This case was last updated from PACER on 07/16/2019 at 09:47:24 (UTC).

Delgado v. Saul

Case Summary

On 05/17/2019 Delgado filed a Government Benefit - Social Security Disability lawsuit against Saul. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are John Z. Lee and Jeffrey T. Gilbert. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-03341

  • Filing Date:

    05/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security Disability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Illinois Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

John Z. Lee

Jeffrey T. Gilbert

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Virginia I. Delgado

Defendants

Acting Commissioner Nancy A. Berryhill

Andrew Marshall Saul

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Joseph Stephen Sellers

Attorney at Spector & Lenz, P.c.

55 E. Jackson Blvd., Suite 325

Chicago, IL 60604

Justin Roger Poh

Attorney at Spector & Lenz, P.C.

55 E. Jackson Blvd., Suite 325

Chicago, IL 60604

Deborah Susan Spector

Attorney at Spector & Lenz, P.C.

55 East Jackson Boulevard, Suite 325

Chicago, IL 60604

Defendant Attorneys

AUSA-SSA

Attorney at United States Attorney's Office (NDIL - Chicago)

219 South Dearborn Street

Chicago, IL 60604

Jimmy Lorenzo Arce

Attorney at United States Attorneys Office

219 S. Dearborn, 5Th Floor

Chicago, IL 60604

 

Court Documents

#10

RESTRICTED

#7

RESTRICTED

#8

RESTRICTED

#6

RESTRICTED

#4

RESTRICTED

#3

RESTRICTED

#2

RESTRICTED

#9

RESTRICTED

#5

RESTRICTED

#1

RESTRICTED

#12

RESTRICTED

#11

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert: This case has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge Gilbert. A briefing schedule will be set after the Administrative Record is filed. Mailed notice (ber, ) (Entered: 06/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ORDER REASSIGNING: Case reassigned to the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert for all further proceedings pursuant to Local Rule 73.1. Parties have consenting to the reassignment. Honorable John Z. Lee no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Honorable John Z. Lee on 6/21/19. Mailed Notice.(gcy, ) (Entered: 06/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee:The parties filed a joint consent to proceed before the Magistrate Judge, this case will be reassigned. The status hearing set for 6/27/19 is stricken.Mailed notice (ca, ) (Entered: 06/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) JOINT CONSENT to Exercise of Jurisdiction by a United States Magistrate Judge (Arce, Jimmy) (Entered: 06/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) DESIGNATION of Jimmy Lorenzo Arce as U.S. Attorney for Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill (Arce, Jimmy) (Entered: 06/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee:Case called on 6/19/19. No one appeared. Status hearing set for 6/27/19 at 9:00 a.m. Mailed notice (ca, ) (Entered: 06/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee: Pursuant to Local Rule 4(b) and Fed. R. Civ. P. Rule 12(a)(2), the defendant is to file its answer and administrative record by 7/17/19. Plaintiff's opening brief is due 8/14/19. Defendant's response brief is due by 9/12/19. Plaintiff's reply brief is due 9/26/19. Ruling by mail. Counsel should note that these dates modify the briefing schedule set forth in Local Rule 16.4. Counsel are further directed to meet and confer prior to the date the answer and administrative record are filed to determine whether: (a) the parties will agree to consent to the exercise of jurisdiction by a United States Magistrate Judge and (b) an agreed remand order is necessary. If the parties consent to the jurisdiction of the magistrate judge, the appropriate form to execute and file with the court may be found at the following location: http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/home/PUBLIC/Forms/consent.pdf. Status hearing set for 6/19/19 at 9:00 a.m.Mailed notice (ca, ) (Entered: 05/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable John Z. Lee. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert. Case assignment: Random assignment. (yt) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Virginia I. Delgado by Justin Roger Poh (Poh, Justin) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Virginia I. Delgado by Joseph Stephen Sellers (Sellers, Joseph) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Virginia I. Delgado by Deborah Susan Spector (Spector, Deborah) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Spector, Deborah) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT filed by Virginia I. Delgado; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15838237.(Spector, Deborah) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.