Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 10/22/2019 at 08:19:09 (UTC).

DELTITO v. KEYSTONE STATE CONTRACTORS, INC.

Case Summary

On 08/23/2019 DELTITO filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against KEYSTONE STATE CONTRACTORS, INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is WENDY BEETLESTONE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-03832

  • Filing Date:

    08/23/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pennsylvania Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

WENDY BEETLESTONE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ANTHONY DELTITO

Defendant

KEYSTONE STATE CONTRACTORS, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

PREEYA BANSAL

Attorney at MURPHY LAW GROUP LLC

8 Penn Center, Suite 2000, 1628 John F Kennedy Blvd

Philadelphia, PA 19103

MICHAEL PATRICK MURPHY, JR.

Attorney at MURPHY LAW GROUP LLC

Eight Penn Center Suite 2000, 1628 John F Kennedy Blvd

Philadelphia, PA 19103

 

Court Documents

#3

(#3) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by ANTHONY DELTITO. KEYSTONE STATE CONTRACTORS, INC. waiver sent on 9/9/2019, answer due 11/8/2019. (MURPHY, MICHAEL) (Entered: 10/02/2019)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL PATRICK MURPHY, JR on behalf of ANTHONY DELTITO with Jury Demand and Certificate of Service(MURPHY, MICHAEL) (Entered: 09/10/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet/Des. Form/Track Form

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against KEYSTONE STATE CONTRACTORS, INC. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 202531.), filed by ANTHONY DELTITO. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet/Des. Form/Track Form)(fdc, ) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by ANTHONY DELTITO. KEYSTONE STATE CONTRACTORS, INC. waiver sent on 9/9/2019, answer due 11/8/2019. (MURPHY, MICHAEL) (Entered: 10/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL PATRICK MURPHY, JR on behalf of ANTHONY DELTITO with Jury Demand and Certificate of Service(MURPHY, MICHAEL) (Entered: 09/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • One (1) Summons Issued as to KEYSTONE STATE CONTRACTORS, INC.. Forwarded To: Preeya Bansal, Esq. on 8/23/19. (fdc) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • DEMAND for Trial by Jury by ANTHONY DELTITO. (fdc, ) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against KEYSTONE STATE CONTRACTORS, INC. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 202531.), filed by ANTHONY DELTITO. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet/Des. Form/Track Form)(fdc, ) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer PREEYA BANSAL

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MICHAEL PATRICK MURPHY, JR.