This case was last updated from PACER on 07/13/2020 at 12:22:24 (UTC).

Delta T, LLC v. MacroAir Technologies Inc.

Case Summary

On 04/06/2020 Delta T, LLC filed an Other - Commerce lawsuit against MacroAir Technologies Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Kentucky Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Joseph M. Hood. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:20-CV-00144

  • Filing Date:

    04/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Commerce

  • Courthouse:

    Kentucky Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Joseph M. Hood

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Delta T, LLC

Delta T, LLC a Kentucky company doing business as Big Ass Fans

Defendant

MacroAir Technologies Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jennifer L. Barry

Attorney at Latham & Watkins LLP - San Diego

12670 High Bluff Drive

San Diego, CA 92130

Barry D. Hunter

Attorney at Frost Brown Todd LLC - Lexington

250 W. Main Street, 2800 Lexington Financial Center

Lexington, KY 40507-1749

Medrith Lee Norman

Attorney at Frost Brown Todd LLC - Lexington

250 W. Main Street, 2800 Lexington Financial Center

Lexington, KY 40507-1749

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) SUMMONS RETURNED SERVICE BY SECRETARY OF STATE to MacroAir Technologies Inc. COMPLETED on 5/20/2020. Secretary of State return states: "This office served the Dft by sending a copy of the summons and accompanying documents via certified mail" (MDC) (Entered: 05/21/2020)

#13

(#13) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Delta T, LLC. MacroAir Technologies Inc. waiver sent on 5/9/2020, answer due 7/8/2020. (Hunter, Barry) (Entered: 05/12/2020)

#12

(#12) CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT re #11 Summons Issued. (MDC) (Entered: 05/05/2020)

#11

(#11) Summons Issued as to MacroAir Technologies Inc.; Summons issued and returned to counsel by U.S. Mail for service by Secretary of State. (JJ) (Entered: 04/24/2020)

10 #1

Summons

#10

(#10) NOTICE OF FILING by Delta T, LLC Summons (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Hunter, Barry) (Entered: 04/23/2020)

#9

(#9) ORDER: granting #8 Motion for Atty Jennifer L. Barry to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Delta T, LLC. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 04/09/2020. (MDC) cc: COR and Jennifer L. Barry by US Mail (Order + Electronic Filing Atty Registration Form) (Entered: 04/09/2020)

8 #3

Proposed Order

8 #2

Certificate of Good Standing

8 #1

Declaration of Jennifer L. Barry

#8

(#8) MOTION for Jennifer L. Barry to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Delta T, LLC ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4640390) (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jennifer L. Barry, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order)(Hunter, Barry) (Entered: 04/08/2020)

#7

(#7) NOTICE TO ATTORNEY Jennifer L. Barry by Clerk re: L.R. 83- Attorney Admission procedure w/ a copy of L.R. 83 and Attorney Admission Application (MDC) (Entered: 04/06/2020)

5 #1

*Restricted*

#5

(#5) CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Kentucky Western. Case number 1:20-cv-00055. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received electronically. cc: COR w/ copy of docket sheet to non-registered filer (Entered: 04/06/2020)

#4

(#4) ORDER by Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers on 4/6/2020. A review of the record in this action indicates that this action belongs in the Eastern District of Kentucky because the plaintiff is located in Lexington, Kentucky, IT IS ORDERED that this action is TRANSFERRED to the docket of the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky for re-allotment to a judge assigned in that division. L.R. 3.2(f). All further filings shall be filed with that court. Following transfer, the docket shall reflect that the matter in this District is closed. cc: Counsel; Defendant (CDF) [Transferred from kywd on 4/6/2020.] (Entered: 04/06/2020)

#3

(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Big Ass Holding, LLC, Corporate Parent Goldberg Lindsay & Co. a/k/a Lindsay Goldberg, Other Affiliate Lindsay Goldberg for Delta T, LLC. by Delta T, LLC. (JWM) [Transferred from kywd on 4/6/2020.] (Entered: 04/02/2020)

#2

(#2) Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers. (JWM) [Transferred from kywd on 4/6/2020.] (Entered: 04/02/2020)

1 #1

Cover Sheet

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) SUMMONS RETURNED SERVICE BY SECRETARY OF STATE to MacroAir Technologies Inc. COMPLETED on 5/20/2020. Secretary of State return states: "This office served the Dft by sending a copy of the summons and accompanying documents via certified mail" (MDC) (Entered: 05/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Delta T, LLC. MacroAir Technologies Inc. waiver sent on 5/9/2020, answer due 7/8/2020. (Hunter, Barry) (Entered: 05/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT re #11 Summons Issued. (MDC) (Entered: 05/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Summons Issued as to MacroAir Technologies Inc.; Summons issued and returned to counsel by U.S. Mail for service by Secretary of State. (JJ) (Entered: 04/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE OF FILING by Delta T, LLC Summons (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Hunter, Barry) (Entered: 04/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER: granting #8 Motion for Atty Jennifer L. Barry to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Delta T, LLC. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 04/09/2020. (MDC) cc: COR and Jennifer L. Barry by US Mail (Order + Electronic Filing Atty Registration Form) (Entered: 04/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Joseph M. Hood for review: re #8 MOTION for Jennifer L. Barry to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Delta T, LLC (JJ) (Entered: 04/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBAR STATUS Check completed as to Jennifer L. Barry re #8 MOTION for Jennifer L. Barry to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Delta T, LLC . (JJ) (Entered: 04/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION for Jennifer L. Barry to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Delta T, LLC ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4640390) (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jennifer L. Barry, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order)(Hunter, Barry) (Entered: 04/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE TO ATTORNEY Jennifer L. Barry by Clerk re: L.R. 83- Attorney Admission procedure w/ a copy of L.R. 83 and Attorney Admission Application (MDC) (Entered: 04/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2020
  • DocketConflict Check run. (CBD) (Entered: 04/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Kentucky Western. Case number 1:20-cv-00055. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received electronically. cc: COR w/ copy of docket sheet to non-registered filer (Entered: 04/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER by Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers on 4/6/2020. A review of the record in this action indicates that this action belongs in the Eastern District of Kentucky because the plaintiff is located in Lexington, Kentucky, IT IS ORDERED that this action is TRANSFERRED to the docket of the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky for re-allotment to a judge assigned in that division. L.R. 3.2(f). All further filings shall be filed with that court. Following transfer, the docket shall reflect that the matter in this District is closed. cc: Counsel; Defendant (CDF) [Transferred from kywd on 4/6/2020.] (Entered: 04/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Big Ass Holding, LLC, Corporate Parent Goldberg Lindsay & Co. a/k/a Lindsay Goldberg, Other Affiliate Lindsay Goldberg for Delta T, LLC. by Delta T, LLC. (JWM) [Transferred from kywd on 4/6/2020.] (Entered: 04/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers. (JWM) [Transferred from kywd on 4/6/2020.] (Entered: 04/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against MacroAir Technologies Inc., filed by Delta T, LLC. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0644-3076270. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) (JWM) [Transferred from kywd on 4/6/2020.] (Entered: 04/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MacroAir Technologies Incorporated is a litigant

Latest cases where Delta T, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jennifer L Barry