This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/01/2021 at 10:40:02 (UTC).

Deloney v. SK Food Group, Inc.

Case Summary

On 03/02/2021 Deloney filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against SK Food Group, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Southern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Edmund A. Sargus and Chelsey M. Vascura. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-00892

  • Filing Date:

    03/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Edmund A. Sargus

Referral Judge

Chelsey M. Vascura

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Marques Deloney

Defendant

SK Food Group, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Chastity Lynn Christy

Anthony J Lazzaro

Lori M. Griffin

Defendant Attorneys

Shawn J Organ

Charles A. Rosebrough

William C Martucci

Ashley Theodora Merino

Ashley N. Harrison

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Summons to SK Food Group, Inc.

#2

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#10

#11

#12

 

Docket Entries

04/29/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#12) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant SK Food Group, Inc.. (Organ, Shawn) (Entered: 04/29/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/27/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#11) NOTICE of Hearing: Initial Conference set for 5/11/2021 01:00 PM in Teleconference before Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura. (agm) (Entered: 04/27/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/26/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#10) ANSWER to #1 Complaint filed by SK Food Group, Inc.. (Merino, Ashley) (Entered: 04/26/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/02/2021
View Court Documents

DocketNOTATION ORDER granting #8 Motion for leave to appear pro hac vice of Ashley N. Harrison, William C. Martucci, and Charles A. Rosebrough as Co-Counsels. Co-Counsels are directed to register for e-filing through PACER unless they have done so previously. By Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 4/2/2021. (daf) (Entered: 04/02/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/02/2021

DocketSet/Reset Deadlines: SK Food Group, Inc. answer due 4/26/2021. (daf) (Entered: 04/02/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/01/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#9) AMENDED DOCUMENT by Defendant SK Food Group, Inc.. . (Attachments: #1 Supplement Pro Hac Vice Motion, #2 Supplement Pro Hac Vice Motion) (Organ, Shawn) (Entered: 04/01/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/01/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $600 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-8246385) of Ashley N. Harrison, William C. Martucci, Charles A. Rosebrough by Defendant SK Food Group, Inc.. (Organ, Shawn) (Entered: 04/01/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/01/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) STIPULATION Extension to Move or Plead (21 Days) by Defendant SK Food Group, Inc.. (Organ, Shawn) (Entered: 04/01/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/01/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Shawn J Organ for Defendant SK Food Group, Inc. (Organ, Shawn) (Entered: 04/01/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/23/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant SK Food Group, Inc.. The named Defendant was served on 3/18/2021, answer due 4/8/2021. (daf) (Entered: 03/23/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/16/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) CERTIFICATE of Mailing by Clerk: A copy of the complaint and issued summons was sent to the named defendant via certified mail. (er) (Entered: 03/16/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/10/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) NOTICE by Plaintiff Marques Deloney of filing consent forms (Attachments: #1 Elena Castorena Consent Form, #2 Marques Deloney Consent Form, #3 Sunil Diyali Consent Form, #4 Mercedes Mack Consent Form) (Griffin, Lori) (Entered: 03/10/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/03/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to SK Food Group, Inc.. (daf) (Entered: 03/03/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/02/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against SK Food Group, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402 paid - receipt number: AOHSDC-8186347), filed by Marques Deloney. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons to SK Food Group, Inc.) (Griffin, Lori) (Entered: 03/02/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less