This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/01/2020 at 11:56:52 (UTC).

Dell Inc. v. Gupta et al

Case Summary

On 06/02/2020 Dell Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against Gupta. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Sam Sparks. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00586

  • Filing Date:

    06/02/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Sam Sparks

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Dell Inc.

Defendants

Anurag Gupta

Onlinetechsupports.net LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Sinead O'Carroll

Ross J. Corbett

Kimball R. Anderson

Robert H. Newman

 

Court Documents

#1

#2

#3

#4

#5

5 #1

Proposed Stipulated Judgment of Permanent Injunction

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION for and Submission of Agreed Stipulated Judgment of Permanent Injunction re #4 Order by Dell Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Stipulated Judgment of Permanent Injunction)(O'Carroll, Sinead) (Entered: 07/09/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) IT IS ORDERED that Dell shall file within ten (10) days the proposed Consent Decree in this case. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (dm) (Entered: 07/06/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CONSENT DECREE by Dell Inc. (dm) (Entered: 06/04/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Filing fee received in the amount of $400, receipt number 100038597. (dm) (Entered: 06/04/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Severance Order (Originally filed in 1:16-cv-641 SS). (dm) (Entered: 06/04/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less