This case was last updated from PACER on 08/02/2019 at 08:08:49 (UTC).

DELONG v. BERRYHILL

Case Summary

On 06/03/2019 DELONG filed a Government Benefit - Social Security lawsuit against BERRYHILL. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are CAROL SANDRA MOORE WELLS and JOHN R. PADOVA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:19-CV-02392

  • Filing Date:

    06/03/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pennsylvania Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

CAROL SANDRA MOORE WELLS

JOHN R. PADOVA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JOAN ANNE DELONG

Defendant

NANCY A. BERRYHILL

Interested Party

SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CARLA J. THOMAS

Attorney at THOMAS & THOMAS

716 Washington Street

Easton, PA 18042

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) ORDER THAT THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED FROM MAGISTRATE JUDGE CAROL SANDRA MOORE WELLS TO HONORABLE JOHN R. PADOVA FOR ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS. SIGNED BY CLERK OF COURT KATE BARKMAN, CLERK OF COURT ON 6/18/19. 6/19/19 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc) (Entered: 06/19/2019)

#7

RESTRICTED

#6

RESTRICTED

#5

RESTRICTED

#4

(#4) ORDER THAT LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS IS GRANTED. THE COMPLAINT IS DEEMED FILED. THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED TO ISSUE SUMMONSES. THE UNITED STATES MARSHAL FOR THE EASTERN DISTRICT OF PENNSYLVANIA SHALL SERVE THE SUMMONSES AND THE COMPLAINT. THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL SERVE THE UNITED STATES ATTORNEY FOR THE EASTERN DISTRICT OF PENNSYLVANIA. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE CAROL SANDRA MOORE WELLS ON 6/4/19.6/6/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (va, ) Modified on 6/12/2019 (md). (Entered: 06/06/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER THAT THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED FROM MAGISTRATE JUDGE CAROL SANDRA MOORE WELLS TO HONORABLE JOHN R. PADOVA FOR ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS. SIGNED BY CLERK OF COURT KATE BARKMAN, CLERK OF COURT ON 6/18/19. 6/19/19 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc) (Entered: 06/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Social Security Declining Magistrate Consent by JOAN ANNE DELONG.. (THOMAS, CARLA) (Entered: 06/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Acceptance of Service by U.S. Attorney Re: accepted summons and complaint on behalf of the United States Attorney (only). (va, ) (Entered: 06/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • 3 Summonses and Copies of Complaint Issued as to NANCY A. BERRYHILL, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General Forwarded To: USM (2) and USA (1) on 6/6/19 (va, ) (Entered: 06/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Procedural Order 6/6/19 Entered and copies e-mailed. (va, ) (Entered: 06/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER THAT LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS IS GRANTED. THE COMPLAINT IS DEEMED FILED. THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED TO ISSUE SUMMONSES. THE UNITED STATES MARSHAL FOR THE EASTERN DISTRICT OF PENNSYLVANIA SHALL SERVE THE SUMMONSES AND THE COMPLAINT. THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL SERVE THE UNITED STATES ATTORNEY FOR THE EASTERN DISTRICT OF PENNSYLVANIA. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE CAROL SANDRA MOORE WELLS ON 6/4/19.6/6/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (va, ) Modified on 6/12/2019 (md). (Entered: 06/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Social Security Notice of Case Assignment. (Attachments: #1 Consent)(er, ) (Main Document 3 replaced on 6/10/2019) (er, ). (Entered: 06/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) COMPLAINT against NANCY A. BERRYHILL, filed by JOAN ANNE DELONG (IFP PENDING). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheets)(er, ) (Entered: 06/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) MOTION FOR LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS filed by JOAN ANNE DELONG. AFFIDAVIT. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(er, ) (Entered: 06/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less