This case was last updated from PACER on 08/06/2019 at 07:43:15 (UTC).

DeMarco v. Warden

Case Summary

On 06/07/2019 DeMarco filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against Warden. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Indiana Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Jon E DeGuilio and Michael G Gotsch, Sr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-00448

  • Filing Date:

    06/07/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Indiana Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jon E DeGuilio

Referral Judge

Michael G Gotsch, Sr

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Anthony J DeMarco

Michigan City, IN 46360

Respondent

Warden

Not Yet Classified

INDIANA STATE PRISON E-FILE (Court Use Only)

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Clarification by Anthony J DeMarco (Attachments: #1 Exhibits)(nae) (Entered: 07/11/2019)

#1

(#1) Consent to Receipt of Documents Through Prisoner Electronic Filing Program (ISP) by Anthony J DeMarco (nae) (Entered: 06/10/2019)

#6

(#6) ORDER: The Court DIRECTS the clerk to place this cause number on a blank habeas corpus petition, AO-241 (Rev. 1/15) (Conviction, INND Rev. 8/16) and a blank prisoner in forma pauperis petition, and send them to Anthony J DeMarco. The Court GRANTS Anthony J DeMarco until 08/19/2019 to file an amended habeas corpus petition on the forms provided and CAUTIONS Anthony J DeMarco that if he does not respond by that deadline, this case will be dismissed without further notice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 07/19/2019. (Copy mailed as directed in Order) (jat) (Entered: 07/19/2019)

2 #1

Exhibit

#3

(#3) ORDER DIRECTING the clerk to place this cause number on a blank habeas corpus petition and a blank prisoner in forma pauperis petition, and send them to Petitioner; GRANTS Petitioner until 7/20/2019 to resolve his filing fee status and file an amended habeas corpus petition on the forms provided; and CAUTIONS Petitioner that if he does not respond by that deadline, this case will be dismissed without further notice. Signed by Judge Jon E DeGuilio on 6/21/2019. (bas) (Entered: 06/21/2019)

#2

(#2) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Anthony J DeMarco. (No filing fee or IFP received) (Attachments: #1 Exhibits)(nae) (Entered: 06/10/2019)

5 #1

Exhibit

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER: The Court DIRECTS the clerk to place this cause number on a blank habeas corpus petition, AO-241 (Rev. 1/15) (Conviction, INND Rev. 8/16) and a blank prisoner in forma pauperis petition, and send them to Anthony J DeMarco. The Court GRANTS Anthony J DeMarco until 08/19/2019 to file an amended habeas corpus petition on the forms provided and CAUTIONS Anthony J DeMarco that if he does not respond by that deadline, this case will be dismissed without further notice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 07/19/2019. (Copy mailed as directed in Order) (jat) (Entered: 07/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Clarification by Anthony J DeMarco (Attachments: #1 Exhibits)(nae) (Entered: 07/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • (#4) Filing fee: $ 5 received, receipt number 3022682 (sbcounter, ) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ORDER DIRECTING the clerk to place this cause number on a blank habeas corpus petition and a blank prisoner in forma pauperis petition, and send them to Petitioner; GRANTS Petitioner until 7/20/2019 to resolve his filing fee status and file an amended habeas corpus petition on the forms provided; and CAUTIONS Petitioner that if he does not respond by that deadline, this case will be dismissed without further notice. Signed by Judge Jon E DeGuilio on 6/21/2019. (bas) (Entered: 06/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Anthony J DeMarco. (No filing fee or IFP received) (Attachments: #1 Exhibits)(nae) (Entered: 06/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Consent to Receipt of Documents Through Prisoner Electronic Filing Program (ISP) by Anthony J DeMarco (nae) (Entered: 06/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.