This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/29/2021 at 07:41:41 (UTC).

Delgado v. Georgia Halal Meat & Catering Inc.

Case Summary

On 01/28/2021 Delgado filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against Georgia Halal Meat Catering Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is J. P. Boulee. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00430

  • Filing Date:

    01/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

  • Courthouse:

    Georgia Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

J. P. Boulee

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Arturo Delgado

Defendant

Georgia Halal Meat & Catering Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Brittany Ann Barto

Attorney at Hall & Lampros, LLP

Suite 1150, 400 Galleria Pkwy

Atlanta, GA 30339

Gordon Van Remmen

Attorney at Hall & Lampros, LLP

Suite 1150, 400 Galleria Pkwy

Atlanta, GA 30339

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) ELEVENTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 03/09/2021 (adg) (ADI) (Entered: 03/10/2021)

#5

(#5) STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION. Signed by Judge J. P. Boulee on 2/19/21. (bnw) (Entered: 02/19/2021)

#4

(#4) Return of Service Executed by Arturo Delgado. Georgia Halal Meat & Catering Inc. served on 2/1/2021, answer due 2/22/2021. (Lampros, Peter) (Entered: 02/02/2021)

#3

(#3) TENTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 1/27/21. (eop) (Entered: 01/28/2021)

#2

(#2) Electronic Summons Issued as to Georgia Halal Meat & Catering Inc.. (eop) (Entered: 01/28/2021)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Arturo Delgado. (Filing fee $402.00, receipt number AGANDC-10663875) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 01/28/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ELEVENTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 03/09/2021 (adg) (ADI) (Entered: 03/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION. Signed by Judge J. P. Boulee on 2/19/21. (bnw) (Entered: 02/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Return of Service Executed by Arturo Delgado. Georgia Halal Meat & Catering Inc. served on 2/1/2021, answer due 2/22/2021. (Lampros, Peter) (Entered: 02/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) TENTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 1/27/21. (eop) (Entered: 01/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Electronic Summons Issued as to Georgia Halal Meat & Catering Inc.. (eop) (Entered: 01/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Arturo Delgado. (Filing fee $402.00, receipt number AGANDC-10663875) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 01/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Brittany Ann Barto

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Gordon Van Remmen