This case was last updated from PACER on 08/07/2021 at 08:45:36 (UTC).

Delta Health Center v. Delta Regional Medical Center

Case Summary

On 06/08/2021 Delta Health Center filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against Delta Regional Medical Center. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Mississippi Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Debra M. Brown, Sharion Aycock and Jane M. Virden. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-00077

  • Filing Date:

    06/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Jane M. Virden

Presiding Judges

Debra M. Brown

Sharion Aycock

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Delta Health Center, Inc.

Defendant

Delta Regional Medical Center

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Claire Dulaney Williams

Attorney at Brunini, Grantham, Grower & Hewes, PLLC

190 East Capitol Street, Suite 100

Jackson, MS 39201

Jamie Ferguson Lee

Attorney at JACKS LUCIANO, P.A.

P.O. Box 1209

Cleveland, MS 38732

Warren K. Rogers, Jr

Attorney at Brunini, Grantham, Grower & Hewes, PLLC

190 East Capitol Street, Suite 100

Jackson, MS 39201

Arnulfo Ursua Luciano

Attorney at JACKS GRIFFITH LUCIANO, P.A.

P. O. Box 1209

Cleveland, MS 38732-1209

Defendant Attorneys

Andrew W. Coffman

Attorney at Phelps Dunbar LLP

One Mississippi Plaza, 201 S. Spring Street, Seventh Floor

Tupelo, MS 38804

Mark Nolan Halbert

Attorney at PHELPS DUNBAR LLP

201 S. Spring Street, Seventh Floor (33804), P.O. Box 1220

Tupelo, MS 38802-1220

Paul Scott Phillips

Attorney at Campbell DeLong, LLP

923 Washington Avenue, Post Office Box 1856

Greenville, MS 38701

 

Court Documents

#18

(#18) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden: Case Management Conference held on 8/5/2021. (irw) (Entered: 08/06/2021)

#17

(#17) NOTICE OF SERVICE of Initial Disclosures by Warren K. Rogers, Jr on behalf of Delta Health Center, Inc. to Delta Regional Medical Center. (Rogers, Warren)

#16

(#16) NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant's Pre-Discovery Disclosure of Core Information by Andrew W. Coffman on behalf of Delta Regional Medical Center to Plaintiff. (Coffman, Andrew)

#15

(#15) REPLY to Response to Motion re #5 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Delta Regional Medical Center. (Coffman, Andrew)

#14

(#14) MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #13 Response in Opposition to Motion, #5 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Delta Health Center, Inc.. (Rogers, Warren)

#13

(#13) RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Delta Health Center, Inc.. (Rogers, Warren)

12 #2

Exhibit Exhibit 2 - Monroe's Donuts Complaint

12 #1

Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Monroe's Donuts Order Denying Judgment on the Pleadings

#12

(#12) MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #11 Response in Opposition to Motion filed by Delta Health Center, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Monroe's Donuts Order Denying Judgment on the Pleadings, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - Monroe's Donuts Complaint) (Rogers, Warren)

5 #1

Memorandum of Law in Support of its Motion to Dismiss

#5

(#11) RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Delta Health Center, Inc.. (Rogers, Warren)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Warren K. Rogers, Jr on behalf of Delta Health Center, Inc. Delta Regional Medical Center served on 6/15/2021. (Rogers, Warren)

#3

(#3) REPORT on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding A Patent or Trademark re #1 Complaint (tab)

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to Delta Regional Medical Center. E-mailed to attorney for service. (tab)

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit B Pending Applications

1 #1

Exhibit A State Registration Information

#1

(#3) REPORT on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding A Patent or Trademark re #1 Complaint (tab)

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden: Case Management Conference held on 8/5/2021. (irw) (Entered: 08/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) NOTICE OF SERVICE of Initial Disclosures by Warren K. Rogers, Jr on behalf of Delta Health Center, Inc. to Delta Regional Medical Center. (Rogers, Warren)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant's Pre-Discovery Disclosure of Core Information by Andrew W. Coffman on behalf of Delta Regional Medical Center to Plaintiff. (Coffman, Andrew)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) REPLY to Response to Motion re #5 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Delta Regional Medical Center. (Coffman, Andrew)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #13 Response in Opposition to Motion, #5 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Delta Health Center, Inc.. (Rogers, Warren)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Delta Health Center, Inc.. (Rogers, Warren)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S NOTICE OF CORRECTION re #12 Memorandum in Support, #11 Response in Opposition to Motion; All exhibits should be filed with the response to which they relate and not the memorandum brief, as required by L.U.Civ.R. 7(b)(2). Attorney to refile response and memorandum brief; further, all related filings to motion should be linked back to the original motion. (jla)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #11 Response in Opposition to Motion filed by Delta Health Center, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Monroe's Donuts Order Denying Judgment on the Pleadings, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - Monroe's Donuts Complaint) (Rogers, Warren)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Delta Health Center, Inc.. (Rogers, Warren)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) INITIAL ORDER - RULE 16.1: Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 8/5/2021 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 7/8/2021. (irw)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Paul Scott Phillips on behalf of All Defendants (Phillips, Paul)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Mark Nolan Halbert on behalf of Delta Regional Medical Center (Halbert, Mark)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #5 MOTION to Dismiss . (Coffman, Andrew)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S NOTICE OF CORRECTION re #5 MOTION to Dismiss : Attorney to file memorandum brief as separate docket entry from the motion as required by L.U.Civ.R. 7(b)(2). (jwr)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION to Dismiss by Delta Regional Medical Center. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in Support of its Motion to Dismiss) (Coffman, Andrew)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Warren K. Rogers, Jr on behalf of Delta Health Center, Inc. Delta Regional Medical Center served on 6/15/2021. (Rogers, Warren)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) REPORT on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding A Patent or Trademark re #1 Complaint (tab)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Debra M Brown and Magistrate Judge Jane M Virden. (tab)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to Delta Regional Medical Center. E-mailed to attorney for service. (tab)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT, Jury Demand, Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMSNDC-1956619, filed by Delta Health Center, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A State Registration Information, #2 Exhibit B Pending Applications, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (tab)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Delta Regional Medical Center is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Paul Scott Phillips(Designation Retained)

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Mark Nolan Halbert