC. (Wechkin, Robin) (Entered: 04/07/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Robin Wechkin on behalf of Defendant Fashion Nova LLC. (Wechkin, Robin) (Entered: 04/07/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SERVICE OF SUMMONS and Complaint returned executed upon defendant Fashion Nova LLC on 3/30/2023 (Franzini, Simon) (Entered: 04/03/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER re #5 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Simon Franzini for Plaintiff Emily Dembiczak by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d). (JWC) (Entered: 03/22/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Simon Franzini FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Emily Dembiczak (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7937915 (Noel, Wright) (Entered: 03/22/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) STANDING ORDER FOR ALL CIVIL CASES. The procedures in this Order supplement, and in some cases, supersede the local rules. The parties are responsible for being familiar with the procedures in this Order. Failure to comply with the procedures may result in sanctions. Signed by Judge Lauren King. (NAW) (Entered: 03/21/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) STANDING ORDER REGARDING 28 U.S.C. 455(b)(2) AND CANON 3(C)(1)(B) OF THE CODE OF CONDUCT FOR UNITED STATES JUDGES by Judge Lauren King. (NAW) (Entered: 03/21/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Fashion Nova LLC (JWC) (Entered: 03/20/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2023
  • DocketJudge Lauren King added. (JWC) (Entered: 03/20/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Fashion Nova, LLC with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # AWAWDC-7933068) filed by Emily Dembiczak. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Noel, Wright) (Attachment 1 replaced on 3/20/2023) (JWC). Modified on 3/20/2023 to flatten Civil Cover Sheet (JWC). (Entered: 03/17/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less