This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/29/2019 at 07:40:55 (UTC).

Delgado v. Hubbell Power Systems Inc

Case Summary

On 07/31/2019 Delgado filed a Labor - Family & Medical Leave lawsuit against Hubbell Power Systems Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Alabama Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Annemarie Carney Axon. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-01218

  • Filing Date:

    07/31/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Family & Medical Leave

  • Courthouse:

    Alabama Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Annemarie Carney Axon

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jose Christian Tovar Delgado

Defendant

Hubbell Power Systems Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Allen Durham Arnold

Attorney at The Five Points Law Group, LLC

2151 Highland Avenue South Ste 205

Birmingham, AL 35205

Defendant Attorney

Thomas A Davis

Attorney at JACKSON LEWIS P.C.

800 Shades Creek Parkway, Suite 870

Birmingham, AL 35209

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) INITIAL ORDER GOVERNING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS - with appendices attached. Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 9/23/19. (SAC) (Entered: 09/23/2019)

#11

(#11) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Hubbell Power Systems Inc. filed by Hubbell Power Systems Inc (Davis, Thomas) (Entered: 09/20/2019)

#10

(#10) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Hubbell Power Systems Inc.(Davis, Thomas) (Entered: 09/20/2019)

#8

(#8) Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiff's Complaint (Unopposed) by Hubbell Power Systems Inc. (Davis, Thomas) (Entered: 09/05/2019)

#6

(#6) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiff's Complaint by Hubbell Power Systems Inc. (Davis, Thomas) (Entered: 08/21/2019)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jose Christian Tovar Delgado. Hubbell Power Systems Inc. served on 8/2/2019, answer due 8/23/2019. (JLC) (Entered: 08/07/2019)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to Hubbell Power Systems Inc. Sent via certified mail. (KEK) (Entered: 07/31/2019)

#3

(#3) CONFLICT DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Jose Christian Tovar Delgado. (KEK) (Entered: 07/31/2019)

#2

(#2) Request for service by certified mail filed by Jose Christian Tovar Delgado. (KEK) (Entered: 07/31/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Hubbell Power Systems Inc, filed by Jose Christian Tovar Delgado.(KEK) (Entered: 07/31/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) INITIAL ORDER GOVERNING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS - with appendices attached. Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 9/23/19. (SAC) (Entered: 09/23/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Hubbell Power Systems Inc. filed by Hubbell Power Systems Inc (Davis, Thomas) (Entered: 09/20/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Hubbell Power Systems Inc.(Davis, Thomas) (Entered: 09/20/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant's responsive pleading is due on or before September 20, 2019. Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 9/5/2019.(KMG) (Entered: 09/05/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiff's Complaint (Unopposed) by Hubbell Power Systems Inc. (Davis, Thomas) (Entered: 09/05/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) TEXT ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant's responsive pleading is due on September 6, 2019. Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 8/21/2019. (KMG) (Entered: 08/21/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiff's Complaint by Hubbell Power Systems Inc. (Davis, Thomas) (Entered: 08/21/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jose Christian Tovar Delgado. Hubbell Power Systems Inc. served on 8/2/2019, answer due 8/23/2019. (JLC) (Entered: 08/07/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Summons Issued as to Hubbell Power Systems Inc. Sent via certified mail. (KEK) (Entered: 07/31/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3401761 (ALND B4601099478) related document #1 COMPLAINT against Hubbell Power Systems Inc, filed by Jose Christian Tovar Delgado.(KEK). (Arnold, Allen) Modified on 7/31/2019 (KEK). (Entered: 07/31/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) CONFLICT DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Jose Christian Tovar Delgado. (KEK) (Entered: 07/31/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Request for service by certified mail filed by Jose Christian Tovar Delgado. (KEK) (Entered: 07/31/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Hubbell Power Systems Inc, filed by Jose Christian Tovar Delgado.(KEK) (Entered: 07/31/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less