This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/04/2020 at 20:31:53 (UTC).

Delta T, LLC v. Williams et al

Case Summary

On 07/17/2020 Delta T, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Williams. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Matthew W. McFarland. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00559

  • Filing Date:

    07/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Matthew W. McFarland

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Delta T, LLC doing business as Big Ass Fans

Petitioner

Leo Ming Min Rachel

Defendants and Counter Claimants

Vortikul Ltd.

Dafydd & Yong, Pte. Ltd.

David T. Williams

Counter Defendant

Delta T, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

Ann Gallagher Schoen

Attorney at Frost Brown Todd LLC - 1

3300 Great American Tower, 301 East Fourth Street

Cincinnati, OH 45202-4182

Barry D. Hunter

Attorney at Frost Brown Todd LLC - 1

2700 Lexington Financial Center, 250 W Main Street

Lexington, KY 40507-1749

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

Christopher J. Dutton

Attorney at Porter Wright Morris and Arthur

250 East Fifth Street, Suite 2200

Cincinnati, OH 45202

Jay A Yurkiw

Attorney at Porter Wright Morris & Arthur - 2

41 S High Street, Suite 2800

Columbus, OH 43215-6194

Martin J Miller

Attorney at Porter Wright Morris & Arthur LLP

250 East Fifth Street, Suite 2200

Cincinnati, OH 45244

James D Houston

Attorney at Strauss Troy Co LPA

150 E 4Th St, Ste 4Th Fl

Cincinnati, OH 45202

 

Court Documents

#38

#37

36 #15

Exhibit 14 - Bonfiglioli USA Inc. Subpoena

36 #14

Exhibit 13 - Distribution Agreement

36 #13

Exhibit 12 - Vortikul's Internet Press Release dated March 13, 2020

36 #12

Exhibit 11 - Vortikul Website

36 #11

Exhibit 10 - Product Specification Sheets

36 #10

Exhibit 9 - E-mail from Vortikul Seeking Dealers 4-19-2019

#35

1 #14

Summons Form - Dafydd & Yong, Pte. Ltd.

