This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/23/2022 at 07:28:42 (UTC).

Delva v. Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC

Case Summary

On 11/24/2021 Delva filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Ann M Donnelly and Taryn A. Merkl. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-06576

  • Filing Date:

    11/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Ann M Donnelly

Referral Judge

Taryn A. Merkl

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Sophie Delva

Defendant

Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Ramona Veronica Singh

1910 Pacific Avenue, Suite 14155

Dallas, TX 75201

Ramona Singh Ladwig

Attorney at Kazerouni Law Group, APC

1910 Pacific Avenue, Suite 14155

Dallas, TX 75024

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Summons

#2

(#2) ORDER: Plaintiff is ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE no later than November 23, 2021 as to why this action should not be transferred to the Eastern District of New York. In the alternative, if Plaintiff is willing to transfer this action to the Eastern District of New York, the Court requests that Plaintiff submit a letter stating that it consents to the transfer of this action to the Eastern District of New York no later than November 23, 2021. Plaintiff is directed to serve a copy of this order on all Defendants in this action and to retain proof of service. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 11/16/2021) (jca) [Transferred from New York Southern on 11/24/2021.] (Entered: 11/16/2021)

#3

(#3) LETTER addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Ramona Ladwig, Esq. dated November 23, 2021 re: Consent to Transfer of Venue. Document filed by Sophie Delva..(Singh, Ramona) [Transferred from New York Southern on 11/24/2021.] (Entered: 11/23/2021)

#4

(#4) ORDER: The Court may transfer a case '[f]or the convenience of the parties and witnesses, in the interest of justice." 28 U.S.C. 1404(a). The Court may also transfer a case based on the consent of the parties. 28 U.S.C. 1404(b). Plaintiff, the only party to appear in this case, has consented to transfer to the Eastern District of New York. Accordingly, the Court orders that this case be transferred to the Eastern District of New York. Plaintiff is directed to serve a copy of this order on all Defendants in this action and to retain proof of service. The Clerk of Court is directed to transfer this case to the Eastern District of New York without delay. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 11/23/2021) (rro) [Transferred from New York Southern on 11/24/2021.] (Entered: 11/23/2021)

5 #5

Main Document Public Docket Sheet

5 #1

*Restricted*

#6

(#6) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Neptune, Pierre) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

7 #7

Main Document

7 #1

Certificate of Service

#8

(#8) Summons Issued as to Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC. (Guzzi, Roseann) (Entered: 01/05/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Summons Issued as to Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC. (Guzzi, Roseann) (Entered: 01/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint, by Sophie Delva (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Singh Ladwig, Ramona) (Entered: 01/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Neptune, Pierre) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketThe case of Delva v. Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC, has been transferred from Southern District of New York to the Eastern District of New York. The new case number is 21-cv-6576. PLEASE NOTE: if you plan to continue representing your client(s), you must be admitted to practice before this court. You must do so by applying for Pro Hac Vice or permanent admission. To apply for Pro Hac Vice admission, you must first register for an ECF login and password. Please visit the Court's website at www.nyed.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions for guidance. Once registered, you must electronically file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You must pay the required pro hac vice fee online. (Neptune, Pierre) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Case transferred in from District of New York Southern; Case Number 1:21-cv-09366. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 11/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketCASE TRANSFERRED OUT ELECTRONICALLY from the U.S.D.C. Southern District of New York to the United States District Court - District of Eastern District of New York.(rro) [Transferred from New York Southern on 11/24/2021.] (Entered: 11/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER: The Court may transfer a case '[f]or the convenience of the parties and witnesses, in the interest of justice." 28 U.S.C. 1404(a). The Court may also transfer a case based on the consent of the parties. 28 U.S.C. 1404(b). Plaintiff, the only party to appear in this case, has consented to transfer to the Eastern District of New York. Accordingly, the Court orders that this case be transferred to the Eastern District of New York. Plaintiff is directed to serve a copy of this order on all Defendants in this action and to retain proof of service. The Clerk of Court is directed to transfer this case to the Eastern District of New York without delay. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 11/23/2021) (rro) [Transferred from New York Southern on 11/24/2021.] (Entered: 11/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) LETTER addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Ramona Ladwig, Esq. dated November 23, 2021 re: Consent to Transfer of Venue. Document filed by Sophie Delva..(Singh, Ramona) [Transferred from New York Southern on 11/24/2021.] (Entered: 11/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ORDER: Plaintiff is ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE no later than November 23, 2021 as to why this action should not be transferred to the Eastern District of New York. In the alternative, if Plaintiff is willing to transfer this action to the Eastern District of New York, the Court requests that Plaintiff submit a letter stating that it consents to the transfer of this action to the Eastern District of New York no later than November 23, 2021. Plaintiff is directed to serve a copy of this order on all Defendants in this action and to retain proof of service. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 11/16/2021) (jca) [Transferred from New York Southern on 11/24/2021.] (Entered: 11/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Ramona Veronica Singh to RE-FILE Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong event type was used to file the request for issuance of summons; the summons request must be filed separately;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (jgo) [Transferred from New York Southern on 11/24/2021.] (Entered: 11/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (jgo) [Transferred from New York Southern on 11/24/2021.] (Entered: 11/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo) [Transferred from New York Southern on 11/24/2021.] (Entered: 11/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Gregory H. Woods. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo) [Transferred from New York Southern on 11/24/2021.] (Entered: 11/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Ramona Veronica Singh. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Dollar Demand $1,000,000; County code Albany;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Dollar Demand has been modified to $1,000; the County code has been modified to Kings;. (jgo) [Transferred from New York Southern on 11/24/2021.] (Entered: 11/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Ramona Veronica Singh. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet separately. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (jgo) [Transferred from New York Southern on 11/24/2021.] (Entered: 11/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25326578)Document filed by Sophie Delva. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons).(Singh, Ramona) [Transferred from New York Southern on 11/24/2021.] (Entered: 11/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC is a litigant