This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/11/2022 at 23:12:20 (UTC).

Dell Inc. vs Webber

Case Summary

On 12/28/2021 Dell Inc filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Webber. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Robert Pitman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-01176

  • Filing Date:

    12/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Robert Pitman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Dell Inc.

Defendant

Jason Webber

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Michael J. Puma

Attorney at Morgan Lewis Bockius LLP

1701 Market Street

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Thomas Cullen Wallace

Attorney at Morgan Lewis & Bockius LLP

1000 Louisiana St., Suite 4000

Houston, TX 77002

Jason Scott Boulette

Attorney at Boulette Golden & Marin L.L.P.

2801 Via Fortuna, Suite 530

Austin, TX 78746

Michael J. Golden

Attorney at Boulette Golden & Marin L.L.P.

2801 Via Fortuna - Ste 530

Austin, TX 78746

Defendant Attorneys

Jacqueline M. Furlow

Attorney at Beck Redden LLP

1221 Mckinney Street, Suite 4500

Houston, TX 77010

Alistair B. Dawson

Attorney at Beck Redden LLP

1221 Mckinney Street, Suite 4500

Houston, TX 77010-2010

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) ORDER Cancelling Preliminary Injunction Hearing. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (dm) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

#13

(#13) NOTICE of Settlement by Jason Webber (Dawson, Alistair) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

12 #1

Exhibit A

#12

(#12) Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Jason Webber, re #6 MOTION to Remand to State Court Emergency filed by Plaintiff Dell Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Dawson, Alistair) (Entered: 01/10/2022)

#11

(#11) ORDER setting Preliminary Injunction Hearing for 2/9/2022 09:00 AM before Judge Robert Pitman. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (klw) (Entered: 01/04/2022)

#10

RESTRICTED

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael J. Golden on behalf of Dell Inc.. Attorney Michael J. Golden added to party Dell Inc.(pty:pla) (Golden, Michael) (Entered: 01/03/2022)

#8

(#8) ORDER, (Telephone Conference set for 1/4/2022 09:30 AM before Judge Robert Pitman). Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (bot1) (Entered: 01/03/2022)

#7

(#7) MOTION Defendant's Request for a Status Conference by Jason Webber. (Dawson, Alistair) (Entered: 12/30/2021)

6 #5

Proposed Order TRO and Expedited Discovery

6 #4

Proposed Order Remand

6 #3

Exhibit C

6 #2

Exhibit B

6 #1

Exhibit A

#6

(#6) MOTION to Remand to State Court Emergency by Dell Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Proposed Order Remand, #5 Proposed Order TRO and Expedited Discovery)(Wallace, Thomas) (Entered: 12/30/2021)

#5

(#5) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Dell Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Dell Technologies Inc. for Dell Inc.. (Wallace, Thomas) (Entered: 12/30/2021)

4 #1

Proposed Order

#4

(#4) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Thomas Cullen Wallace for Michael J. Puma ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-15569699) by on behalf of Dell Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Wallace, Thomas) (Entered: 12/29/2021)

33 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ORDER Cancelling Preliminary Injunction Hearing. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (dm) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE of Settlement by Jason Webber (Dawson, Alistair) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Jason Webber, re #6 MOTION to Remand to State Court Emergency filed by Plaintiff Dell Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Dawson, Alistair) (Entered: 01/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER setting Preliminary Injunction Hearing for 2/9/2022 09:00 AM before Judge Robert Pitman. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (klw) (Entered: 01/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert Pitman: Telephone Conference held on 1/4/2022 (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.). (Court Reporter Lily Reznik.)(klw) (Entered: 01/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order GRANTING #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by attorney Michael J. Puma. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. entered by Judge Robert Pitman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jg) (Entered: 01/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael J. Golden on behalf of Dell Inc.. Attorney Michael J. Golden added to party Dell Inc.(pty:pla) (Golden, Michael) (Entered: 01/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER, (Telephone Conference set for 1/4/2022 09:30 AM before Judge Robert Pitman). Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (bot1) (Entered: 01/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION Defendant's Request for a Status Conference by Jason Webber. (Dawson, Alistair) (Entered: 12/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION to Remand to State Court Emergency by Dell Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Proposed Order Remand, #5 Proposed Order TRO and Expedited Discovery)(Wallace, Thomas) (Entered: 12/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Dell Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Dell Technologies Inc. for Dell Inc.. (Wallace, Thomas) (Entered: 12/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Thomas Cullen Wallace for Michael J. Puma ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-15569699) by on behalf of Dell Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Wallace, Thomas) (Entered: 12/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Order Directing Michael J. Puma to File a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice within 14 days. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (lt) (Entered: 12/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ORDER that the removing party, if it has not already done so, shall within ten (10) days from the date of this order supplement the record with state court pleadings. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (lt) (Entered: 12/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • DocketIf ordered by the court, all referrals and consents in this case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Howell (lt) (Entered: 12/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Robert Pitman. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (lt) (Entered: 12/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Jason Webber (Filing fee $402 receipt number 0542-15566727), filed by Jason Webber. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B-1, #3 Exhibit B-2, #4 Exhibit B-3, #5 Exhibit B-4, #6 Exhibit B-5, #7 Exhibit B-6, #8 Exhibit B-7, #9 Exhibit B-8, #10 Exhibit B-9, #11 Exhibit B-10, #12 Exhibit B-11, #13 Exhibit B-12, #14 Exhibit B-13, #15 Exhibit B-14, #16 Exhibit B-15, #17 Exhibit B-16, #18 Exhibit C, #19 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Case Information Sheet, #20 Civil Cover Sheet Supplemental Civil Case Information Sheet)(Dawson, Alistair) (Entered: 12/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Dell Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Alistair B. Dawson