1 #8

Exhibit 8 - Design Patent USD672868

1 #7

Exhibit 7 - Treiben by Vortikl

1 #6

Exhibit 6 - Design Patent USD614757

1 #5

Exhibit 5 - Yeong email 7-15-20

1 #4

Exhibit 4 - Kelvin Low email

1 #3

Exhibit 3 - Willaims email to Enerzip

1 #2

Exhibit 2 - Vortikl homepage

1 #1

Exhibit 1 - Dafydd & Yng - Products

124 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#38) Davit D. Williams and Vortikul, LTD's ANSWER to #35 Amended Complaint and Amended, COUNTERCLAIM against Delta T, LLC filed by David T. Williams, Vortikul Ltd.. (Yurkiw, Jay) (Entered: 12/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) RESPONSE in Opposition re #36 MOTION to Compel filed by Defendants Vortikul Ltd., David T. Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Williams Deposition Transcript Excerpts, #2 Exhibit April 2019 Emails produced by Williams) (Yurkiw, Jay) (Entered: 12/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) MOTION to Compel by Plaintiff Delta T, LLC, Counter Defendant Delta T, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit 1 - Def Williams Answers & Responses to Plaintiff's Second Set of Discovery Requests, #3 Exhibit 2 - Def Vortikul, Ltd.'s Answers & Responses to Plaintiff's Second Set of Discovery Requests, #4 Exhibit 3 - Meet & Confer re Discovery Responses, #5 Exhibit 4 - Depo Transcript of Heather Sunshine Williams, #6 Exhibit 5 - Dafydd & Yong Article, #7 Exhibit 6 - D&Y Website Pages, #8 Exhibit 7 - Excerpts of Dep of David T. Williams, #9 Exhibit 8 - Docs Produced by Rachel Leo, #10 Exhibit 9 - E-mail from Vortikul Seeking Dealers 4-19-2019, #11 Exhibit 10 - Product Specification Sheets, #12 Exhibit 11 - Vortikul Website, #13 Exhibit 12 - Vortikul's Internet Press Release dated March 13, 2020, #14 Exhibit 13 - Distribution Agreement, #15 Exhibit 14 - Bonfiglioli USA Inc. Subpoena, #16 Exhibit 15 - David Williams Confidentiality and Noncompete Agreement, #17 Text of Proposed Order) (Schoen, Ann) (Entered: 11/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) AMENDED VERIFIED COMPLAINT filed by Delta T, LLC. (kaf) (Entered: 11/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTATION ORDER: This matter is before the Court on Plaintiff's #29 Motion for Leave to File its Amended Complaint. No party objects to Plaintiff amending its complaint. The Court freely grants leave to amend a complaint when justice so requires. Fed. R. Civ. P. 15(a)(2). Accordingly, the Court GRANTS Plaintiff's #29 Motion for Leave to File its Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Matthew W. McFarland on 11/17/2020. (kaf) (Entered: 11/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • DocketDeadlines set per 11/17/2020 Notation Order: Plaintiff's brief outlining discovery dispute due by 11/24/2020. Defendants' responses to Plaintiff's brief due by 12/01/2020. Plaintiff's reply due by 12/07/2020. (kaf) (Entered: 11/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • DocketMinute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Matthew W. McFarland: Telephone Conference held on 11/17/2020. Counsel for Plaintiff and Defendants present by phone. Discovery dispute discussed. Plaintiff to file brief outlining discovery dispute by no later than 11/24/2020. Defendants' responses to Plaintiff's brief due by no later than 12/01/2020. Plaintiff's reply due by no later than 12/07/2020. Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 12/02/2020 is continued to 01/13/2021 at 11:30AM via teleconference before Judge Matthew W. McFarland. Counsel shall refer to 09/18/2020 docket entry for dial-in instructions. (kaf) (Entered: 11/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • DocketNotation Order: The Telephone Conference set for 11/17/2020 at 2:30PM is RESET for 3:30PM before Judge Matthew W. McFarland. THIS IS A CHANGE IN TIME ONLY. (kaf) (Entered: 11/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) NOTICE by Defendant Dafydd & Yong, Pte. Ltd. of Filing of the Deposition Transcript of David T. Williams taken on August 28, 2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Deposition Transcript of David T. Williams, #2 Exhibit B - Exhibits to Deposition of David T. Williams) (Houston, James) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) **CORRECTED** REPLY to Response to Motion re #25 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Defendant Dafydd & Yong, Pte. Ltd.. (Houston, James) Modified docket text on 10/15/2020 (kl). (Entered: 10/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
33 More Docket Entries
  • 07/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Matthew W. McFarland: Telephone Conference held on 07/24/2020. Counsel for Plaintiff and Defendant present by phone. Defendant's Response to #3 Emergency Motion to Expedite Discovery due by 4:00PM on 07/31/2020. Plaintiff's Reply to Response due by 4:00PM on 08/03/2020. (kaf) (Entered: 07/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTATION ORDER: The Court hereby sets this case for a teleconference on Friday, July 24, 2020, at 1:30 P.M. to discuss the pending #3 Emergency Motion to Expedite Discovery. Signed by Judge Matthew W. McFarland on 07/24/2020. (kaf) (Entered: 07/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Vortikul Ltd.. Vortikul Ltd. served on 7/20/2020, answer due 8/10/2020. (Schoen, Ann) (Entered: 07/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant David T. Williams. David T. Williams served on 7/17/2020, answer due 8/7/2020. (Schoen, Ann) (Entered: 07/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • DocketIf this case is referred, it will be to Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman. (bjc) (Entered: 07/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to Dafydd & Yong, Pte. Ltd., Vortikul Ltd., David T. Williams. (kl) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. (Attachments: #1 Summons Form, #2 Summons Form) (Schoen, Ann) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Emergency MOTION to Expedite , MOTION for Discovery ( Responses due by 8/7/2020) by Plaintiff Delta T, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A - Willaims communication, #3 Exhibit B - Proposed Requests for Production of Documents, #4 Exhibit C - Proposed Notice of Deposition of David T. Williams, #5 Text of Proposed Order) (Schoen, Ann) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff Delta T, LLC. (Schoen, Ann) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND - Verified - against Dafydd & Yong, Pte. Ltd., Vortikul Ltd., David T. Williams ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-7560930), filed by Delta T, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Dafydd & Yng - Products, #2 Exhibit 2 - Vortikl homepage, #3 Exhibit 3 - Willaims email to Enerzip, #4 Exhibit 4 - Kelvin Low email, #5 Exhibit 5 - Yeong email 7-15-20, #6 Exhibit 6 - Design Patent USD614757, #7 Exhibit 7 - Treiben by Vortikl, #8 Exhibit 8 - Design Patent USD672868, #9 Exhibit 9 - Airfoil V10 by Vortikl, #10 Exhibit 10 - Design Patents USD635237 and USD641075, #11 Exhibit 11 - AirCanopy, #12 Summons Form - David T. Williams, #13 Summons Form - Vortikul Ltd, #14 Summons Form - Dafydd & Yong, Pte. Ltd., #15 Civil Cover Sheet) (Schoen, Ann) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Delta T, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ann Gallagher Schoen

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Barry D. Hunter