This case was last updated from PACER on 12/06/2020 at 08:54:17 (UTC).

Dellatorre v. Delaware River and Bay Authority

Case Summary

On 10/07/2020 Dellatorre filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Delaware River and Bay Authority. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Delaware District. The Judge overseeing this case is Colm F. Connolly. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-01355

  • Filing Date:

    10/07/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Delaware District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Colm F. Connolly

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ingrid K. Dellatorre

Defendant

Delaware River and Bay Authority

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

John M. LaRosa

Attorney at LaRosa & Associates LLC

1225 King Street, Suite 802

Wilmington, DE 19801

Defendant Attorneys

Adria Benner Martinelli

Attorney at Young, Conaway, Stargatt & Taylor LLP

1000 North King Street

Wilmington, DE 19801

Lauren Elizabeth Moak Russell

Attorney at Young, Conaway, Stargatt & Taylor LLP

1000 North King Street

Wilmington, DE 19801

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Lauren Elizabeth Moak Russell on behalf of Delaware River and Bay Authority (Russell, Lauren) (Entered: 10/19/2020)

#5

(#5) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to ANSWER complaint or other responsive pleading to January 7, 2021 - filed by Delaware River and Bay Authority. (Martinelli, Adria) (Entered: 10/19/2020)

#4

(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Ingrid K. Dellatorre: For Delaware River and Bay Authority waiver sent on 10/7/2020, answer due 12/7/2020. (LaRosa, John) (Entered: 10/16/2020)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Adria Benner Martinelli on behalf of Delaware River and Bay Authority (Martinelli, Adria) (Entered: 10/16/2020)

#2

(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (nmg) (Entered: 10/07/2020)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Delaware River and Bay Authority - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ADEDC-3249981.) - filed by Ingrid K. Dellatorre. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(nmg) (Entered: 10/07/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED, re #5 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to ANSWER complaint or other responsive pleading to January 7, 2021 filed by Delaware River and Bay Authority, Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Delaware River and Bay Authority answer due 1/7/2021. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 10/19/2020. (fms) (Entered: 10/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Lauren Elizabeth Moak Russell on behalf of Delaware River and Bay Authority (Russell, Lauren) (Entered: 10/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to ANSWER complaint or other responsive pleading to January 7, 2021 - filed by Delaware River and Bay Authority. (Martinelli, Adria) (Entered: 10/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Ingrid K. Dellatorre: For Delaware River and Bay Authority waiver sent on 10/7/2020, answer due 12/7/2020. (LaRosa, John) (Entered: 10/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Adria Benner Martinelli on behalf of Delaware River and Bay Authority (Martinelli, Adria) (Entered: 10/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • DocketNo Summons Issued. (nmg) (Entered: 10/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (nmg) (Entered: 10/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Delaware River and Bay Authority - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ADEDC-3249981.) - filed by Ingrid K. Dellatorre. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(nmg) (Entered: 10/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less